Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Loggins, Jerry, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Pearson, Fred Eugene, against City Of Monticello, Florida Department Of Transpor, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with Karen A. Gievers presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2014 |
CategoryNegligence- Premises Liability Commercia |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
April 01, 2015 | Docket Event | SECOND NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES BY DEFENDANT CITY OF MONTICELLO FLORIDA | |
February 26, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES BY DEFENDANT CITY OF MONTICELLO FLORIDA | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CITY OF MONTICELLOS SECOND NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
February 03, 2015 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event | SECOND NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY BY DEFENDANT CITY OF MONTICELLO | |
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION AND REQUEST FOR COPIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.