Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Medical Recovery Services , vs. Lena James .
On January 25, 2023 an a17 creditor/ debtor collections ($10,000 or less) case was filed by Medical Recovery Services, represented by Zollinger, Bryan Ned, against James, Lena Marie, in the jurisdiction of Lincoln County. Judge Ash, Brendan presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 25, 2023
Last Refreshed
November 07, 2023
Filing Location
Lincoln County, ID
Judge
Category
A17 Creditor/ Debtor Collections ($10,000 or less)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2023 |
Writ Returned -Final Return Unsatisfied |
||
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Writ of Execution |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ Issued Add county |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Application for Continuing Garnishment | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Closed | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Abstract Judgment Issued | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Default | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Entry of Default | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Application for Entry of Default | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Application for Default |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit / Return of Service | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | New Case - Magistrate Civil for Creditor/Debtor | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint Filed |