Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
POMPLIN JR, ALVIN -VS- NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC
On May 09, 2016 a l - law >$50,000 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kankakee County. Judge ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 09, 2016
Last Refreshed
October 15, 2022
Filing Location
Kankakee County, IL
Category
L - LAW >$50,000
Case Outcome Type
DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2018 | hearing |
MOTION OR PETITION
Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE CALLED ON MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND COMPEL DISTRIBUTION . NO ONE APPEARS. MOTION IS STRICKEN. (ALBRECHT;204AUDIO)TEH | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY Peter Daniel Corti (Attorney) on behalf of ALVIN POMPLIN JR (PLAINTIFF) | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE SCHEDULED Event: MOTION OR PETITION Date: 05/31/2018 Time: 9:00 am Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W Location: ROOM 204 Result: STRICKEN FROM DOCKET | |
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AND COMPEL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY Peter Daniel Corti (Attorney) on behalf of ALVIN POMPLIN JR (PLAINTIFF) | |
April 17, 2018 | hearing |
STATUS CHECK
Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | IN COURT SUMMARY: Case Disposition: Disposition Code: DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Disposition Date: 04/18/2018 Case Status: Closed Case Status Date: 05/09/2016 | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER PRESENTED, SIGNED AND FILED. (ALBRECHT) | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE CALLED. ATTORNEY DUSKY APPEARS FOR PLAINTIFF. ATTORNEY SCHAEFER APPEARS FOR THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT. ATTORNEY APPEARS FOR DEFENDANT NUCOR. COURT FINDS THE MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH FINDING IS NOT APPROPRIATE. PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT CASE IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SEE ORDER SIGNED. (ALBRECHT;204AUDIO)TEH | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY Robert Steven Tengesdal (Attorney) on behalf of NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC (DEFENDANT), NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE INC (THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF) | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH FINDING FILED BY Robert Steven Tengesdal (Attorney) on behalf of NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC (DEFENDANT), NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE INC (THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF) | |
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY Robert Steven Tengesdal (Attorney) on behalf of NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC (DEFENDANT), NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE INC (THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF) | |
March 08, 2018 | hearing |
STATUS OF DISCOVERY
Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W |
|
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE CALLED FOR STATUS OF DISCOVERY. ATTORNEY DUSKY APPEARS FOR PLAINTIFF. ATTORNEY NOWACKI APPEARS FOR THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT. ATTORNEY BECK APPEARS FOR DEFENDANT/THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF. COUNSEL REPORTS STATUS OF SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. CASE IS CONTINUED FOR STATUS OF SETTLEMENT TO 4-17-18 AT 9:00AM. (ALBRECHT;204AUDIO)TEH | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE SCHEDULED Event: STATUS CHECK Date: 04/17/2018 Time: 9:00 am Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W Location: ROOM 204 | |
December 18, 2017 | hearing |
HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W |
|
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CALLED FOR HEARING ON NUCOR'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. ATTORNEY DUSKY APPEARS FOR PLAINTIFF. ATTORNEY TENGESDAL APPEARS FOR DEFENDANT/THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF NUCOR. ATTORNEY NOWACKI APPEARS FOR THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT. ARGUMENTS OF COUNSEL HEARD. MOTION DENIED. MOTION DENIED. F(1) DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS 3-1-18. CASE IS CONTINUED FOR STATUS OF DISCOVERY TO 3-8-18 AT 9:00AM. (ALBRECHT;204AUDIO)TEH | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE SCHEDULED Event: STATUS OF DISCOVERY Date: 03/08/2018 Time: 9:00 am Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W Location: ROOM 204 | |
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDNAT/THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY Robert Steven Tengesdal (Attorney) on behalf of NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE INC (THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF) | |
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED BY Robert Steven Tengesdal (Attorney) on behalf of NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE INC (THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF) | |
November 01, 2017 | hearing |
HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W |
|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED BY Peter Daniel Corti (Attorney) on behalf of ALVIN POMPLIN JR (PLAINTIFF) | |
September 13, 2017 | hearing |
MOTION OR PETITION
Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W |
|
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER PRESENTED, SIGNED AND FILED. (ALBRECHT) | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CALLED, ATTORNEY DUSKY APPEARS FOR THE PLAINTIFF. ATTORNEY TINGERDAHL APPEARS FOR NUCOR. PLAINTIFF IS GIVEN UNTIL 10-31-17 TO FILE RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. DEFENDANT IS GIVEN UNTIL 11-28-17 TO REPLY. CASE IS CONTINUED TO 12-18-17 @ 9:30 AM RM 204 FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. HEARING DATE OF 11-1-17 IS STRICKEN. SEE ORDER. (ALBRECHT 204;AUDIO GC | |
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE SCHEDULED Event: HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Date: 12/18/2017 Time: 9:30 am Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W Location: ROOM 204 Result: MOTION/PETITION DENIED | |
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event | AGREED MOTION TO CONTINUE THE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND MODIFY THE HEARING DATE ON NUCOR STEEL OF KANKAKEE, INC. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY Peter Daniel Corti (Attorney) on behalf of ALVIN POMPLIN JR (PLAINTIFF) | |
September 06, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY Peter Daniel Corti (Attorney) on behalf of ALVIN POMPLIN JR (PLAINTIFF) | |
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE SCHEDULED Event: MOTION OR PETITION Date: 09/13/2017 Time: 9:00 am Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W Location: ROOM 204 Result: CONTINUED | |
June 26, 2017 | hearing |
SETTING
Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE SCHEDULED Event: HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Date: 11/01/2017 Time: 10:00 am Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W Location: ROOM 204 | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CALLED. ATTORNEY DUSKY APPEARS FOR PLAINTIFF. ATTORNEY NOWACKI APPEARS FOR THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT. ATTORNEY APPEARS FOR DEFENDANT. PLAINTIFF IS GIVEN UNTIL 8-14-17 TO RESPOND TO NUCOR'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. NUCOR IS GIVEN 21 DAYS THEREAFTER TO FILE A FINAL REPLY. CASE IS CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO 11-1-17 AT 10:00AM. (ALBRECHT;204AUDIO)TEH | |
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER PRESENTED, SIGNED AND FILED. (ALBRECHT) | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT/THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY Robert Steven Tengesdal (Attorney) on behalf of NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC (DEFENDANT), NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE INC (THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF) | |
June 15, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY Robert Steven Tengesdal (Attorney) on behalf of NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC (DEFENDANT), NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE INC (THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF) | |
May 18, 2017 | hearing |
HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W |
|
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CALLED FOR HEARING ON THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. ATTORNEY DUSKY APPEARS FOR PLAINTIFF. ATTORNEY TENGESDAL APPEARS FOR DEFENDANT. ATTORNEY NOWACKI APPEARS FOR THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT. ARGUMENTS OF COUNSEL HEARD. MOTION IS DENIED. CASE IS CONTINUED FOR SETTING TO 6-26-17 AT 9:00AM. (ALBRECHT;204AUDIO)TEH | |
May 18, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE SCHEDULED Event: SETTING Date: 06/26/2017 Time: 9:00 am Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W Location: ROOM 204 Result: BRIEFING SCHEDULE ENTERED | |
May 04, 2017 | hearing |
HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE SCHEDULED Event: HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Date: 05/18/2017 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W Location: ROOM 204 Result: MOTION/PETITION DENIED | |
April 18, 2017 | hearing |
HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W |
|
April 05, 2017 | hearing |
MOTION OR PETITION
Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W |
|
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CALLED. ATTORNEY APPEARS FOR DEFENDANT PAY TRANSPORTATION. ATTORNEY APPEARS FOR DEFENDANT NUCOR. NO ONE APPEARS FOR PLAINTIFF. PAY TRANSPORTATION'S Motion to Amend MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS ALLOWED. MOTION TO CONTINUE IS ALLOWED. CASE IS STRICKEN FROM 4-18-17. CASE IS CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO 5-4-17 AT 10:00AM. (ALBRECHT;204AUDIO)TEH | |
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER PRESENTED, SIGNED AND FILED. (ALBRECHT) | |
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | PAY TRANSPORTATION, INC.'S Motion to Amend EXHIBIT 8 OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY Kingshuk Kumar Roy (Attorney) on behalf of PAY TRANSPORTATION INC (THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT) | |
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | PAY TRANSPORTATION, INC.'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY Kingshuk Kumar Roy (Attorney) on behalf of PAY TRANSPORTATION INC (THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT) | |
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED BY Kingshuk Kumar Roy (Attorney) on behalf of PAY TRANSPORTATION INC (THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT) | |
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY Kingshuk Kumar Roy (Attorney) on behalf of PAY TRANSPORTATION INC (THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT) | |
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE SCHEDULED Event: HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Date: 05/04/2017 Time: 10:00 am Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W Location: ROOM 204 Result: STRICKEN FROM DOCKET | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY Kingshuk Kumar Roy (Attorney) on behalf of PAY TRANSPORTATION INC (THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT) | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | PAY TRANSPORTATION, INC'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY Kingshuk Kumar Roy (Attorney) on behalf of PAY TRANSPORTATION INC (THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT) | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | PAY TRANSPORTATION, INC,'S Motion to Amend EXHIBIT 8 OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY Kingshuk Kumar Roy (Attorney) on behalf of PAY TRANSPORTATION INC (THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT) | |
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED BY Kingshuk Kumar Roy (Attorney) on behalf of PAY TRANSPORTATION INC (THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT) | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | AGREED MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON PAY TRANSPORTATION, INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY Robert Steven Tengesdal (Attorney) on behalf of NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE INC (THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF) | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY Robert Steven Tengesdal (Attorney) on behalf of NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE INC (THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF) | |
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE SCHEDULED VIA TELEPHONE Event: MOTION TO CONTINUE Date: 04/05/2017 Time: 9:00 am Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W Location: ROOM 204 Result: MOTION ALLOWED | |
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT/THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC'S RESPONSE TO THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT PAY TRANSPORTATION, INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY Robert Steven Tengesdal (Attorney) on behalf of NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE INC (THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF) | |
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED BY Robert Steven Tengesdal (Attorney) on behalf of NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE INC (THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF) | |
February 14, 2017 | hearing |
STATUS CHECK
Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W |
|
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER PRESENTED, SIGNED AND FILED. (ALBRECHT) | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CALLED FOR STATUS. ATTORNEY DUSKY APPEARS FOR PLAINTIFF. ATTORNEY APPEARS FOR THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT. PAY TRANSPORTATION. ATTORNEY SCHNAUTZ APPEARS FOR DEFENDANT NUCOR. COURT ADVISED STATUS OF DISCOVERY. DEFENDANT IS GIVEN 28 DAYS TO RESPOND TO THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT IS GIVEN 14 DAYS THEREAFTER TO FILE A FINAL REPLY. CASE IS CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO 4-18-17 AT 10:00AM. PARTIES ARE GIVEN 7 DAYS TO ISSUE SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY. (ALBRECHT;204AUDIO)TEH | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE SCHEDULED Event: HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Date: 04/18/2017 Time: 10:00 am Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W Location: ROOM 204 | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | PAY TRANSPORTATION, INC'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY Kingshuk Kumar Roy (Attorney) on behalf of PAY TRANSPORTATION INC (THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT) | |
February 14, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION FILED BY Kingshuk Kumar Roy (Attorney) on behalf of PAY TRANSPORTATION INC (THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT) | |
January 10, 2017 | hearing |
STATUS CHECK
Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W |
|
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF, NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC.'S RESPONSE TO THIRD-PARTY DEFEDNAT, PAY TRANSPORTATION, INC'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED BY Robert Steven Tengesdal (Attorney) on behalf of NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC (DEFENDANT), NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE INC (THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF) | |
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE SCHEDULED Event: STATUS CHECK Date: 02/14/2017 Time: 9:00 am Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W Location: ROOM 204 | |
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | CASE CALLED FOR STATUS. COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT APPEARS. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF FAILS TO APPEAR. CASE IS CONTINUED TO 2-14-17 AT 9:00AM FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION. (ALBRECHT;204AUDIO)TEH | |
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED BY Robert Steven Tengesdal (Attorney) on behalf of NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE INC (THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF) | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE FILED BY Kingshuk Kumar Roy (Attorney) on behalf of PAY TRANSPORTATION INC (THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT) | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED BY Kingshuk Kumar Roy (Attorney) on behalf of PAY TRANSPORTATION INC (THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT) | |
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR CONTRIBUTION AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY Kingshuk Kumar Roy (Attorney) on behalf of PAY TRANSPORTATION INC (THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT) | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED BY Kingshuk Kumar Roy (Attorney) on behalf of PAY TRANSPORTATION INC (THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT) | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE FILED BY Kingshuk Kumar Roy (Attorney) on behalf of PAY TRANSPORTATION INC (THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT) Receipt: 256360 Date: 11/07/2016 | |
November 07, 2016 | Docket Event | JURY DEMAND FILED BY Kingshuk Kumar Roy (Attorney) on behalf of PAY TRANSPORTATION INC (THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT) Receipt: 256360 Date: 11/07/2016 | |
October 06, 2016 | hearing |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W |
|
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE CALLED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. ATTORNEY MAKAITIS APPEARS FOR PLAINTIFF. CASE IS CONTINUED FOR STATUS TO 1-10-17 AT 9:00AM. ALL COUNSEL TO BE PRESENT. ATTORNEY CHESTNUT APPEARS LATE FOR DEFENDANT AND IS INFORMED OF TODAYS MINUTES. (ALBRECHT;204AUDIO)TEH | |
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE SCHEDULED Event: STATUS CHECK Date: 01/10/2017 Time: 9:00 am Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W Location: ROOM 204 | |
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | SUCCESSFUL SERVICE Method : PERSONAL SERVICE Issued : 05/19/2016 Service : SUMMONS Served : 06/29/2016 Return : 08/17/2016 On : NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC Signed By : Reason : SUCCESSFUL SERVICE Comment : Tracking #: P000045417 Service Location : | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 06/16/2016 Service: SUMMONS Method: PERSONAL SERVICE Provider: COOK COUNTY SHERIFF Cost Per: $ PAY TRANSPORTATION INC R/A VIRGINIA L BUTTS 4711 MIDLOTHIAN TPK, STE 11 CRESTWOOD, IL 60445 Tracking No: P000045947 | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AT LAW, AND THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT FOR CONTRIBUTION AGAINST PAY TRANSPORTATION, INC FILED BY Robert Steven Tengesdal (Attorney) on behalf of NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC (DEFENDANT) Receipt: 243154 Date: 06/16/2016 | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING FILED BY Robert Steven Tengesdal (Attorney) on behalf of NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC (DEFENDANT), NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE INC (THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF) | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE SUMMONS FOR L GREATER THAN $50,000 FILED BY Robert Steven Tengesdal (Attorney) on behalf of NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC (DEFENDANT) Receipt: 243152 Date: 06/16/2016 | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | JURY DEMAND FILED BY Robert Steven Tengesdal (Attorney) on behalf of NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC (DEFENDANT) Receipt: 243153 Date: 06/16/2016 | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | CASE SCHEDULED Event: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 10/06/2016 Time: 9:00 am Judge: ALBRECHT, ADRIENNE W Location: ROOM 204 Result: ADVISED CURRENT STATUS | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 05/19/2016 Service: SUMMONS Method: PERSONAL SERVICE Provider: FOREIGN SERVER Cost Per: $ NUCOR STEEL KANKAKEE, INC R/A : C T CORPORATION SYSTEM 208 S. LASALLE STREET, S-814 CHICAGO, IL 60604 Tracking No: P000045417 | |
May 19, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT AT LAW FILED BY Peter Daniel Corti (Attorney) on behalf of ALVIN POMPLIN JR (PLAINTIFF) Receipt: 240857 Date: 05/19/2016 |