Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Sullivan Housing Authority, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Durham, Brooke, in the jurisdiction of Sullivan County. This case was filed in Sullivan County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 05, 2024 |
CategoryEv - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSullivan County, IN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Eviction Hearing | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 3/5/2024 : Sullivan Housing Authority |
|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Hearing Scheduling Activity ---- 3/5/2024 : BROOKE DURHAM |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Filed Interest Sheet |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed Affidavit of Debt |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduling Activity Eviction Hearing scheduled for 03/18/2024 at 9:00 AM. |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Service Issued Claim Filed, Affidavit Filed, and Interest Sheet issued to Brooke Durham via SCSD |
|
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Opened as a New Filing | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Claim Filed Small Claim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.