Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Taylor, Michael C vs Hood, Deborah F et al
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of St. Mary's County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 09, 2021
Last Refreshed
July 11, 2022
Filing Location
St. Mary's County, MD
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ /Summons/Pleading - Electronic Service judgment forelcosing right of redemption |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Foreclosing Right of Redemption CC Copy to Attorney, Defendants, County Treasurer, Supervisor of Tax Assessments |
|
April 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Writ /Summons/Pleading - Electronic Service deficiency order |
|
April 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Deficiency Order CC Copy to Attorney and Defendants |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Supporting Exhibit Affidavit of Compliance Exhibits 1A-9B |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit - Compliance Affidavit of Compliance |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Supporting Exhibit Affidavit of Compliance |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion for Entry of Judgment Foreclosing Right of Redemption | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Publication of Notice Certificate of Publication / The Enterprise 01-07 / 01-14 / 01-21-2022 |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit - Service Affidavit of Service |
|
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Posting Affidavit of Property Posting |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint to Foreclose Rights of Redemption | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return of Service - Served Return/Affidavit of Service |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed CC Copy of Notice to Defendants to Attorney for posting |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued (Service Event) - New Case Right of Redemption |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice For Publication Issued CC Copy of Notice of Order of Publication to Attorney for publishing |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Blank Notice for Order of Publication |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Blank Notice to Defendants |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Tax Property Section 14-833(a-1) & MD. R. Civ. Pro. 14-504 (c)(4) Affidavit |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Search Affidavit of Title Search |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint / Petition Complaint to Foreclose Rights of Redemption |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Supporting Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Tax Sale Certificate |