Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LVNV Funding LLC vs David Janaszak
On November 23, 2020 a conciliation case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Benton County, MN. Judge Jesse, Michael presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 23, 2020
Last Refreshed
November 03, 2023
Filing Location
Benton County, MN
Judge
Category
Conciliation
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
Satisfaction of Judgment Index 7
Date: Dec 09, 2021Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Jesse, Michael S. Index 5
Date: Jan 04, 2021Statement of Claim and Summons Index 1
Date: Nov 23, 2020Summons Index 3
Date: Nov 23, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Index #7 | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 7 | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Jesse, Michael S. Index #5 | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Filed By: Attorney HICKS, WILLIAM C; Defendant Janaszak, David Index #6 | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology Filed By: Attorney HICKS, WILLIAM C | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment Index # 5 (Judicial Officer: Jesse, Michael S. )
Judge: Jesse, Michael S. |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index # 6 | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment (Judicial Officer: Jesse, Michael S.)
Judge: Jesse, Michael S. |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim and Summons Index #1 | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Index #3 | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Instructions Provided Filed By: Attorney HICKS, WILLIAM C; Defendant Janaszak, David Index #4 | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Filed By: Defendant Janaszak, David Index #2 | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Instructions Provided Index # 4 | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons Index # 3 | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim and Summons Index # 1 | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Conciliation Court Served by First Class Mail by Ct Adm Index # 2 |