Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Granite City Plumbing Inc vs Tom Bourgoin, Amanda Bourgoin
On September 04, 2015 a conciliation case was filed in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN. Judge Schoffelman, Todd R. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 04, 2015
Last Refreshed
October 06, 2022
Filing Location
Chisago County, MN
Category
Conciliation
Case Outcome Type
Dismissal With Prejudice - Judgment
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Other Parties
Case Documents
Court Clerk Minutes
Date: Nov 24, 2015Order for Judgment
Date: Nov 24, 2015Notice of Hearing
Date: Sep 16, 2015Proposed Order or Document
Date: Sep 16, 2015Statement of Claim and Summons
Date: Sep 04, 2015Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment
Judge: Schoffelman, Todd R. |
|
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Court Clerk Minutes Index # 4 | |
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment Index # 5 (Judicial Officer: Schoffelman, Todd R. )
Judge: Schoffelman, Todd R. |
|
November 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Dismissal With Prejudice - Judgment (Judicial Officer: Schoffelman, Todd R.)
Judge: Schoffelman, Todd R. |
|
September 16, 2015 | hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document Index # 3 | |
September 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Index # 2 | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim and Summons | |
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Statement of Claim and Summons Index # 1 |