Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Sassaman, Megan Sue, filed a(n) Implied Consent case against Commissioner Of Public Safety, in the jurisdiction of Chisago County, MN, . Chisago County, MN Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryImplied Consent |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationChisago County, MN |
|
Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval
Date: October 19, 2021Notice of Judicial Determination
Date: October 20, 2021Implied Consent Petition
Date: June 11, 2021Affidavit of Service
Date: June 17, 2021Notice of Case Filing
Date: June 21, 2021Notice of Deficiency
Date: June 15, 2021Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions
Date: June 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Judicial Determination | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Judicial Determination Index # 9 | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Continuance Needing Judicial Approval Index # 8 | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 7 | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Using Remote Technology | |
August 19, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Filing | |
June 21, 2021 | Hearing | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions | |
June 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Filing Index # 5 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.