Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Hennepin County, MN, . Hennepin County, MN Superior Courts with Wahl, Edward Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 10, 2017 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedJuly 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationHennepin County, MN |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Notice of Deficiency
Date: June 26, 2019Notice to Authorize Release - Destroy Exhibit or Deposition
Date: December 26, 2019Notice to Authorize Release - Destroy Exhibit or Deposition
Date: February 10, 2020Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: June 21, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: May 16, 2019Judgment
Date: May 16, 2019Order for Judgment
Date: April 15, 2019Proposed Order or Document
Date: January 17, 2019Exhibit List
Date: December 28, 2018Proposed Order or Document
Date: January 15, 2019Order-Other
Date: December 20, 2018Exhibit List
Date: December 17, 2018Witness List
Date: December 17, 2018Other Document
Date: December 07, 2018Memorandum
Date: September 25, 2018Order for Trial
Date: November 20, 2018Affidavit-Other
Date: September 24, 2018Affidavit-Other
Date: September 19, 2018Proposed Order or Document
Date: September 14, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion
Date: September 14, 2018Memorandum
Date: September 19, 2018Affidavit-Other
Date: September 14, 2018Order-Other
Date: August 20, 2018Scheduling Order
Date: August 20, 2018Stipulation and Proposed Order
Date: August 13, 2018Memorandum
Date: July 19, 2018Other Document
Date: July 19, 2018Affidavit-Other
Date: July 19, 2018Notice of Case Reassignment
Date: June 15, 2018Amended Order
Date: June 14, 2018Affidavit-Other
Date: June 12, 2018Memorandum
Date: June 12, 2018Proposed Order or Document
Date: June 12, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion
Date: June 12, 2018Correspondence
Date: June 11, 2018Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: June 07, 2018Other Document
Date: May 08, 2018Memorandum
Date: May 08, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion
Date: May 08, 2018Correspondence
Date: May 03, 2018Affidavit-Other
Date: May 08, 2018Amended Order
Date: May 07, 2018Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: April 12, 2018Answer
Date: February 02, 2018Certificate of Representation
Date: February 02, 2018Civil Cover Sheet
Date: February 02, 2018Affidavit of Service
Date: January 19, 2018Order-Other
Date: December 11, 2017Affidavit of No Service
Date: December 12, 2017Notice of Case Assignment
Date: November 14, 2017Scheduling Order
Date: December 11, 2017Other Document
Date: November 10, 2017Summons and Complaint
Date: November 10, 2017Certificate of Representation
Date: November 10, 2017Correspondence for Judicial Approval
Date: June 21, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice to Authorize Release - Destroy Exhibit or Deposition | |
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice to Authorize Release - Destroy Exhibit or Deposition | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Deficiency | |
June 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Processed Judgment Entry | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment
Judge: Wahl, Edward Thomas |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Proposed Order or Document | |
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Taken Under Advisement
Judge: Wahl, Edward Thomas |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.