Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Brink, Sobolik, Severson, Malm & Albrecht, P.A., filed a(n) Conciliation case represented by Hane, Jeffrey Wallace - Lead Attorney, Lee, Richard Michael, against Lindegard, Ashley, in the jurisdiction of Kittson County, MN, . Kittson County, MN Superior Courts with Schieferdecker, Eric P. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2018 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKittson County, MN |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Order for Judgment and Judgment
Date: May 14, 2018Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: July 25, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: April 04, 2018Statement of Claim and Summons
Date: April 04, 2018Certify Personal Service
Date: May 09, 2018Notice of Filing of Order
Date: May 15, 2018Satisfaction of Judgment Index #8
Date: July 25, 2018Certify Personal Service Index #4
Date: May 09, 2018Statement of Claim and Summons Index #1
Date: April 04, 2018Certify Personal Service Index #5
Date: May 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Index #8 | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Plaintiff BRINK, SOBOLIK, SEVERSON, MALM & ALBRECHT, P.A.; Defendant Lindegard, Ashley Index #7 | |
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order for Judgment and Judgment
Judge: Schieferdecker, Eric P. |
|
May 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Schieferdecker, Eric P. Index #6 | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index #4 | |
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Certify Personal Service Index #5 | |
April 04, 2018 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.