Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
In Re the Guardianship of Roselin Elcin Jamieson, Minor Protected Person
On April 17, 2015 a guardianship/conservatorship case was filed by (Subcribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Kittson County, MN. Judge Dixon, Donna K. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 17, 2015
Last Refreshed
October 26, 2023
Filing Location
Kittson County, MN
Judge
Category
Guardianship/Conservatorship
Practice Area
Probate
Matter Type
Guardianship,Conservatorship
Case Outcome Type
Guardianship-person
Parties
Plaintiffs
Other Parties
Case Documents
Order Granting Guardianship
Date: May 19, 2015Notice of Filing of Order
Date: May 19, 2015Notice of Hearing
Date: Apr 20, 2015Order Granting In Forma Pauperis
Date: Apr 20, 2015Order Appointing Attorney
Date: Apr 20, 2015Order Appointing Visitor
Date: Apr 20, 2015Order Appointing Visitor Filed By: Name Not Available Online Index 5
Date: Apr 20, 2015Order Appointing Attorney Filed By: Attorney KNUTSON, TRACEY LYNN Index 6
Date: Apr 20, 2015Notice of Hearing Filed By: Ward Jamieson, Roselin Elcin Index 4
Date: Apr 20, 2015Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Judicial Officer: Dixon, Donna K. Index 3
Date: Apr 20, 2015Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Guardianship
Judge: Dixon, Donna K. |
|
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order Filed By: Petitioner HEWITT, JAMES EDWARD; Petitioner HEWITT, KELLI DEE; Name Not Available Online; Name Not Available Online; Attorney KNUTSON, TRACEY LYNN Index #14 | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Granting Guardianship Judicial Officer: Dixon, Donna K. Filed By: Petitioner HEWITT, JAMES EDWARD; Petitioner HEWITT, KELLI DEE Index #12 | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Letters of Guardianship Judicial Officer: Dixon, Donna K. Filed By: Petitioner HEWITT, JAMES EDWARD; Petitioner HEWITT, KELLI DEE Index #13 | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letters of Guardianship
Judge: Dixon, Donna K. |
|
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | DHS Background Check Filed By: Petitioner HEWITT, KELLI DEE Index #11 | |
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | DHS Background Check | |
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event | DHS Background Check Filed By: Petitioner HEWITT, JAMES EDWARD Index #10 | |
May 11, 2015 | Docket Event | DHS Background Check | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service Filed By: Ward Jamieson, Roselin Elcin Index #9 | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Visitor's Report Filed By: Name Not Available Online Index #8 | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
April 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Visitor's Report | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Acceptance and Oath Filed By: Name Not Available Online Index #7 | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Acceptance and Oath | |
April 20, 2015 | hearing | Notice of Hearing | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Granting In Forma Pauperis
Judge: Dixon, Donna K. |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Attorney | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Visitor | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Visitor Filed By: Name Not Available Online Index #5 | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Attorney Filed By: Attorney KNUTSON, TRACEY LYNN Index #6 | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed By: Ward Jamieson, Roselin Elcin Index #4 | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Order Granting In Forma Pauperis Judicial Officer: Dixon, Donna K. Index #3 | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Proceeding In Forma Pauperis Filed By: Petitioner HEWITT, JAMES EDWARD; Petitioner HEWITT, KELLI DEE Index #2 | |
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Proceeding In Forma Pauperis | |
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition for Guardianship Filed By: Petitioner HEWITT, JAMES EDWARD; Petitioner HEWITT, KELLI DEE Index #1 | |
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition for Guardianship |