Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Credit Service Intl Corp Assignee Of Skjeveland Enterprises, filed a(n) Conciliation case against Metro Exteriors Llc, in the jurisdiction of Waseca County, MN, . Waseca County, MN Superior Courts with Hanks, Carol M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2022 |
CategoryConciliation |
Last RefreshedOctober 24, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWaseca County, MN |
|
Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #11
Date: March 09, 2023Correspondence Index #6
Date: January 14, 2023Affidavit of Mailing Index #10
Date: March 01, 2023Power of Attorney Index #5
Date: January 14, 2023Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M Index #12
Date: March 10, 2023Statement of Claim Index #3
Date: December 16, 2022Affidavit of Mailing Index #4
Date: January 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Transcript of Judgment Issued Index #13 | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Judgment and Judgment Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M Index #12 | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing of Order and Entry of Judgment Index #11 | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Fail to Appear at a hearing Filed By: Defendant Metro Exteriors LLC | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Held Remote | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing Index #10 | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing Index # 10
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Filed By: Plaintiff Credit Service Intl Corp assignee of Skjeveland Enterprises; Defendant Metro Exteriors LLC Index #9 | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Filed By: Plaintiff Credit Service Intl Corp assignee of Skjeveland Enterprises; Defendant Metro Exteriors LLC Index #8 | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 9
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.