Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Eviction Hearing filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case in the jurisdiction of Waseca County, MN, . Waseca County, MN Superior Courts with Collins,Larry M. , presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 08, 2014 |
CategoryEviction (Ud) |
Last RefreshedOctober 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationWaseca County, MN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Bankruptcy Document Index # 17
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
November 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Index # 16
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Docketing of Judgment Index # 15
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Processed Judgment Docketing
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Identification of Judgment Debtor Index # 14
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
September 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Index # 13
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 12
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Processed Judgment Entry
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Discrepancy Index # 11
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 10
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.