Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Letters Issued - Unsupervised Formal filed a(n) Formal Unsupervised case in the jurisdiction of Waseca County, MN, . Waseca County, MN Superior Courts with Collins,Larry M. , presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 13, 2015 |
CategoryFormal Unsupervised |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWaseca County, MN |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of No Service Index # 25
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Statement to Close Index # 24
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 23
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
December 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Inventory Index # 22
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice-Other Index # 21
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
December 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Copy Request Index # 20
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Claims Due
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice-Other Index # 19
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 18
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
|
June 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letters Testamentary Index # 17 (Judicial Officer: Collins,Larry M. , )
Judge: Collins,Larry M. , |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.