Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
81-PR-21-910
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Waseca County, MN. Judge Hanks, Carol M presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 29, 2021
Last Refreshed
November 06, 2022
Filing Location
Waseca County, MN
Judge
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Using Remote Technology
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Examiner's Report Distributed (Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M )
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Examiner's Report Index # 48
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Provisional Discharge Index # 47
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Provisional Discharge Index # 46
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
April 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 45
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Apprehend and Hold Index # 44 (Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M )
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 42 (Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M )
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Revoke Provisional Discharge Index # 41
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certify Personal Service Index # 40
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 39
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Fail to Appear at a hearing
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
March 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Using Remote Technology
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Examiner's Report Distributed
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Examiner's Report Index # 38
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 37
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Continuance Index # 36
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
60-90 Day Commitment Report Index # 35
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 34
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
March 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Continuance Index # 33
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 32
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Examiner Index # 31 (Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M )
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 30
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons and Notice Index # 29
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 27
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Schedule Hearing
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 26 (Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M )
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Auth to Impose Treatment Neuroleptic Meds Index # 25
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Provisional Discharge Index # 24
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Provisional Discharge Index # 23
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 22
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Apprehension, Return of Resp on Unauth Absence Index # 21 (Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M )
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 19
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Revoke Provisional Discharge Index # 18
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Provisional Discharge Index # 17
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 16
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Recommitment Index # 15 (Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M )
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 13 (Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M )
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Recommitted - Mentally Ill (Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M) Commitment ( Commissioner of Human Services , 12 Mo , Conditions, other , 03/09/2022)
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Recommitted - Chemically Dependent (Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M) Commitment ( Commissioner of Human Services , 12 Mo , Conditions, other , 03/19/2022)
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Due [R] (Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M )
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Held Using Remote Technology
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Examiner's Report Distributed
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Examiner's Report Index # 12
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other Document Index # 11
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Index # 10
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing of Order Index # 9
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Apprehension, Confinement and Notice of Hrg Index # 8 (Judicial Officer: Hanks, Carol M )
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Remote Hearing with Instructions Index # 6
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition for Recommitment Index # 5
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Respondent's Rights Index # 2
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pre-Petition Screening Report Index # 3
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order or Document Index # 4
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Commitment Case Security Reviewed per 2015 Rules
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Index # 1
Judge: Hanks, Carol M |