Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
United Accounts Inc Bismarck North Dakota vs. Jennifer Job
A Contract / Collection case was filed in the jurisdiction of Kidder County, ND. Judge Schmitz, Jay A Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: United Accounts Inc Bismarck North DakotaDebtor: Jennifer Job (ActiveEntered: 02/24/2014Docketed: 02/24/2014, 2:23 PMDamages: $1,540.79Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 21, 2014
Last Refreshed
September 23, 2022
Filing Location
Kidder County, ND
Category
Contract / Collection
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Case Outcome Type
Money Judgment Entered
Status
Judgment (Other)
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 14 Satisfaction of Judgment Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 13 | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 11 Of Costs and Disbursements Of Costs and Disbursements |
|
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 12 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 2 Summons Summons |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 9 Order for Judgment Order for Judgment |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 8 Affidavit of Costs and Disbursements Affidavit of Costs and Disbursements |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 5 Affidavit of Default Affidavit of Default |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 6 Affidavit of Proof Affidavit of Proof |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 3 Sheriff's Return - Jennifer Job Sheriff's Return - Jennifer Job |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 10 Judgment Judgment |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Complaint Index # 1 Complaint Complaint |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 4 Affidavit of Identification Affidavit of Identification |
|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 7 Exhibit 1 - Assignment / A Lifetime of Smiles Exhibit 1 - Assignment / A Lifetime of Smiles |