Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Kidder County, ND, . Kidder County, ND Superior Courts with Schmitz, Jay A Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $20,856.91Creditor: Discover BankDebtor: Michelle F Burkett (ActiveEntered: 09/20/2019Docketed: 09/20/2019, 1:49 PMDamages: $20,846.91Current Costs Due: 02/14/2022, Execution, $10.00Interest Rate: 8.50% presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2019 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKidder County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 13 Execution of Judgment Execution of Judgment |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 12 Certificate of Service (Michelle F Burkett) Certificate of Service (Michelle F Burkett) |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 11 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 9 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 10 Default Judgment Default Judgment |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 2 Summons Summons |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 5 Affidavit of Costs and Disbursements Affidavit of Costs and Disbursements |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 3 Sheriffs Return(Michelle F Burkett) Sheriffs Return(Michelle F Burkett) |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 6 Proposed Order for Judgment - filed by Attorney for Plaintiff Proposed Order for Judgment - filed by Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 8 Exhibit 1 (Account Summary) Exhibit 1 (Account Summary) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.