Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jody Blackmoon, et al. vs. Matthew Wood, et al.
A Personal Injury case was filed in the jurisdiction of Sioux County, ND. Judge Daniel Borgen presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 15, 2020
Last Refreshed
August 08, 2023
Filing Location
Sioux County, ND
Judge
Category
Personal Injury
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Case Outcome Type
Dismissed
Status
Jury Verdict
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Index # 176 Unclaimed Unclaimed |
|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 175 Order Dismissing Action with Prejudice Order Dismissing Action with Prejudice |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 174 Declaration of Service - Dickson - Hoffman- Lefthand Declaration of Service - Dickson - Hoffman- Lefthand |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (3:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Borgen, Daniel) via ZOOM -meeting ID 880 2990 2088 - zoom.com or call 669-900-9128 Result: Hearing Ended via ZOOM -meeting ID 880 2990 2088 - zoom.com or call 669-900-9128 |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 173 Proposed Order Dismissing Action with Prejudice - Filed by Patrick Waters Proposed Order Dismissing Action with Prejudice - Filed by Patrick Waters |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Dismissed CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Borgen, Daniel) Dismissed JURY OF 9 - IN MORTON COUNTY 12/02/2021 Reset by Court to 02/15/2022 02/15/2022 Continued to 06/08/2022 - Continuance - Other - Blackmoon, Jody; Hodgkiss, Terry; Lefthand, William, Jr. 06/08/2022 Continued to 08/16/2022 - Continuance - Waiting for Report/Discover - Blackmoon, Jody; Hodgkiss, Terry; Lefthand, William, Jr. 08/16/2022 Continued to 10/25/2022 - Continuance - Attorney Not Available - Wood, Matthew 10/25/2022 Continued to 01/31/2023 - Continuance - Attorney Not Available - Wood, Matthew 01/31/2023 Reset by Court to 03/14/2023 |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Document Index # 171 | |
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 172 Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 170 - Remote Status Conference - ZOOM - Remote Status Conference - ZOOM |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 169 Order for Dismissal with Prejudice (Matthew Wood) Order for Dismissal with Prejudice (Matthew Wood) |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Index # 166 Motion to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 168 Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman & Attorney Waters Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman & Attorney Waters |
|
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 167 (Proposed) Order to Dismiss - Filed by Attorney Dickson (Proposed) Order to Dismiss - Filed by Attorney Dickson |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 165 Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 164 Order for Dismissal with Prejudice (Diamond Z) Order for Dismissal with Prejudice (Diamond Z) |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 161 (Proposed) Order to Dismiss with Prejudice - Filed by Attorney Dickson (Proposed) Order to Dismiss with Prejudice - Filed by Attorney Dickson |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 163 Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman and Attorney Waters Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman and Attorney Waters |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 162 (Proposed) Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice - Filed by Attorney Dickson (Proposed) Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice - Filed by Attorney Dickson |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation / Agreement Index # 160 Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 159 Declaration of Service - Dickson and Hoffman Declaration of Service - Dickson and Hoffman |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Statement Index # 158 Club Diamond Z's Statement of Defense Club Diamond Z's Statement of Defense |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Filing Index # 157 Club Diamond Z's Proposed Jury Instructions Club Diamond Z's Proposed Jury Instructions |
|
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 156 Declaration of Service - Dickson and Hoffman Declaration of Service - Dickson and Hoffman |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 155 Certificate of Service tdickson@discksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) Certificate of Service tdickson@discksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) |
|
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Index # 154 Defendant Wood's Response to Plaintiffs' Amended Discovery Requests No. 4 (M. Hoffman) Defendant Wood's Response to Plaintiffs' Amended Discovery Requests No. 4 (M. Hoffman) |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 153 Order Granting Continuance Order Granting Continuance |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 152 Order Changing Venue Order Changing Venue |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Scheduling Change Index # 151 Amended Notice of Trial Amended Notice of Trial |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 150 Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman & Attorney Waters Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman & Attorney Waters |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 149 (Proposed) Order Granting Continuance - Filed by Attorney Dickson (Proposed) Order Granting Continuance - Filed by Attorney Dickson |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 148 (Proposed) Order Changing Venue - Filed by Attorney Dickson (Proposed) Order Changing Venue - Filed by Attorney Dickson |
|
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion/Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Borgen, Daniel) in MORTON - Motion in Limine Result: Hearing Ended in MORTON - Motion in Limine |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 147 Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman and Attorney Waters Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman and Attorney Waters |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Index # 145 Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of Motion in Limine Plaintiff's Reply Brief in Support of Motion in Limine |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 146 Exhibit 1 - January 17, 2023 Letter from FBI Exhibit 1 - January 17, 2023 Letter from FBI |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 144 Declaration of Service - Dickson and Hoffman Declaration of Service - Dickson and Hoffman |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Index # 143 Defendant Club Diamond Z s Response to Motion in Limine Defendant Club Diamond Z s Response to Motion in Limine |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 142 Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com, patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com, patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Index # 141 Defendant Wood's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine (M. Hoffman) Defendant Wood's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine (M. Hoffman) |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 140 - Motion Hearing - Motion Hearing |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 137 Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion in Limine |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 139 Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman & Attorney Waters Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman & Attorney Waters |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request for Hearing Index # 138 Request for Hearing Request for Hearing |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Index # 132 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine (M. Hoffman) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine (M. Hoffman) |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 136 Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman and Attorney Waters Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman and Attorney Waters |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service of Motion Index # 134 Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 133 Order Granting Motion for Extenseion of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine (M. Hoffman) Order Granting Motion for Extenseion of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine (M. Hoffman) |
|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response Index # 135 Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service of Motion Index # 131 Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman & Attorney Waters Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman & Attorney Waters |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 129 Exhibit C - Evidence Receipt Exhibit C - Evidence Receipt |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 130 Exhibit D - Toxicology Alcohol/Volatiles Analytical Report Exhibit D - Toxicology Alcohol/Volatiles Analytical Report |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 128 Exhibit B - 09/26/19 FBI Report Exhibit B - 09/26/19 FBI Report |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 127 Exhibit A - Case Report Exhibit A - Case Report |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Brief Index # 126 Brief in Support of Motion in Limine Brief in Support of Motion in Limine |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Index # 125 Motion in Limine Motion in Limine |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 124 Notice of Motion Notice of Motion |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Borgen, Daniel) 10/25/2022, 10/26/2022 JURY OF 9 12/02/2021 Reset by Court to 02/15/2022 02/15/2022 Continued to 06/08/2022 - Continuance - Other - Blackmoon, Jody; Hodgkiss, Terry; Lefthand, William, Jr. 06/08/2022 Continued to 08/16/2022 - Continuance - Waiting for Report/Discover - Blackmoon, Jody; Hodgkiss, Terry; Lefthand, William, Jr. 08/16/2022 Continued to 10/25/2022 - Continuance - Attorney Not Available - Wood, Matthew | |
September 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Scheduling Change Index # 123 Order Restting Jury Trial - with dates Order Restting Jury Trial - with dates |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 122 Order for Reset (M. Hoffman) Order for Reset (M. Hoffman) |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 121 Request for Resetting Trial/Hearing (M. Hoffman) Request for Resetting Trial/Hearing (M. Hoffman) |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 120 Order Allowing Withdrawel of Counsel - Attorney Dickson Order Allowing Withdrawel of Counsel - Attorney Dickson |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Receipt Index # 119 Return Receipt - William Lefthand, Jr. Return Receipt - William Lefthand, Jr. |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 116 Notice of Withdrawal Notice of Withdrawal |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 117 (Proposed) Order Allowing Withdrawal of Counsel - Filed by Attorney Dickson (Proposed) Order Allowing Withdrawal of Counsel - Filed by Attorney Dickson |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service of Motion Index # 118 Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman, Attoney Waters & William Lefthand Jr. Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman, Attoney Waters & William Lefthand Jr. |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 113 Notice of Motion Notice of Motion |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Index # 114 Motion to Withdraw Motion to Withdraw |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 115 Exhibit A - Declaration of Thomas A. Dickson Exhibit A - Declaration of Thomas A. Dickson |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response Index # 111 Defendant Matthew Wood's Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Request No. 3 (M. Hoffman) Defendant Matthew Wood's Response to Plaintiff's Discovery Request No. 3 (M. Hoffman) |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 112 Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Scheduling Change Index # 110 - Order Resetting Trial - with date - Order Resetting Trial - with date |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 109 Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman & Attorney Waters Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman & Attorney Waters |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response Index # 108 Plaintiffs' Response to Request for Resetting Trial Plaintiffs' Response to Request for Resetting Trial |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 107 Order for Reset (M. Hoffman) Order for Reset (M. Hoffman) |
|
June 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 106 Request for Reset (M. Hoffman) Request for Reset (M. Hoffman) |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Scheduling Change Index # 105 Order Resetting Trial - with dates Order Resetting Trial - with dates |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response Index # 101 Defendant Club Diamond Z s Response to Request for Resetting Trial Defendant Club Diamond Z s Response to Request for Resetting Trial |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 102 Declaration of Service - Dickson and Hoffman Declaration of Service - Dickson and Hoffman |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 104 Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) |
|
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response Index # 103 Defendant Wood's Response to Plaintiffs' Request for Resetting Trial (M. Hoffman) Defendant Wood's Response to Plaintiffs' Request for Resetting Trial (M. Hoffman) |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 100 Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman & Attorney Waters Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman & Attorney Waters |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 99 (Proposed) Order - Filed by Attorney Dickson (Proposed) Order - Filed by Attorney Dickson |
|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 98 Request for Resetting Trial Request for Resetting Trial |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 97 Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 95 Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response Index # 96 Defendant Wood's Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Jury Instructions (M. Hoffman) Defendant Wood's Objections to Plaintiffs' Proposed Jury Instructions (M. Hoffman) |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Instructions Index # 94 Defendant Wood's Proposed Jury Instructions (M. Hoffman) Defendant Wood's Proposed Jury Instructions (M. Hoffman) |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 93 Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) |
|
May 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer Index # 92 Answer (M. Hoffman) Answer (M. Hoffman) |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 91 Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman & Attorney Waters Declaration of Service - Attorney Hoffman & Attorney Waters |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Instructions Index # 89 Plaintiffs' Proposed Jury Instructions Plaintiffs' Proposed Jury Instructions |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Civil Filing Index # 90 Plaintiffs' Special Verdict Form Plaintiffs' Special Verdict Form |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pretrial Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Borgen, Daniel) via ZOOM - meeting ID 840 5815 5098- zoom.com or call 669-900-9128 11/02/2021 Reset by Court to 01/31/2022 01/31/2022 Continued to 05/12/2022 - Continuance - Other - Blackmoon, Jody; Hodgkiss, Terry; Lefthand, William, Jr. Result: Hearing Ended via ZOOM - meeting ID 840 5815 5098- zoom.com or call 669-900-9128 |
|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 88 Declaration of Service - Dickson and Hoffman Declaration of Service - Dickson and Hoffman |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Scheduling Change Index # 87 - Remote Hearing - Pretrial Conference - ZOOM - Remote Hearing - Pretrial Conference - ZOOM |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 86 Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com (M. Hoffman) Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com (M. Hoffman) |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Filing Index # 84 Admission of Service (M. Hoffman) Admission of Service (M. Hoffman) |
|
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Filing Index # 85 Objection to Subpoena Duces Tecum (M. Hoffman) Objection to Subpoena Duces Tecum (M. Hoffman) |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Scheduling Change Index # 83 Amended Notice of Trial and Pretrial Conference Amended Notice of Trial and Pretrial Conference |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 82 Order for Extension of Time in Which to Complete Factual Discovery Order for Extension of Time in Which to Complete Factual Discovery |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Scheduling Change Index # 81 - Remote Hearing - Pretrial Conference - ZOOM - Remote Hearing - Pretrial Conference - ZOOM |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response Index # 79 Defendant Wood's Response to second Motion for Extension (M. Hoffman) Defendant Wood's Response to second Motion for Extension (M. Hoffman) |
|
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 80 Certificate of Service tdicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) Certificate of Service tdicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Index # 77 Second Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Complete Factual Discovery Second Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Complete Factual Discovery |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 78 Proposed Order filed by Plaintiffs' Attorney Thomas A. Dickson Proposed Order filed by Plaintiffs' Attorney Thomas A. Dickson |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 75 Affidavit of Service - Hoffman and Waters Affidavit of Service - Hoffman and Waters |
|
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 76 Notice of Motion Notice of Motion |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 74 Amended Order Amended Order |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 73 Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Scheduling Change Index # 70 - Amended Pretrial Conference - Amended Pretrial Conference |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response Index # 72 Defendant Matthew Wood's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension (M. Hoffman) Defendant Matthew Wood's Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension (M. Hoffman) |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Scheduling Change Index # 71 - Amended Jury Trial - Amended Jury Trial |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Assignment Index # 69 of Judge Daniel Borgen of Judge Daniel Borgen |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 68 Declaration of Service - Dickson and Hoffman Declaration of Service - Dickson and Hoffman |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Demand for Change of Judge Index # 67 Defendant Club Diamond Z's Demand for Change of Judge - Filed by Patrick Waters Defendant Club Diamond Z's Demand for Change of Judge - Filed by Patrick Waters |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Index # 66 | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 65 Proposed Amended Order filed by Plaintiffs' Attorney Thomas A. Dickson Proposed Amended Order filed by Plaintiffs' Attorney Thomas A. Dickson |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 64 Affidavit of Service - Hoffman and Waters Affidavit of Service - Hoffman and Waters |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Index # 62 Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Complete Factual Discovery Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Complete Factual Discovery |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 63 Proposed Order filed by Plaintiffs' Attorney Thomas A. Dickson Proposed Order filed by Plaintiffs' Attorney Thomas A. Dickson |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service of Motion Index # 60 Affidavit of Service - Hoffman and Waters Affidavit of Service - Hoffman and Waters |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 61 Notice of Motion Notice of Motion |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 59 Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com patrick@heartlandlawoffice.com (M. Hoffman) |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 58 Stipulated Discovery Order and Protective Order (M. Hoffman) Stipulated Discovery Order and Protective Order (M. Hoffman) |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response Index # 57 Defendant Matthew Wood's Response to Plaintiff's' Discovery Requests No. 2 (M. Hoffman) Defendant Matthew Wood's Response to Plaintiff's' Discovery Requests No. 2 (M. Hoffman) |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 56 Declaration of Service - Dickson and Hoffman Declaration of Service - Dickson and Hoffman |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation / Agreement Index # 55 Stipulation Stipulation |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 54 Affidavit of Service - Hoffman and Waters Affidavit of Service - Hoffman and Waters |
|
April 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 53 Declaration of Service - Dickson Declaration of Service - Dickson |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 52 Affidavit of Service - Michael Hoffman and Patrick Waters Affidavit of Service - Michael Hoffman and Patrick Waters |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 51 - Pretrial Conference - Pretrial Conference |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 50 - Jury Trial - Jury Trial |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order Index # 49 | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 48 Proposed Stipulation for Discovery and Scheduling Plan and Order Proposed Stipulation for Discovery and Scheduling Plan and Order |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 47 Affidavit of Service - Michael Hoffman and Patrick Waters Affidavit of Service - Michael Hoffman and Patrick Waters |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 46 Order Canceling December 21, 2020 Hearing Order Canceling December 21, 2020 Hearing |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion/Hearing Per Judge CANCELED Motion/Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Grinsteiner, John) Per Judge ZOOM meeting ID 896 1871 8734 OR call 669-900-9128 OR 646-558-8656 10/23/2020 Continued to 12/08/2020 - Continuance - COVID-19 - Blackmoon, Jody; Hodgkiss, Terry; Lefthand, William, Jr. 12/08/2020 Continued to 12/21/2020 - Continuance - Other - Club Diamond Z, Inc. d/b/a Diamond Z Bar and Grill |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Index # 44 Motion to Withdraw Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment Motion to Withdraw Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 45 Proposed Order filed by Plaintiffs' Attorney Thomas A. Dickson Proposed Order filed by Plaintiffs' Attorney Thomas A. Dickson |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 42 Affidavit of Service - Michael Hoffman and Patrick Waters Affidavit of Service - Michael Hoffman and Patrick Waters |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 40 of Rule 16 of Rule 16 |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 43 Notice of Motion Notice of Motion |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 41 Certificate of Service - Dickson Certificate of Service - Dickson |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 39 Order Granting Request for Resetting of Motion Hearing Order Granting Request for Resetting of Motion Hearing |
|
December 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Scheduling Change Index # 38 - Amended Motion Hearing - ZOOM - Amended Motion Hearing - ZOOM |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response Index # 37 Plaintiffs' Response to Request for Resetting of Motion Hearing Due to Lack of Notice Plaintiffs' Response to Request for Resetting of Motion Hearing Due to Lack of Notice |
|
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 36 Affidavit of Service - Michael Hoffman and Patrick Waters Affidavit of Service - Michael Hoffman and Patrick Waters |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Response Index # 35 Response to Motion for Default Judgment - Filed by Patrick Waters Response to Motion for Default Judgment - Filed by Patrick Waters |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 33 Proposed Order on Request for Resetting of Motion Hearing Due to Lack of Notice - Filed by Patrick Waters Proposed Order on Request for Resetting of Motion Hearing Due to Lack of Notice - Filed by Patrick Waters |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 34 Certificate of Service - Dickson and Hoffman Certificate of Service - Dickson and Hoffman |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 30 Notice of Appearance - Filed by Patrick Waters Notice of Appearance - Filed by Patrick Waters |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 32 Request for Resetting of Motion Hearing Due to Lack of Notice - Filed by Patrick Waters Request for Resetting of Motion Hearing Due to Lack of Notice - Filed by Patrick Waters |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer Index # 31 Answer to Complaint - Filed by Patrick Waters Answer to Complaint - Filed by Patrick Waters |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 28 Exhibit B - Obituary for Arlene Hodgkiss Exhibit B - Obituary for Arlene Hodgkiss |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 29 Exhibit C - Obituary of William Left Hand Exhibit C - Obituary of William Left Hand |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 27 Exhibit A - Medical Expenses, PIP, and Lien Summary for Jody Blackmoon Exhibit A - Medical Expenses, PIP, and Lien Summary for Jody Blackmoon |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 26 Affidavit of Service - Michael Hoffman Affidavit of Service - Michael Hoffman |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Scheduling Change Index # 25 - Remote Motion Hearing - ZOOM - Remote Motion Hearing - ZOOM |
|
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Scheduling Change Index # 24 - Order Resetting Hearing - with date - Order Resetting Hearing - with date |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 23 Proposed Order filed by Plaintiffs' Attorney, Thomas A. Dickson Proposed Order filed by Plaintiffs' Attorney, Thomas A. Dickson |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 21 Affidavit of Service - Michael Hoffman Affidavit of Service - Michael Hoffman |
|
October 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 22 Request for Resetting Hearing Request for Resetting Hearing |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 20 - Motion Hearing - Motion Hearing |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment and Case Number Index # 19 | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 18 Sheriff's Return Sheriff's Return |
|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 16 Notice of Appearance as Counsel (M. Hoffman) Notice of Appearance as Counsel (M. Hoffman) |
|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 17 Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com (M. Hoffman) Certificate of Service tdickson@dicksonlaw.com (M. Hoffman) |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 14 Affidavit of Service - Matthew Wood and Raymond Luger Affidavit of Service - Matthew Wood and Raymond Luger |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 15 Amended Affidavit of Identification and No Answer Amended Affidavit of Identification and No Answer |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Index # 13 Letter to Matthew Wood and Raymond Luger Letter to Matthew Wood and Raymond Luger |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Index # 7 Motion for Default Judgment Motion for Default Judgment |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request for Hearing Index # 11 Request for Hearing Request for Hearing |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 9 Affidavit of Identification and No Answer Affidavit of Identification and No Answer |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Brief Index # 8 Brief in Support of Motion for Default Judgment Brief in Support of Motion for Default Judgment |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 12 Notice of Filing Complaint Notice of Filing Complaint |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 10 Affidavit of Non-Military Status Affidavit of Non-Military Status |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 6 Notice of Motion Notice of Motion |
|
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service of Motion Index # 5 Affidavit of Service - Matthew Wood and Raymond Luger Affidavit of Service - Matthew Wood and Raymond Luger |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Complaint Index # 2 Complaint Complaint |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 3 Affidavit of Personal Service - Matthew Wood Affidavit of Personal Service - Matthew Wood |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 1 Summons Summons |
|
June 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 4 Sheriff's Return - Raymond Luger - Club Diamond Z, Inc., d/b/a Diamond Z Bar and Grill Sheriff's Return - Raymond Luger - Club Diamond Z, Inc., d/b/a Diamond Z Bar and Grill |