Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Traill County, ND, . Traill County, ND Superior Courts with Griffeth, Scott presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2015 |
CategoryChild Support |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationTraill County, ND |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeTranscript Filed (Child Support) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 38 hrg. on 6/26/17 hrg. on 6/26/17 |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Child Support Order to Show Cause (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Solheim, Susan) calling Sarah Bennett (701) 219-4763 calling Sarah Bennett (701) 219-4763 |
|
June 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Index # 37 | |
March 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter Index # 36 from Eric re: request to be released from jail for child support from Eric re: request to be released from jail for child support |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 35 Personal service with Warrant of Commitment on Eric Grant on 03/09/17 at 2:10 PM Personal service with Warrant of Commitment on Eric Grant on 03/09/17 at 2:10 PM |
|
November 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Warrant of Commitment Issued Index # 34 | |
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Index # 33 for Sara Bennett for Sara Bennett |
|
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Information Index # 32 from Eric regarding making payments from Eric regarding making payments |
|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter Index # 31 from Referee Solheim to Eric Grant from Referee Solheim to Eric Grant |
|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Letter Index # 30 from Eric Grant to Referee Solheim from Eric Grant to Referee Solheim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.