Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Oklahoma County, OK, . Oklahoma County, OK Superior Courts with Roma M. McElwee presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2017 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOklahoma County, OK |
|
DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: April 30, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: REETA TAISAGUE - UNABLE TO LOCATE
Date: June 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
June 08, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED ON: REETA TAISAGUE - UNABLE TO LOCATE | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVELY REASSIGNED BY AOC MIS PER HELP DESK CONTACT HD74092 | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVELY REASSIGNED BY AOC MIS PER HELP DESK CONTACT 70834 | |
November 02, 2017 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATIVELY REASSIGNED BY AOC MIS PER HELP DESK CONTACT 68315 | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COURTHOUSE SECURITY PER BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONER | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | SUMMONS FEE (CLERKS FEE) | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS | |
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event | OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE MCELWEE, ROMA M. TO THIS CASE. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.