Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TR-2024-31
A case was filed in the jurisdiction of Roger Mills County, OK. Judge F. Pat VerSteeg presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 20, 2024
Last Refreshed
March 19, 2024
Filing Location
Roger Mills County, OK
Judge
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT SENT TO D.P.S. | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | LAW LIBRARY FEE | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | DPS PATROL VEHICLE FUND FEE ASSESSMENT | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | COST ADMINISTRATION PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT SET AT $50.00, ONCE A MONTH, BEGINNING 4/20/2024 - PP-RM-2024-9 | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | FORENSIC SCIENCE IMPROVEMENT ASSESSMENT | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | SHERIFF’S SERVICE FEE FOR COURT HOUSE SECURITY | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | TRAFFIC COSTS | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | TRAUMA CARE ASSISTANCE REVOLVING FUND | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | COST ADMINISTRATION PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | DA COUNCIL PROSECUTION ASSESSMENT FOR TRAFFIC | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | F. Pat VerSteeg , JUDGE: CASE DISPOSED. CONVICTION. | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT CLERK ADMINISTRATIVE FEE ON COLLECTIONS | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S SERVICE FEE ON ARRESTS | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | DISTRICT COURT ADMINISTRATIVE FEE | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | AFIS FEE | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM REVOLVING FUND | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | CLEET PENALTY ASSESSMENT | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | C.H.A.B. STATUTORY FEE | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | FINES PAYABLE TO COUNTY | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | TRAFFIC FILING - SPEEDING 21-25 MPH OVER | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | OCIS HAS AUTOMATICALLY ASSIGNED JUDGE VERSTEEG, F. PAT TO THIS CASE. |