Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CF-2023-00051
A case was filed in the jurisdiction of Stephens County, OK. Judge G. Brent Russell presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 28, 2023
Last Refreshed
December 06, 2023
Filing Location
Stephens County, OK
Judge
Case Documents
TRIAL DOCKETING ORDER
Date: Aug 25, 2023COURT MINUTE: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY: CASE SET FOR JURY
Date: Aug 25, 2023DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR DISCOVERY AB
Date: Aug 11, 2023SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. (KANEHL OUT, BURNS IN) AB
Date: Aug 11, 2023TRANSCRIPT OF EXAMINING MAGISTRATE: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR
Date: Aug 08, 2023AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL INFO FOR AFCF 2 OR MORE AB
Date: Aug 07, 2023AMENDED INFORMATION (CT 1) AB
Date: Aug 07, 2023SUBPOENA RETD SERVED (A. BRAY, B. EADES) 6/9/23 AY
Date: Jun 12, 2023ISSUE SUBPOENA (A. BRAY, B. EADES) TA
Date: Jun 08, 2023PRELIMINARY HEARING CONFERENCE JOURNAL ENTRY SETTING
Date: Jun 07, 2023ORDER OF RELEASE RET RELEASED DEFT 3/28/23 DK
Date: Mar 31, 2023INCARCERATION FEE STATEMENT (3 DAYS) DK
Date: Mar 31, 2023INFORMATION 2/1/09 CT 1 DK
Date: Mar 28, 2023ISSUE RELEASE AB
Date: Mar 28, 2023APPEARANCE BOND AB
Date: Mar 28, 2023INITIAL APPEARANCE BEFORE A MAGISTRATE SUMMARY OF
Date: Mar 28, 2023ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (KANEHL) DK
Date: Mar 28, 2023AFFIDAVIT JH DK
Date: Mar 28, 2023SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FOR AFTER FORMER CONVICTION OF
Date: Mar 28, 2023INFORMATION 2/1/09 CT 1 DK
Date: Mar 28, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER TO REAPPEAR ON 03/13/24 @ 9AM FOR FELONY | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCOVERY ORDER GBR BL | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
JURY FEE 7/1/07 OCIS EFFECTIVE 7-1-07 DOCKET GBR VL |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event | TRIAL DOCKETING ORDER | |
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
COURT MINUTE: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY: CASE SET FOR JURY TRIAL 01/22/24 @ 9:00AM FELONY DOCKET CALL 12/06/23 @ 9AM GBR VL |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
JURY FEE 7/1/07 OCIS EFFECTIVE 7-1-07 |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY AND BRIEF IN SUPPORT VL | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DISCOVERY AB | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. (KANEHL OUT, BURNS IN) AB | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
TRANSCRIPT OF EXAMINING MAGISTRATE: ARRAIGNMENT SET FOR 8-24-23 @ 9:00 AM JH AB OCIS FEE EFFECTIVE 7-1-07 |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT REPORTER FEE | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL INFO FOR AFCF 2 OR MORE AB | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED INFORMATION (CT 1) AB | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RET'D SERVED (A. BRAY, B. EADES) 6/9/23 AY | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | ISSUE SUBPOENA (A. BRAY, B. EADES) TA | |
June 07, 2023 | hearing |
PRELIMINARY HEARING CONFERENCE JOURNAL ENTRY SETTING FOR 08/07/2023 @ 2:00 PM JWH/LG (Entry with fee only) |
|
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER OF RELEASE RET RELEASED DEFT 3/28/23 DK | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
INCARCERATION FEE STATEMENT (3 DAYS) DK (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | INFORMATION 2/1/09 CT 1 DK | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ISSUE RELEASE AB | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE BOND AB | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
INITIAL APPEARANCE BEFORE A MAGISTRATE SUMMARY OF FACTS: BOND SET @ $50,000. PHC 6-7-23 @ 9:00 AM. *NO INTOXICANTS, OBEY ALL LAWS AT ALL LEVELS & KEEP COUNSEL RETAINED* JH AB BONDSMAN NAME: RANDY CAIN POWER NUMBER: PROF. BOND AMT.: $50,000 |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY OF APPEARANCE (KANEHL) DK | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT JH DK | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION FOR AFTER FORMER CONVICTION OF | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
MULTIPLE COUNT (TITLE 47-TRAFFIC) 2/1/09 CT 2 (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) DPVF 7/1/01 10% RV CLEET 10% CLEET AFIS 10% AFIS FORE 7/1/01 10% FO10 DARF (TRAFFIC TITLE 47) 11/1/04 10% DARF TRAUMA CARE REVOLVING FUND 6/3/04 10% TRCV OCIS 7/1/07 SHERIFF SERVICE FEE-COURTHOUSE SECURITY SUB ACCOUNT 11/1/06 10% OF COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT 7/1/07 10% OF AG VICTIM SERVICES FEE CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY ACCOUNT 7/1/07 10% OF CAMA FEE 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND A FELONY DK |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
INFORMATION 2/1/09 CT 1 DK (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) OKLAHOMA COURT INFORMATION SYSTEM FEE - EFFECTIVE 07/01/07 CLEET 11-1-04 (FINE OF $10.00 OR MORE) 10% CLEET 7-1-04 AFIS (FINE OF $10.00 OR MORE) 10% AFIS FORENSIC FEE (FINE OF $10.00 OR MORE) 7/1/01 10% FO10 MEDICAL EXPENSE LIABILITY (FINE OF $10.00 OR MORE) 8/29/03 10% MEL DA REVOLVING FUND FEE 11/1/04 10% DARF SHERIFF SERVICE FEE-COURTHOUSE SECURITY SUB ACCOUNT 11/1/06 10% OF COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT 7/1/07 10% OF AG VICTIM SERVICES FEE CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY ACCOUNT 7/1/07 10% OF CAMA FEE 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND (Entry with fee only) (Entry with fee only) DPVF 7/1/01 10% RV CLEET 10% CLEET AFIS 10% AFIS FORE 7/1/01 10% FO10 DARF (TRAFFIC TITLE 47) 11/1/04 10% DARF TRAUMA CARE REVOLVING FUND 6/3/04 10% TRCV OCIS 7/1/07 SHERIFF SERVICE FEE-COURTHOUSE SECURITY SUB ACCOUNT 11/1/06 10% OF COURTHOUSE SECURITY FEE ATTORNEY GENERAL VICTIM SERVICES UNIT 7/1/07 10% OF AG VICTIM SERVICES FEE CHILD ABUSE MULTIDISCIPLINARY ACCOUNT 7/1/07 10% OF CAMA FEE 15% TO DISTRICT COURT REVOLVING FUND A FELONY DK |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | MULTIPLE COUNT (TITLE 47-TRAFFIC) 2/1/09 CT 2 |