Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ERIKA SANDERS V JASON SANDERS -NON-TRIAL
On February 10, 2015 a dv - divorce case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Craighead County, AR.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 10, 2015
Last Refreshed
October 09, 2022
Filing Location
Craighead County, AR
Category
DV - DIVORCE
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2015 | Docket Event | DECREE OF DIVORCE | |
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL | |
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event | DIVORCE/ANNULMENT INFO | |
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event | MOD DIVORCE GRANTED | |
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event | WAIVER | |
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION SHEET | |
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | MOF ORIGINAL | |
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET DOMESTIC REL | |
February 10, 2015 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT/PETITION FILED |