Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ditech Financial Llc, Ditech Financial, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against United States Attorney, Hilton, Belinda D., Tenants Of, Wendel, Ronnie D., Usaa Federal Savings Bank, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Lonoke County, AR, . Lonoke County, AR Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2016 |
CategoryFc - Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLonoke County, AR |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | COMMISSIONERS DEED | |
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER DISBURSE FUNDS | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | COMMISSIONERS SALE NOTICE | |
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER CONFIRMING SALE | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING - OTHER | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
February 12, 2019 | Docket Event | COMMISSIONERS SALE NOTICE | |
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.