Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KAREN SHIPLEY V ELLEN BROWN -BENCH TRIAL
On August 21, 2020 a qt - real property - other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Saline County, AR.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 21, 2020
Last Refreshed
August 16, 2023
Filing Location
Saline County, AR
Category
QT - REAL PROPERTY - OTHER
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
General Property
Status
Appealed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ACCOUNTING | |
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DISBURSE FUNDS | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION OTHER | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | OPINION - OTHER | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | MANDATE | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION OTHER | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED MOTION | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | REPLY BRIEF | |
May 03, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION OTHER | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED | |
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OTHER | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO COURT | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE/REPLY | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TO COURT | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE/REPLY | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION MODIFY FINAL ORDER | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | AOC DISPOSITION SHEET | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | MOD JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT/DECREE/ORDER | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGE NOTE | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION FILED | |
November 15, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION OTHER | |
November 15, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE/REPLY | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE/REPLY | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COUNTER CLAIM | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | COUNTERCLAIM | |
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE - OTHER | |
September 28, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM COURT | |
September 09, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER TO COURT | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | AMENDED ANSWER | |
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event | EFILING NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
August 26, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER FILED | |
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | TRANSFER IN | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | AOC COVERSHEET CIVIL | |
August 21, 2020 | Docket Event | MOF TRANSFER |