Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GALLAGHER BASSET SERVICES INC VS DESSIE C ZALENSY. ET AL.
On January 27, 2011 a misc complaints - other case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Sacramento County. Judge Pamela L. Smith-Steward presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 27, 2011
Last Refreshed
March 12, 2022
Filing Location
Sacramento County, CA
Judge
Hon. Pamela L. Smith-Steward
Category
Civil - Unlimited
Status
Judgment (Other)
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. |
|
May 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Zalensy, Dessie Ceceal Application for Waiver granted in full on 05/06/2011 . | |
May 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion - Other (Mtn to vacate judgment and declaration) submitted by Zalensy, Dessie Ceceal rejected on 05/03/2011 . |
|
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Request to Waive Court Fee (FW-001) submitted by Zalensy, Dessie Ceceal rejected on 04/14/2011 . |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion to Set Aside Judgment submitted by Zalensy, Dessie Ceceal rejected on 03/28/2011 . |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Denied) filed. |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Zalensy, Dessie Ceceal Application for Waiver denied in whole on 03/28/2011 . | |
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed. |
|
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed. |
|
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued |
|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Renewal of Judgment filed. |
|
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Application for Renewal of Judgment filed. |
|
February 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest submitted by Gallagher Basset Services Inc rejected on 02/04/2011 . |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Application for Renewal of Judgment submitted by Gallagher Basset Services Inc rejected on 01/27/2011 . |
|
April 25, 2002 | hearing |
Status Conference - Civil Special Sets Heard |