Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Balboa Collection Services Os San Luis Obispo Iinc, Rosana Maria E. Aka Rosana Maria Luisa, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hopkins Cameron A Esq, against Rosana Maria E. Aka Rosana Maria Luisa, represented by Goldberg Alan M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Judith Abrams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2002 |
CategoryCollections Case - Purchased Debt (Charged Off Consumer Debt Purchased On Or After January 1,2014) (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2013 | Docket Event | * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE CHATSWORTH COURTHOUSE | |
April 01, 2013 | Docket Event | * EFFECTIVE 04/29/2013 | |
April 01, 2013 | Docket Event | * CASE RENUMBERED FROM BH 02C00520 TO CHA02CB0520 | |
July 21, 2003 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR RECORD OF TRANSFER FILED. NEW CASE NUMBER 03K11970 . | |
May 22, 2003 | Docket Event | PURSUANT TO ORDER FOR TRANSFER AND FEES HAVING BEEN PAID, ENTIRE FILE FORWARDED TO THE LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR CENTRAL LIMITED JURISDICTION COURT VIA ISD MESSENGER . RECEIPT # NO FEE REQ'D . | |
May 13, 2003 | Docket Event | MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 06/12/03 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 006 . | |
May 13, 2003 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 006 , HON. JUDGE JUDITH ABRAMS PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: COURT TRIAL AND STIPULATION TO TRANSFER ACTION; . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THE COURT TRIAL IS ORDERED OFF CALENDAR AND PURSUANT TO ORAL STIPULATION THE COMPLAINT IS ORDER TRANSFERED TO CENTRAL DISTRICT SUPERIOR COURT. COUNSEL FOR CROSS-DEFENDANT JOEL BANDER TO PAY TRANSFER FEES, THIS MATTER IS CONTINUED TO 06/12/03 AT 08:30AM IN DIV. 006 FOR HEARING RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO PAY TRANSFER FEES. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE. | |
May 08, 2003 | Docket Event | CROSS-COMPLAINT AND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT TRANSFERRED TO LASC-CENTRAL DISTRICT- WERE RETURNED TO OUR CASE FILE. | |
April 14, 2003 | Docket Event | CROSS-COMPLAINT AND AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY MARIA E. ROSANA WAS RULED AND SEVERED AND TRANSFERRED TO LOS ANGELES SUPERIOR COURT, LIMITED CIVIL JURISDICTION, VIA ISD MESSENGER. | |
March 05, 2003 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 006 , HON. JUDGE JUDITH ABRAMS PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE CAUSE RE DISMISSAL; . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THIS MATTER IS SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON MAY 13, 2003 AT 08:30AM IN DIV. 006. NOTICE IS WAIVED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.