Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Roney Buffy Lyn, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Mcguire James E., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Judith Abrams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 13, 2002 |
CategoryBreach Contract (Limited Jurisdiction) |
Last RefreshedJune 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE. |
|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/17/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM. |
|
April 06, 2013 | Docket Event | * CASE RENUMBERED FROM BH 02C02268 TO LAM02CB2268 | |
April 06, 2013 | Docket Event | * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE | |
April 06, 2013 | Docket Event | * EFFECTIVE 05/06/2013 | |
May 19, 2003 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 05/19/03 . FOR (RONEY, BUFFY LYN) . AGAINST (MCGUIRE, JAMES E.) . PRINCIPAL $ 12924.72 . ATTY. FEES $ 0.00 . INTEREST $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 147.30 . TOTAL $ 13,072.02 . |
|
May 19, 2003 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS: | |
May 14, 2003 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES 1 TO 10 ONLY | |
May 14, 2003 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MCGUIRE, JAMES E.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. |
|
May 14, 2003 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MCGUIRE, JAMES E.) ON 05/14/03 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 147.30 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.