Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PMF GAINESVILLE IV LLC -vs- LAURENT, JOSEPH A
On October 02, 2023 an eviction residential possession only or with damages up to $2500.00 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Alachua County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 02, 2023
Last Refreshed
May 30, 2024
Filing Location
Alachua County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
EVICTION RESIDENTIAL POSSESSION ONLY OR WITH DAMAGES UP TO $2500.00
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Active
Overview
presence of bed bugs in their unit must immediately
notify the owner.
+ Do not attempt to treat bed bug infestations.
Under no circumstance should you
attempt to eradicate bed bugs. Health hazards
associated with the misapplication of traditional and
non-traditional, chemical-based insecticides and
pesticides poses too great a risk to you and your
neighbors.
*« Do comply with eradication protocol. If the
determination is made that your unit is
indeed playing host to bed bugs, you must comply
with the bed bug eradication protocol set forth by
both your owner and their designated pest
management company.
By initialing below, you acknowledge and agree to the terms in
Section 9.
Xx AL
Joseph A. Laurent
Causes of Action
COUNT I- EVICTION
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal action filed by PMF Gainesville IV LLC, doing business as The Katherine Apartments, against Joseph A Laurent for tenant eviction. The complaint alleges that Joseph A Laurent, the defendant, has failed to pay rent that wa…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
MAIL RETURNED AS TO JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT);
Date: Jan 25, 2024MAIL RETURNED - AS TO JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT);
Date: Jan 25, 2024WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 12/21/2023 MFS JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT);
Date: Dec 21, 2023FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (CLOSES)
Date: Dec 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF NONCOMPLIANCE
Date: Dec 18, 2023STIPULATION
Date: Nov 30, 2023MAIL RETURNED AS TO JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT);
Date: Nov 17, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: Nov 16, 2023RECEIPT FOR RENT PAID INTO COURT REGISTRY (SRL)
Date: Nov 07, 2023LETTER WITH RENT DEPOSIT ATTACHED
Date: Nov 07, 2023MAIL RETURNED - AS TO JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT);
Date: Nov 06, 2023ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION O PAY
Date: Nov 03, 2023ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOION FOR EXTENSION O PAY
Date: Nov 03, 2023(FAXED)COVER LETTER - DATED NOVEMBER 1 ,2023 (SRL)
Date: Nov 01, 2023(FAXED) MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL)
Date: Oct 17, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: Oct 17, 2023(FAXED) COVER LETTER (SRL)
Date: Oct 17, 2023(FAXED)COVER LETTER JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT);
Date: Oct 16, 2023(FAXED)COVER LETTER (DUPLICATE) JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT);
Date: Oct 16, 2023(FAXED)ANSWER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL) (DUPLICATE)
Date: Oct 16, 2023RECEIPT FOR RENT PAID INTO COURT REGISTRY (SRL)
Date: Oct 13, 2023SHERIFFS RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 10-09-2023 JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT);
Date: Oct 09, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED
Date: Oct 02, 2023COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - NO MONEY CLAIM Receipt: 510944 Date: 10/03/2023
Date: Oct 02, 20235 DAY EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 510944 Date: 10/03/2023
Date: Oct 02, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Payments from Registry | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | CHECK REQUEST PROCESSED BY CLERK PAYEE:JAMES I BARRON III PA AMOUNT:$1,100.00 RELEASE DATE: 4/10/24 | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED PROPOSED DOCUMENT CHECK REQUEST - REGISTRY OF COURT Sent on: 04/09/2024 11:36:28.48 | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED AS TO JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT); | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED - AS TO JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT); | |
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - SHERIFF'S RETURN SERVED POSTED 12-26-2024 JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT); | |
December 21, 2023 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 12/21/2023 MFS JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT); | |
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (CLOSES) | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION-STIPULATION DEFAULT RESIDENTIAL EVICTION (COUNT I) | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NONCOMPLIANCE | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT AND WRIT OF POSSESSION AND ADOPT STIPULATION AGREEMENT AND RELEASE THE FUNDS AND DISMISS CASE | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION BY PLAINTIFF TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT AND WRIT OF POSSESSION AND ADOPT STIPULATION AGREEMENT AND RELEASE THE FUNDS AND DISMISS CASE (REOPEN) | |
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED AS TO JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT); | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR RENT PAID INTO COURT REGISTRY (SRL) | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER WITH RENT DEPOSIT ATTACHED | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | REGISTRY OF COURT DEPOSIT Receipt: 512808 Date: 11/07/2023 | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | REGISTRY OF COURT SERVICE FEE Receipt: 512808 Date: 11/07/2023 | |
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED - AS TO JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT); | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION O PAY | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOION FOR EXTENSION O PAY | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | (FAXED)MOTION FOR EXTENSION TO PAY PAST DUE RENT FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL) | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | (FAXED)COVER LETTER - DATED NOVEMBER 1 ,2023 (SRL) | |
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER DETERMINING AMOUNT OF RENT TO DEPOSIT IN REGISTRY AND ORDER REQUIRING CONTINUING RENT DEPOSIT | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | (FAXED) MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL) | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE AFFIDAVIT AS TO SUPPORT OF FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event | (FAXED) COVER LETTER (SRL) | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | (FAXED)COVER LETTER JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT); | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | (FAXED)COVER LETTER (DUPLICATE) JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT); | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | (FAXED)ANSWER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL) JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT); | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | (FAXED)ANSWER FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL) (DUPLICATE) | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIPT FOR RENT PAID INTO COURT REGISTRY (SRL) | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | REGISTRY OF COURT DEPOSIT Receipt: 511555 Date: 10/13/2023 | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | REGISTRY OF COURT SERVICE FEE Receipt: 511555 Date: 10/13/2023 | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 10-09-2023 JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT); | |
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING - (OF COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS) AS TO JOSEPH A LAURENT (DEFENDANT); | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - NO MONEY CLAIM Receipt: 510944 Date: 10/03/2023 | |
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | 5 DAY EVICTION SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 510944 Date: 10/03/2023 |