Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Bank Of America Na, Crespo, Edward, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Knopf, Allegra, Pro Se, against Bank Of America Na, City Of Hollywood Florida, Crespo, Edward, represented by Breeden, Kendra Shauntia, Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL, . Broward County, FL Superior Courts Central Courthouse with Bowman, John B. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2019 |
CategoryReal Prop Other - >$50K - <$250,000 |
Last RefreshedApril 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroward County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCentral Courthouse |
This complaint is a verified complaint for residential foreclosure filed by Bank of America, N.A. against Edward Crespo, the unknown spouse of Edward Crespo, the City of Hollywood, Florida, and unknown tenants 1 and 2. The complaint alleges that Edwa...
eSummons Issuance
Date: December 05, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: December 05, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: December 05, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: December 05, 2019eSummons Issuance
Date: December 05, 2019Notice of Lis Pendens
Date: December 05, 2019Value Claim Form
Date: December 05, 2019Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: December 05, 2019Complaint (eFiled)
Date: December 05, 2019Civil Cover Sheet
Date: December 05, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: December 16, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: December 16, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: December 26, 2019Summons Returned Served
Date: December 26, 2019Non-Military Affidavit
Date: January 03, 2020Summons Returned Unserved
Date: December 27, 2019Order Extending Time
Date: January 08, 2020Answer
Date: January 09, 2020Order Extending Time
Date: January 09, 2020Order Extending Time
Date: January 10, 2020Notice of Service
Date: January 13, 2020Motion to Dismiss
Date: January 31, 2020Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 18, 2020Motion for Disqualification
Date: February 14, 2020Response to Motion
Date: March 05, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: February 27, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: April 03, 2020Notice of Cancellation
Date: March 25, 2020Notice of Filing Designation of Emailing Addresses
Date: June 05, 2020Notice of Appearance
Date: June 05, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: December 16, 2020Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: December 17, 2020Exhibits
Date: January 14, 2021Amended Motion
Date: January 14, 2021Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: February 11, 2021Response to Motion
Date: February 12, 2021Reply
Date: February 18, 2021Hearing Proceedings
Date: February 18, 2021Order Denying Motion to Dismiss
Date: February 23, 2021Exhibits
Date: February 17, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: February 17, 2021Order Denying Motion
Date: February 23, 2021Motion for Disqualification
Date: March 16, 2021Answer Affirmative Defenses & Counterclaim
Date: March 17, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: March 19, 2021Motion
Date: March 18, 2021Order Of Recusal
Date: March 18, 2021Notice of Unavailability
Date: March 30, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 05, 2021Letter to Filer advising Required Fees not Submitted
Date: April 06, 2021Motion for Sanctions
Date: April 06, 2021Motion for Default Final Judgment
Date: April 08, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 05, 2021Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
Date: May 05, 2021Motion for Disqualification
Date: August 12, 2021Emergency Motion
Date: May 14, 2021Request
Date: May 05, 2021Motion to Vacate Order
Date: May 05, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: May 06, 2021Motion to Withdraw
Date: May 19, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 19, 2021Amended
Date: May 20, 2021Response to Motion
Date: May 20, 2021Motion to Take Judicial Notice
Date: May 25, 2021Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 25, 2021Defendant's Exhibits
Date: May 27, 2021Response to Motion to Dismiss
Date: June 16, 2021Motion to Take Judicial Notice
Date: May 27, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: June 10, 2021Emergency Motion
Date: June 11, 2021Notice of Appearance
Date: June 18, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: June 21, 2021Order Denying Motion
Date: August 06, 2021Motion for Judgment on Pleadings
Date: June 29, 2021Motion to Take Judicial Notice
Date: July 13, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: July 01, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: July 21, 2021Order Denying Motion
Date: August 13, 2021Emergency Motion
Date: August 02, 2021Order Of Recusal
Date: August 13, 2021Motion
Date: August 16, 2021Exhibits
Date: August 16, 2021Motion for Recusal
Date: August 17, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: August 25, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: August 20, 2021Order Directing Clerk to Reassign to Civil Judge
Date: August 24, 2021Exhibits
Date: August 31, 2021Motion to Set Hearing
Date: September 18, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 18, 2021Motion to Set Hearing
Date: September 16, 2021Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 17, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: September 17, 2021Motion for Sanctions
Date: September 25, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: September 23, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: September 29, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: September 21, 2021Emergency Motion
Date: September 22, 2021Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
Date: September 24, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: September 25, 2021Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: September 30, 2021Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: October 10, 2021Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: October 18, 2021Notice of Withdrawal
Date: September 30, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: September 30, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: October 10, 2021Exhibits
Date: October 10, 2021Request for Admissions
Date: October 18, 2021Notice of Service
Date: October 18, 2021Interrogatories
Date: October 18, 2021Motion for Extension of Time
Date: November 17, 2021Letter to Judge
Date: November 18, 2021Motion for Disqualification
Date: November 18, 2021Order Denying Motion
Date: November 19, 2021Motion to Vacate Order
Date: November 19, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 19, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: November 19, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: November 22, 2021Notice of Withdrawal
Date: November 23, 2021Notice
Date: November 24, 2021Emergency Motion
Date: December 01, 2021Exhibits
Date: December 02, 2021Motion
Date: December 02, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: December 02, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: December 02, 2021Order Denying Motion
Date: December 03, 2021Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: December 07, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: December 09, 2021Motion
Date: December 09, 2021Notice of Cancellation
Date: December 09, 2021Notice of Filing
Date: December 27, 2021Motion for Clarification
Date: January 09, 2022Motion
Date: January 21, 2022Motion for Clarification
Date: January 13, 2022Notice of Withdrawal
Date: January 21, 2022Disclosure of Exhibits
Date: January 21, 2022Agreed Motion
Date: January 21, 2022Request for Production of Documents
Date: January 31, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: March 31, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: June 08, 2022Notice
Date: June 07, 2022Motion for Disqualification
Date: June 22, 2022Case Management Order
Date: June 30, 2022Motion
Date: June 27, 2022Order Of Recusal
Date: June 27, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: June 27, 2022Affidavit in Support
Date: June 30, 2022Motion for Disqualification
Date: June 30, 2022Order Denying Motion
Date: July 01, 2022Motion
Date: July 11, 2022Motion for Rehearing
Date: July 02, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: July 05, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: July 08, 2022Notice of Withdrawal
Date: July 14, 2022Notice of Withdrawal
Date: July 12, 2022Notice of Hearing
Date: July 14, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: July 21, 2022Re-Notice of Hearing
Date: July 15, 2022Motion for Disqualification
Date: July 21, 2022Notice
Date: July 20, 2022Case Management Order
Date: July 25, 2022Motion to Amend Counterclaim
Date: July 22, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: July 25, 2022Emergency Motion
Date: July 27, 2022Amended Notice of Hearing
Date: August 05, 2022Motion to Dismiss Counterclaim
Date: August 01, 2022Case Management Order
Date: July 27, 2022Motion for Disqualification
Date: August 05, 2022Motion
Date: August 08, 2022Notice of Withdrawal
Date: August 08, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: August 11, 2022Notice of Cancellation
Date: August 12, 2022Motion for Order
Date: August 22, 2022Motion for Order
Date: August 24, 2022Order Denying
Date: August 24, 2022Emergency Motion
Date: August 26, 2022Affidavit of Indigency
Date: August 31, 2022Notice of Appeal
Date: August 31, 2022Acknowledgment
Date: September 01, 20224th DCA Order
Date: September 01, 20224th DCA Order
Date: September 01, 2022Notice of Filing
Date: September 05, 2022Order Setting Hearing
Date: September 09, 20224th DCA Order
Date: September 12, 2022Civil Application Indigent Status
Date: September 12, 2022Amended Order
Date: September 30, 20224th DCA Order
Date: September 16, 20224th DCA Order
Date: October 03, 2022Motion
Date: September 20, 2022Notice of Service
Date: October 12, 20224th DCA Order
Date: November 23, 20224th DCA Order
Date: December 16, 2022Notice of Unavailability
Date: January 12, 20234th DCA Order
Date: January 05, 2023Notice
Date: January 10, 2023Notice of Filing
Date: January 11, 2023Notice of Service of Interrogs
Date: February 13, 2023Amended
Date: March 07, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: March 15, 2023Order Denying Motion
Date: March 28, 2023Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
Date: April 06, 2023Uniform Order Setting Pretrial Deadline
Date: May 15, 2023Witness List
Date: July 06, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 05, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: August 09, 2023Motion for Default
Date: November 02, 2023Motion for Extension of Time
Date: September 19, 2023Notice of Hearing
Date: September 20, 2023Order on Motion to Compel
Date: November 07, 2023Order of Default
Date: November 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment Comment (AGAINST UNKNOWN TENANTS ) Vol./Book 0 , Page 0, 2 pages Instrument Number 119247280 |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Judgment Comment (AGAINST DEFENDANT CITY OF HOLLYWOOD ) Vol./Book 0 , Page 0, 2 pages Instrument Number 119247284 |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Default DEFAULTING DEFENDANT EDWARD CRESPO |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Motion to Compel OMNIBUS ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT'S FACT WITNESS LIST AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION OR CLARIFICATION AND FOR EXTENSION OF PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dropping Party(S) Comment (THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EDWARD CRESPO ) Vol./Book 0 , Page 0, 2 pages Instrument Number 119215875 |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default OF UNKNOWN TENANTSParty: Plaintiff Bank Of America NA |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time PLAINTIFF S MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION AND FOR EXTENSION OF PRE-TRIAL DEADLINESParty: Plaintiff Bank Of America NA Defendant Bank of America NA |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Extension of Time PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO COMMENCE MEDIATIONParty: Plaintiff Bank Of America NA Defendant Bank of America NA |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel DEFENDANT'S FACT WITNESS LISTParty: Plaintiff Crespo, Edward |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.