Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jane Doe Plaintiff vs. T-MOBILE USA, INC., Defendant
On May 15, 2023 a 3 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Broward County, FL. Judge Haury, William W., Jr. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 15, 2023
Last Refreshed
October 13, 2023
Filing Location
Broward County, FL
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I - VIOLATION OF FLORIDA'S SEXUAL CYBERHARASSMENT LAW, § 784.049 FLA. STAT.
COUNT II - INVASION OF PRIVACY
COUNT III - NEGLIGENT HIRING, RETENTION, AND SUPERVISION and
COUNT IV - NEGLIGENCE and
COUNT V - INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS and
COUNT VI - PUBLICATION OF PRIVATE FACTS and
COUNT IX - VICARIOUS LIABILITY VIA RESPONDEAT SUPERIOR
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Management Order
Date: Oct 05, 2023Response to Motion
Date: Sep 27, 2023Case Management Order
Date: Aug 22, 2023Order Granting
Date: Aug 17, 2023Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Date: Jul 26, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: Jul 17, 2023Motion to Dismiss
Date: Jul 17, 2023Summons Returned Served
Date: Jul 14, 2023Order Extending Time
Date: Jun 23, 2023Motion for Enlargement of Time
Date: Jun 22, 2023Notice of Appearance
Date: Jun 20, 2023eSummons Issuance
Date: May 16, 2023Civil Cover Sheet
Date: May 15, 2023Complaint (eFiled)
Date: May 15, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order 11-21-2023 , 9:15 AM |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Response to Motion | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Order CASE MANAGEMENT CONFRENCE: 10/04/2023 @ 4:00 PM |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING VERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice CAROLINE MORGAN, Movant |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel ARBITRATION AND STAY PROCEEDINGSParty: Defendant T-MOBILE USA, INC., |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Party: Defendant T-MOBILE USA, INC., |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Served 5th day of June, 2023Party: Defendant T-MOBILE USA, INC., |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Extending Time | |
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Enlargement of Time Party: Defendant T-MOBILE USA, INC., |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Party: Defendant T-MOBILE USA, INC., |
|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
eSummons Issuance ISSUE ON: T-MOBILE USA, INC |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Cover Sheet Amount: $50,001.00 |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint (eFiled) | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Per AOSC20-23 Amd12, Case is determined General |