Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STAPLES, HAMILTON vs. PROJECT EXIT LLC
Damages case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL. Judge MASON, DONALD H presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 31, 107
Last Refreshed
December 19, 2023
Filing Location
Charlotte County, FL
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Geoffrey H. Gentile;Category
Damages
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Status
Transfer
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I BREACH OF CONTRACT (Failure to Maintain Premises)
COUNT II NEGLIGENCE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed in the County Court for Charlotte County, Florida, in the Civil Division. The plaintiffs are Hamilton Staples, Kimberly Wood-Staples, and Hamilton Staples and Kimberly Wood-Staples, who are the parents and natural guardian…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
8/26/2022
Date: May 31, 205310/13/2021
Date: May 31, 205211/15/2022
Date: May 31, 204510/25/2021
Date: May 31, 204110/22/2021
Date: May 31, 204110/27/2021
Date: May 31, 20419/15/2022
Date: May 30, 20245/17/2021
Date: May 29, 202411/4/2022
Date: May 29, 202410/14/2022
Date: May 29, 202410/4/2021
Date: May 28, 202410/14/2022
Date: May 27, 202411/15/2022
Date: May 26, 20249/21/2021
Date: May 24, 202412/16/2022
Date: May 23, 20249/26/2021
Date: May 22, 202411/4/2022
Date: May 22, 20249/30/2021
Date: May 21, 20249/2/2022
Date: May 21, 202410/20/2021
Date: May 20, 20248/10/2022
Date: May 20, 20246/7/2021
Date: May 18, 20249/30/2021
Date: May 17, 202411/4/2022
Date: May 17, 20248/24/2022
Date: May 17, 202410/27/2021
Date: May 16, 202410/22/2021
Date: May 16, 20241/26/2023
Date: May 16, 20242/15/2023
Date: May 16, 202410/14/2022
Date: May 16, 20245/10/2022
Date: May 14, 202410/20/2021
Date: May 13, 20249/27/2021
Date: May 13, 20248/12/2022
Date: May 13, 20249/22/2021
Date: May 12, 20241/6/2023
Date: May 12, 20248/16/2022
Date: May 12, 20248/25/2022
Date: May 11, 202410/22/2021
Date: May 10, 20241/11/2023
Date: May 10, 20242/22/2023
Date: May 10, 20242/9/2023
Date: May 10, 20249/7/2022
Date: May 10, 202410/27/2021
Date: May 10, 20249/7/2022
Date: May 09, 20244/18/2023
Date: May 09, 20244/6/2023
Date: May 09, 20242/18/2022
Date: May 09, 202410/20/2021
Date: May 08, 20249/7/2022
Date: May 08, 20243/31/2023
Date: May 08, 20241/3/2023
Date: May 08, 202411/3/2022
Date: May 08, 20242/24/2022
Date: May 08, 202411/10/2022
Date: May 07, 202411/4/2022
Date: May 07, 20249/11/2022
Date: May 07, 20248/29/2022
Date: May 07, 202410/25/2021
Date: May 06, 202410/20/2021
Date: May 06, 20249/28/2021
Date: May 06, 20249/27/2021
Date: May 06, 20244/18/2023
Date: May 06, 20244/10/2023
Date: May 06, 20244/7/2023
Date: May 06, 20241/24/2023
Date: May 06, 20241/10/2023
Date: May 06, 202412/9/2022
Date: May 06, 20245/9/2022
Date: May 06, 20242/28/2022
Date: May 06, 202410/26/2021
Date: May 05, 202410/22/2021
Date: May 05, 202410/18/2021
Date: May 05, 20246/29/2021
Date: May 05, 20241/24/2023
Date: May 05, 20243/3/2022
Date: May 05, 20242/4/2022
Date: May 05, 202410/27/2021
Date: May 04, 202410/25/2021
Date: May 04, 202410/23/2021
Date: May 04, 20246/29/2021
Date: May 04, 20246/9/2021
Date: May 04, 20245/17/2021
Date: May 04, 20241/26/2023
Date: May 04, 20241/24/2023
Date: May 04, 20241/13/2023
Date: May 04, 202411/4/2022
Date: May 04, 202410/26/2022
Date: May 04, 202410/25/2022
Date: May 04, 20246/20/2022
Date: May 04, 20242/18/2022
Date: May 04, 20241/25/2022
Date: May 04, 20249/27/2021
Date: May 03, 20245/17/2021
Date: May 03, 202411/1/2021
Date: May 03, 202411/10/2022
Date: May 03, 20241/5/2023
Date: May 03, 20243/28/2023
Date: May 03, 202412/29/2022
Date: May 03, 202411/7/2022
Date: May 03, 202410/28/2022
Date: May 03, 202410/6/2022
Date: May 03, 20249/12/2022
Date: May 03, 20248/25/2022
Date: May 03, 20248/24/2022
Date: May 03, 20247/20/2022
Date: May 03, 20245/17/2022
Date: May 03, 20245/18/2022
Date: May 03, 20245/9/2022
Date: May 03, 20241/26/2022
Date: May 03, 20241/20/2022
Date: May 03, 202410/28/2021
Date: May 03, 202410/25/2021
Date: May 02, 202410/12/2021
Date: May 02, 202410/3/2021
Date: May 02, 20247/14/2021
Date: May 02, 20245/27/2021
Date: May 02, 20246/7/2021
Date: May 02, 20242/18/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/22/2022
Date: May 02, 20245/9/2022
Date: May 02, 20245/16/2022
Date: May 02, 20249/7/2022
Date: May 02, 202410/14/2022
Date: May 02, 202410/17/2022
Date: May 02, 202412/21/2022
Date: May 02, 20241/23/2023
Date: May 02, 20241/25/2023
Date: May 02, 20241/26/2023
Date: May 02, 20244/3/2023
Date: May 02, 20244/20/2023
Date: May 02, 20245/12/2023
Date: May 02, 20245/22/2023
Date: May 02, 20245/26/2023
Date: May 02, 20245/3/2023
Date: May 02, 20245/31/2023
Date: May 02, 20244/19/2023
Date: May 02, 20244/17/2023
Date: May 02, 20243/13/2023
Date: May 02, 20243/31/2023
Date: May 02, 20242/24/2023
Date: May 02, 20242/3/2023
Date: May 02, 20242/9/2023
Date: May 02, 20242/13/2023
Date: May 02, 20241/16/2023
Date: May 02, 20241/20/2023
Date: May 02, 20241/9/2023
Date: May 02, 20241/6/2023
Date: May 02, 202412/12/2022
Date: May 02, 202412/8/2022
Date: May 02, 202411/7/2022
Date: May 02, 202411/4/2022
Date: May 02, 202410/18/2022
Date: May 02, 20249/9/2022
Date: May 02, 20249/12/2022
Date: May 02, 20248/30/2022
Date: May 02, 20248/24/2022
Date: May 02, 20248/16/2022
Date: May 02, 20248/22/2022
Date: May 02, 20248/19/2022
Date: May 02, 20247/28/2022
Date: May 02, 20243/17/2022
Date: May 02, 20242/28/2022
Date: May 02, 20242/8/2022
Date: May 02, 20241/25/2022
Date: May 02, 202411/8/2021
Date: May 02, 202410/27/2021
Date: May 02, 20246/12/2023
Date: May 02, 202410/27/2021
Date: May 01, 202410/22/2021
Date: May 01, 202410/14/2021
Date: May 01, 20247/12/2021
Date: May 01, 20247/26/2021
Date: May 01, 20246/8/2021
Date: May 01, 20245/28/2021
Date: May 01, 20245/19/2021
Date: May 01, 20245/18/2021
Date: May 01, 20245/17/2021
Date: May 01, 202411/2/2021
Date: May 01, 202412/2/2021
Date: May 01, 202412/30/2021
Date: May 01, 20242/25/2022
Date: May 01, 20249/7/2022
Date: May 01, 20245/31/2023
Date: May 01, 20241/23/2023
Date: May 01, 202412/30/2022
Date: May 01, 202411/2/2022
Date: May 01, 20248/26/2022
Date: May 01, 20248/15/2022
Date: May 01, 20248/10/2022
Date: May 01, 20248/16/2022
Date: May 01, 20247/14/2022
Date: May 01, 20243/3/2022
Date: May 01, 20242/21/2022
Date: May 01, 20242/2/2022
Date: May 01, 20241/24/2022
Date: May 01, 20241/25/2022
Date: May 01, 20241/20/2022
Date: May 01, 202410/28/2021
Date: May 01, 202411/1/2021
Date: May 01, 20246/13/2023
Date: May 01, 2024POST-HEARING ORDER - MARCH 3,2023
Date: Mar 31, 2023COURT MINUTES
Date: Mar 31, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - JOE C. SPURGEON - 04/20/2023 01:00 PM
Date: Mar 28, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - STEVE PARKHURST - 04/20/2023 10:00 AM
Date: Mar 28, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING - 03/31/2023 10:30 AM
Date: Feb 24, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - JESSICA STAPLES - 04/04/2023 01:00 PM
Date: Feb 22, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - KIMBERLY WOOD- STAPLES - 04/04/2023 10:00 AM
Date: Feb 22, 2023MOTION - DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF, HAMILTON STAPLES
Date: Feb 19, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - JESSICA STAPLES - 03/01/2023 01:00 PM
Date: Feb 09, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - KIMBERLY WOOD- STAPLES - 03/01/2023 10:00 AM
Date: Feb 09, 2023CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION - DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: Feb 09, 2023CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION - DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: Feb 03, 2023NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES TIME
Date: Jan 26, 2023REQUEST FOR COPIES - PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: Jan 26, 2023RESPONSE - DEFENDANTS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SEVER
Date: Jan 24, 2023NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES TIME
Date: Jan 24, 2023CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION - DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: Jan 23, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING - 01/27/2023 10:30 AM
Date: Jan 23, 2023PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING-JANUARY 27, 2023 AT 10:30 AM
Date: Jan 23, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING - 01/27/2023 10:30 AM
Date: Jan 20, 2023REQUEST FOR COPIES - PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: Jan 16, 2023NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES TIME
Date: Jan 13, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF JESSICA STAPLES
Date: Jan 11, 2023NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES TIME
Date: Jan 11, 2023DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF HAMILTON STAPLES
Date: Jan 11, 2023MOTION TO SERVER
Date: Jan 10, 2023ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: Jan 09, 2023LETTER FROM HAMILTON STAPLES
Date: Jan 06, 2023AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM - PROJECT EXIT LLC
Date: Jan 05, 2023AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM - JOSEPH IANNELLO
Date: Jan 05, 2023AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM - AMELIA PERRI
Date: Jan 05, 2023COURT MINUTES
Date: Jan 03, 2023PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: Dec 29, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - CORE PUBLIC ADJUSTERS - 01/26/2023 10:30 AM
Date: Dec 21, 2022ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE MAGISTRATE
Date: Dec 12, 2022ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: Dec 09, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION - 04/19/2023 03:00 PM
Date: Dec 08, 2022OTHER
Date: Nov 15, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM- JANUARY 16,2023 AT 1:00 PM
Date: Nov 10, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM-JANUARY 16,2023 AT 9:00 AM
Date: Nov 10, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: Nov 10, 2022CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER
Date: Nov 07, 2022AMENDED STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: Nov 07, 2022EXHIBIT F
Date: Nov 04, 2022EXHIBIT D
Date: Nov 04, 2022EXHIBIT A
Date: Nov 04, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: Nov 04, 2022EXHIBIT B
Date: Nov 04, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING - 01/27/2023 10:30 AM
Date: Nov 02, 2022ORDER REFERRING CASE TO NONBINDING ARBITRATION
Date: Oct 26, 2022ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING/CONFERENCE OF SEPTEMBER 14, 2022
Date: Oct 25, 2022PLAITIFFS OTICE OF UAVAILABILITY
Date: Oct 18, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING NOV 4, 2022 11AM
Date: Oct 17, 2022EXHIBIT D
Date: Oct 14, 2022PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: Oct 14, 2022MOTION FOR EXTENSION - PLAINTIFFS, KIMBERLY WOOD STAPLES
Date: Oct 14, 2022MOTION TO FILE AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM
Date: Oct 06, 2022REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: Sep 12, 2022DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: Sep 12, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: Sep 09, 2022NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: Sep 07, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: Sep 07, 2022NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANTS FIRST SET OF INTERROATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: Sep 07, 2022DEFENDANTS PROJECT EXIT LLC, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF
Date: Sep 07, 2022DEFENDANTS PROJECT EXIT, LLC, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF
Date: Sep 07, 2022DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: Sep 02, 2022ORDER TO RELIEVE COUNSEL
Date: Aug 30, 2022LETTER FROM ATTORNEYS OFFICE
Date: Aug 29, 2022STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT TO RELIEVE COUNSEL
Date: Aug 26, 2022ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE AND NOTICE OF HEARING 9/7/22 9:30AM
Date: Aug 25, 2022LETTER FROM HAMILTON STAPLES
Date: Aug 25, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING - 09/07/2022 09:30 AM
Date: Aug 24, 2022PLAINTIFFS CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING-SEPTEMBER 9, 2022 AT 11:00 AM
Date: Aug 24, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING - 09/09/2022 11:00 AM
Date: Aug 22, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: Aug 19, 2022ORDER OF RECUSAL
Date: Aug 16, 2022ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT
Date: Aug 16, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: Aug 15, 2022MOTION TO DISQUALIFY THE HONORABLE GEOFFREY H. GENTILE
Date: Aug 12, 2022DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY RESPONSES
Date: Aug 10, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: Aug 10, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING - 08/15/2022 10:30 AM
Date: Jul 28, 2022DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: Jul 20, 2022LETTER FROM CLERK TO ATTY
Date: Jul 14, 2022ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS
Date: May 18, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: May 17, 2022DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: May 16, 2022NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES TIME
Date: May 10, 2022MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS
Date: May 09, 2022PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE AND OBJCECTION TO COUNSELS MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: May 09, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING - 05/17/2022 08:30 AM
Date: May 09, 2022DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION
Date: Apr 22, 2022MOTION - MOTION TO DISBURSE RENT
Date: Mar 17, 2022MOTION TO DISBURSE RENT
Date: Mar 17, 2022CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TO TRANSFER
Date: Mar 03, 2022CERTIFIED COPY OF CASE HISTORY
Date: Mar 03, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FILED BY KASSIA FIALKOFF
Date: Feb 28, 2022ORDER - RECORDED (O.4934.778. / 3064550)
Date: Feb 25, 2022ORDER
Date: Feb 25, 2022DEFENDANTS ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: Feb 24, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION - 10:00 AM
Date: Feb 21, 2022NOTICE OF MEDIATION - 04/18/2022 10:00 AM
Date: Feb 21, 2022DEFENDANTS DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: Feb 18, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FILED BY MATTHEW FILIPPINI
Date: Feb 18, 2022AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: Feb 04, 2022PAYMENT 1,783.75 RECEIPT 2022013775
Date: Feb 02, 2022COURT MINUTES
Date: Jan 26, 2022PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT COURT
Date: Jan 25, 2022MOTION - PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT COURT
Date: Jan 25, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING - 01/26/2022 01:30 PM
Date: Jan 25, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: Jan 24, 2022SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON PARTY
Date: Jan 20, 2022PAYMENT 2.00 RECEIPT 2022012209
Date: Jan 20, 2022CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF RENT DEPOSIT
Date: Dec 30, 2021PAYMENT 1,783.75 RECEIPT 2022009941
Date: Dec 30, 2021PAYMENT 1,783.75 RECEIPT 2022007108
Date: Dec 02, 2021CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF RENT DEPOSIT
Date: Dec 02, 2021PAYMENT 1,783.75 RECEIPT 2022003697
Date: Nov 02, 2021CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF RENT DEPOSIT
Date: Nov 02, 2021PAYMENT 4.00 RECEIPT 2022003543
Date: Nov 01, 2021SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION ISSUED TO JACOB HOPPER
Date: Nov 01, 2021SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION ISSUED TO TRENT MOORE
Date: Nov 01, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING - 01/26/2022 02:00 PM
Date: Oct 28, 2021NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: Oct 28, 2021MOTION TO AMEND PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT
Date: Oct 27, 2021EXHIBIT - STAPLES FAMILY WATER LOSS PERSONAL PROPERTY TOTAL
Date: Oct 27, 2021NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS UNAVAILABILITY
Date: Oct 27, 2021PAYMENT 5,336.25 RECEIPT 2022003074
Date: Oct 27, 2021LANDLORD FORMAL NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: Oct 27, 2021MOTION - MOTION FOR HEARING ON FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION
Date: Oct 27, 2021MOTION FOR HEARING ON FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION
Date: Oct 27, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING 01.26.22 1:30 PM
Date: Oct 27, 2021EXHIBIT - CERTIFICATE OF ANALYSIS
Date: Oct 27, 2021EXHIBIT - AMENDED TO LEASE AGREEMENT
Date: Oct 27, 2021COURT MINUTES
Date: Oct 26, 2021EXHIBIT B2
Date: Oct 25, 2021EXHIBIT A
Date: Oct 25, 2021EXHIBIT B1
Date: Oct 25, 2021AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: Oct 25, 2021NOTICE OF TEMPORARY WITHDRAWAL OF HEARING
Date: Oct 23, 2021EXHIBIT E
Date: Oct 22, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING: 10.26.21 3:00
Date: Oct 22, 2021EXHIBIT D
Date: Oct 22, 2021EXHIBIT B
Date: Oct 22, 2021EXHIBIT A
Date: Oct 22, 2021EXHIBIT C
Date: Oct 22, 2021EXHIBIT B
Date: Oct 20, 2021EXHIBIT A
Date: Oct 20, 2021EXHIBIT C
Date: Oct 20, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING : 10.26.21 3:00
Date: Oct 18, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING 10:26:21 3:00
Date: Oct 18, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING - 10/26/2021 03:00 PM
Date: Oct 14, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF EVICTION
Date: Oct 12, 2021MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS DEPOSITION
Date: Oct 04, 2021NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS UNAVAILABILITY
Date: Oct 03, 2021ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: Sep 30, 2021AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 28, 2021PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 28, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM: JOSEPH IANNELLO 11.10.21 10:00 AM
Date: Sep 27, 2021ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: Jul 26, 2021COURT MINUTES
Date: Jul 14, 2021CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF RENT DEPOSIT
Date: Jul 12, 2021PAYMENT 1,783.75 RECEIPT 2021032582
Date: Jul 12, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING : 07.14.21 9:00 AM
Date: Jun 29, 2021SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: Jun 09, 2021CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF RENT DEPOSIT
Date: Jun 08, 2021PAYMENT 315.00 RECEIPT 2021028803
Date: Jun 08, 2021PAYMENT 1,783.75 RECEIPT 2021028934
Date: Jun 08, 2021SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED 6/8/21 HAMILTON STAPLES
Date: Jun 07, 2021SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED 6/8/21 UNKNOWN TENANTS
Date: Jun 07, 2021ANSWER , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTER-PETITION
Date: Jun 07, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS FOR PROJECT EXIT LLC SERVED 05.24.21
Date: May 28, 2021RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS FOR PROJECT EXIT LLC SERVED 05.24.21
Date: May 27, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST PROJECT EXIT LLC
Date: May 19, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST JOSEPH IANNELLO
Date: May 19, 2021PAYMENT 1,783.75 RECEIPT 2021026663
Date: May 19, 2021CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF RENT DEPOSIT
Date: May 19, 2021PAYMENT 215.00 RECEIPT 2021026554
Date: May 18, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST AMELIA PERRI
Date: May 17, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: May 17, 2021STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: May 17, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: May 17, 202110/27/2021
Date: May 31, 11910/27/2021
Date: May 31, 11510/25/2021
Date: May 31, 1089/28/2021
Date: May 31, 107Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2059 | Docket Event | ||
May 31, 2053 | Docket Event | ||
May 31, 2052 | Docket Event | ||
May 31, 2045 | Docket Event | ||
May 31, 2041 | Docket Event | ||
May 31, 2041 | Docket Event | ||
May 31, 2041 | Docket Event | ||
May 30, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 29, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 29, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 29, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 27, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 26, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 24, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 23, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 22, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 22, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 18, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 17, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 17, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 17, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | POST-HEARING ORDER - MARCH 3,2023 | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - JOE C. SPURGEON - 04/20/2023 @ 01:00 PM | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - STEVE PARKHURST - 04/20/2023 @ 10:00 AM | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - COPY OF JUDGE CARYL E. DELANO'S FEBRUARY 27, 2023 ORDER DENYING DEBTOR'S MOTION FOR CONTEMPT BY CREDITOR PROJECT EXIT LLC AND CREDITPOR'S COUNSEL GREGORY HOROWITZ | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - 03/31/2023 @ 10:30 AM | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - JESSICA STAPLES - 04/04/2023 @ 01:00 PM | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - KIMBERLY WOOD- STAPLES - 04/04/2023 @ 10:00 AM | |
February 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION - DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF, HAMILTON STAPLES | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS EMERGENCY MOTION TO LIMIT DEFENDANTS DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDEROF PLAINTIFF | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S CANCELLATION NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF RECORDA CUSTODIAN FOR STELLAR PUBLIC ADJUSTING SERVICES | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - JESSICA STAPLES - 03/01/2023 @ 01:00 PM | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - KIMBERLY WOOD- STAPLES - 03/01/2023 @ 10:00 AM | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION - DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION - DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES - PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF THE CONTEMPT MOTION ATTACHED HERE TO IN THE PLAINTIFFS CONFIRMED BANKRUPTCY CASE | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF THE CONTEMPT MOTION ATTACHED HERE TO IN THE PLAINTIFFS CONFIRMED BANKRUPTCY CASE - RECORDED (OTHER.0.0. / 3209643) | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF RECORDS CUSTODIAN FOR STELLA PUBLIC ADJUSTING SERVICES 2/13/2023 @ 10:00 AM | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' CANCELLATION NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF RECORDS CUSTODIAN FOR STELLA PUBLIC ADJUSTING SERVICES 2/26/2023 @ 10:00 AM | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE - DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S, HAMILTON STAPLES, MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF COURT REGISTRY FUNDS AND FOR DEFENDANTS' DEFAULT AND ABANDONMENT OF DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIM AND DEFENSES | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE - DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEVER | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO TAKE JUDICIAL NOTICE OF THE RECORD IN CASE NO.22000580CA, 22000277CA AND 21000474CA | |
January 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION - DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - 01/27/2023 @ 10:30 AM | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING-JANUARY 27, 2023 AT 10:30 AM | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - 01/27/2023 @ 10:30 AM | |
January 16, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES - PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF JESSICA STAPLES | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF KIMBERLY WOOD-STAPLES | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF HAMILTON STAPLES | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SERVER | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS’ CANCELLATION NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUMOF RECORDS CUSTODIAN FOR CORE PUBLIC ADJUSTERS | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM HAMILTON STAPLES | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM - PROJECT EXIT LLC | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM - JOSEPH IANNELLO | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM - AMELIA PERRI | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - RECORDS CUSTODIAN OF: CORE PUBLIC ADJUSTERS - SERVED - 12/28/2022 | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - CORE PUBLIC ADJUSTERS - 01/26/2023 @ 10:30 AM | |
December 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - STELLAR PUBLIC ADJUSTING SERVICES, INC - 01/26/2023 @ 10:00 AM | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION - REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE MAGISTRATE GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND DEPOSITION DATES | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF THE MAGISTRATE | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION - 04/19/2023 @ 03:00 PM | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | 104500-8IN THE COUNTY COURT OF THE TWENTIETH JUDICIAL CIRCUIT IN AND FOR CHARLOTTE COUNTY, FLORIDAHAMILTON STAPLES, KIMBERLY WOOD-STAPLES, HAMILTON STAPLES, AND KIMBERLY WOOD-STAPLES, PARENTS AND NATURAL GUARDIANS OF JESSICA STAPLES, A MINOR,PLAINTIFFS,VS. PROJECT EXIT, LLC, JOSEPH IANNELLO, AND AMELIA PERRI,DEFENDANTS.____________________________/CIRCUIT CIVIL DIVISIONCASE NO. 22-CA-000277DEFENDANTS’MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING FORTHCOMING DEPOSITIONSOF PROJECTEXIT, LLC, JOSEPH IANNELLO, ANDAMELIA PERR | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | OTHER | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL AND MOTION FOR RULING PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 1.351(D) ON NON PATRIES AND DEFENDANTS OBJECTION | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM- JANUARY 16,2023 AT 1:00 PM | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM-JANUARY 16,2023 AT 9:00 AM | |
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT F | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS’,KIMBERLY WOOD-STAPLES, AND JESSICA STAPLES, A MINOR,DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS OF PLAINTIFFS,KIMBERLY WOOD-STAPLES, AND JESSICA STAPLES, A MINOR | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT D | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT A | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT B | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED PLAINTIFFS HAMILTON STAPLES MOTION FOR A SUGGESTED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER PURSUANT TO THIS COURTS ORDER OF OCTOBER 13, 2022 AS A RESULT OF DEFENDANTS UNWILLINGNESS TO AGREE TO SUCH PROPOSED ORDER | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - 01/27/2023 @ 10:30 AM | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAI!TIFFS OBJECTIO! TO MATTERS OR HEARI!G OF PLAI!TIFFS OR DEFE!DA!TS BEI!G REFERRED TO THE MAGISTRATE OF THIS COURTS JURISDICTIO!THIS CAS | |
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER REFERRING CASE TO NONBINDING ARBITRATION | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER FOLLOWING HEARING/CONFERENCE OF SEPTEMBER 14, 2022 | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAI!TIFFS !OTICE OF U!AVAILABILITY | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING NOV 4, 2022 @11AM | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE - DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS1 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S, JESSICA STAPLES, CLAIMS UNDER COUNT I AND COUNT II OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT D | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S, JESSICA STAPLES, CLAIMS UNDER COUNT I AND COUNT II OF THE AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFS HAMILTON STAPLES MOTION FOR A SUGGESTED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER PRUSUANT TO THIS COURTS ORDER OF OCTOBER 13,2022 AS A RESULT OF DEFENDANTS UNWILLINGNESS TO AGREE TO SUCH PROPOSED ORDER | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S HAMILTON STAPLES, DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITION OF PLAINTIFF, HAMILTON STAPLES | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION - PLAINTIFFS, KIMBERLY WOOD STAPLES | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO FILE AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANTS COUNSEL GREGORY HOROWITZ AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS COUNSEL GREGORY HOROWITZ TO PARTICIPATE WITH PLAINTIFFS IN SCHEDULE OF HEARING | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
September 11, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DISBURSEMENT OF COURT REGISTRY FUNDS AND FOR DEFENDANT; DEFAULT AND ABANDONMENT OF DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIM AND DEFENSES PURSUANT TO RULE 1.140 1.90 A AMENDMENTS AND 1.170 OF F.R.C.P. | |
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S PROJECT EXIT, LLC, AMENDED FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAAINTIFF, KIMBERLY WOOD STAPLES | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT, PROJECT EXIT, LLC'S AMENDED FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCION TO PLAINTIFF, HAMILTON STAPLES | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDAN'S AMENDED FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, JESSICA STAPLES, A MINOR | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S PROJECT EXIT, LLC , AMENDED FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S AMENDED FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, KIMBERLY WOOD-STAPLES | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDNAT'S AMENDED FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, HAMILTON STAPLES | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S PROJECT EXIT LLC, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S PROJECT EXIT, LLC, FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S PROJECT EXIT, LLC, AMENDED FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF, KIMBERLY WOOD STAPLES | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDNANT'S AMENDED FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, HAMILTON STAPLES | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANT'S AMENDED FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, JESSICA STAPLES, A MINOR | |
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO RELIEVE COUNSEL | |
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY'S OFFICE | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' PLEADINGS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITONS AND SUBMIT ACCEPTABLE DISCOVERY DEMANDED ALONG WITH STRATEGICALLY AND INTENTIONALLY FAILING TO PARTICIPATE IN HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT TO RELIEVE COUNSEL | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE AND NOTICE OF HEARING 9/7/22 9:30AM | |
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM HAMILTON STAPLES | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL - DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPOSITIONS OF PLAINTIFFS, HAMILTON STAPLES, KIMBERLY WOOD-STAPLES, AND JESSICA STAPLES, A MINOR | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - 09/07/2022 @ 09:30 AM | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS CROSS NOTICE OF HEARING-SEPTEMBER 9, 2022 AT 11:00 AM | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - 09/09/2022 @ 11:00 AM | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS PLEADINGS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITIONS AND SUBMIT ACCEPTABLE DISCOVERY DEMANDED ALONG WITH STRATGICALLY AND INTENTIONALLY FAILING TO PARTICIPATE IN HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF RECUSAL | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISQUALIFY THE HONORABLE GEOFFREY H\. GENTILE | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY RESPONSES | |
August 10, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - 08/15/2022 @ 10:30 AM | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM CLERK TO ATTY | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED BURT STORE LAKE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION 6/14/2022 | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
May 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - SEE PLEADING FOR NAMES & TIME | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE AND OBJCECTION TO COUNSELS MOTION TO WITHDRAW | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - 05/17/2022 @ 08:30 AM | |
May 09, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING AS TO CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ONLY JACS CONFIRMATION 271281 | |
April 22, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION - MOTION TO DISBURSE RENT | |
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISBURSE RENT | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TO TRANSFER | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY OF CASE HISTORY | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/03/2022 CASE NUMBER 22000277CA | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NON PARTY BANKS NA RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS OBJECTION AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FILED BY KASSIA FIALKOFF | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER - RECORDED (O.4934.778. / 3064550) | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
February 24, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION - @ 10:00 AM | |
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION - 04/18/2022 @ 10:00 AM | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | OBJECTION - DEFENDANTS'', PROJECT EXIT, LLC, JOSEPH IANNELLO, AND AMELIA PERRI, OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF''S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | OBJECTION - DEFENDANTS, PROJECT EXIT, LLC, JOSEPH IANNELLO, AND AMELIA PERRI, OBJECTION TO AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON PARTY AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FILED BY MATTHEW FILIPPINI | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS', PROJECT EXIT, LLC, JOSEPH IANNELLO, AND AMELIA PERRI, OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF''S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
February 18, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS, PROJECT EXIT, LLC, JOSEPH IANNELLO, AND AMELIA PERRI, OBJECTION TO AND MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON PARTY AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO AMEND PLEADINGS AND MOTION TO TRANSFER JURISDICTION AND PROJECT EXITS MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
February 02, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $1,783.75 RECEIPT #2022013775 | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - PHOTOGRAPHS TAKEN BY PLAINTIFF OF AREAS OF THE HOME SHOWING MOLD GROWTH | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT COURT | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION - PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER TO CIRCUIT COURT | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - 01/26/2022 @ 01:30 PM | |
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING - ORDER ON: (I) DEBTORS AMENDED MOTION TO ASSUME RESIDENTIAL LEASE WITH PROJECT EXIT LLC (DOC. NO. 291); AND (II) AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL REJECTION OF RESIDENTIAL LEASE FILED BY PROJECT EXIT LLC | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM NON PARTY | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $2.00 RECEIPT #2022012209 | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF RENT DEPOSIT | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $1,783.75 RECEIPT #2022009941 | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $1,783.75 RECEIPT #2022007108 | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF RENT DEPOSIT | |
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING LANDLORD'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DETERMINING TENANTS CURRENT AND ONGOING RENTAL OBLIGATIONS | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $1,783.75 RECEIPT #2022003697 | |
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF RENT DEPOSIT | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $4.00 RECEIPT #2022003543 | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION ISSUED TO JACOB HOPPER | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION ISSUED TO TRENT MOORE | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - 01/26/2022 @ 02:00 PM | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO AMEND PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT - STAPLES FAMILY WATER LOSS PERSONAL PROPERTY TOTAL | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS UNAVAILABILITY | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $5,336.25 RECEIPT #2022003074 | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | LANDLORD FORMAL NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION - MOTION FOR HEARING ON FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR HEARING ON FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 01.26.22 1:30 PM | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT - CERTIFICATE OF ANALYSIS | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT - AMENDED TO LEASE AGREEMENT | |
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY VERIFIED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION PURSUANT TO RULE 1.610 OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE | |
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT B2 | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT A | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS SUPPLEMENT OF EXPERTS REPORTS TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DETEMRINE RENT AND RELEASE RENT PAID INTO REGISTRY FOR THE BENEFIT OF PLAINTIFF-COUNTER DEFENDANT STAPLES | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT B1 | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
October 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TEMPORARY WITHDRAWAL OF HEARING | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT E | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING: 10.26.21 3:00 | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT D | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT B | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT A | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EMERGENCY VERIFIED MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION PURUSANT TO RULE 1.610 OF THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT C | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT B | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING EXPERTS REPORTS ON TOXIC MOLD CONTAMINATION AT PAINTIFFS LEASED RESIDENCE LOCATED AT 9413 LITTLE ROCK STREET, PORT CHARLOTTE FLORIDA 33981 | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT A | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT C | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING @: 10.26.21 3:00 | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING @ 10:26:21 3:00 | |
October 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - 10/26/2021 @ 03:00 PM | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OF EVICTION | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS DEPOSITION | |
October 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PLAINTIFFS UNAVAILABILITY | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT AND RELEASE RENT PAID INTO REGISTRY FOR THE BENEFIT OF PLAINTIFF-COUNTER DEFENDANT STAPLES | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM DEFENDANTS PROJECT EXIT LLC, JOSEPH IANNELLO AND AMELIA PERRI | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM: PROJECT EXIT LLC ON 11.09.21 10:00 AM | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM: PROJECT EXIT LLC 11.09.21 10:00 AM | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM: JOSEPH IANNELLO 11.10.21 10:00 AM | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS FILING BANKRUPTCY COURTS ORDER GRANTING CONSENTED STAY RELIEF EFFECTIVE ON SEPTEMBER 29, 2021 FOR THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE THE STATE COURT MATTER AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR STATUS CONFERENCE | |
September 26, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL CREDITOR PROJECT EXIT LLC, PRODUCTION OF INSURANCE POLICY INFORMATION PURSUANT TO FLORIDA STATUTES 627.4137(1) | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF HAMILTON STAPLES DISCLOSURE OF EXPERTS DETERMINATION OF MOLD LABORATORY ANALYSIS OF AIR SAMPLES | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF HAMILTON STAPLES INITIAL DISCLOSURE OF EXPERTS IN ACCORDANCE WITH FLORIDA RULE OF PROCEDURE 1.280(B)(4)(A) | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF RENT DEPOSIT | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $1,783.75 RECEIPT #2021032582 | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS 7 DAY NOTICE OF DEFAULT, SUMMONS, CERTIICATES OF SERVICE, AFFIRMATION DEFENSES AND COUTER COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING : 07.14.21 9:00 AM | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF RENT DEPOSIT | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $315.00 RECEIPT #2021028803 | |
June 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $1,783.75 RECEIPT #2021028934 | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED 6/8/21 HAMILTON STAPLES | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED 6/8/21 UNKNOWN TENANTS | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTER-PETITION | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS FOR PROJECT EXIT LLC SERVED 05.24.21 | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE SUMMONS FOR PROJECT EXIT LLC SERVED 05.24.21 | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST PROJECT EXIT LLC | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST JOSEPH IANNELLO | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $1,783.75 RECEIPT #2021026663 | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF RENT DEPOSIT | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $215.00 RECEIPT #2021026554 | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST AMELIA PERRI | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 05/17/2021 CASE NUMBER 21000474CC | |
May 31, 1974 | Docket Event | ||
May 31, 150 | Docket Event | ||
May 31, 119 | Docket Event | ||
May 31, 115 | Docket Event | ||
May 31, 108 | Docket Event | ||
May 31, 107 | Docket Event |