Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TRAN, NHU vs. ST. MIKLOSSY, ROBERT S
A Quiet Title < $50k case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL. Judge GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 13, 2022
Last Refreshed
December 29, 2023
Filing Location
Charlotte County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
Quiet Title < $50K
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Quiet Title
Status
Closed
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed by the Plaintiff, NHU TRAN, against the Defendants, ROBERT S. ST. MIKLOSSY and ROBERTA M. ST. MIKLOSSY. The purpose of the complaint is to quiet the tax title to a certain real property in Charlotte County…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
12/1/2022
Date: May 31, 20442/3/2023
Date: May 05, 20249/13/2022
Date: May 05, 20247/22/2023
Date: May 05, 20245/15/2023
Date: May 03, 20248/24/2023
Date: May 03, 20247/13/2023
Date: May 03, 20249/13/2022
Date: May 03, 20249/14/2022
Date: May 02, 20245/17/2023
Date: May 02, 202411/9/2022
Date: May 02, 202411/10/2022
Date: May 02, 20246/7/2023
Date: May 02, 20244/24/2023
Date: May 02, 20245/22/2023
Date: May 02, 20249/13/2022
Date: May 02, 20248/17/2023
Date: May 02, 202410/28/2022
Date: May 02, 20248/22/2023
Date: May 02, 20244/20/2023
Date: May 02, 202410/28/2022
Date: May 01, 202411/10/2022
Date: May 01, 20245/22/2023
Date: May 01, 20244/24/2023
Date: May 01, 20249/13/2022
Date: May 01, 20245/25/2023
Date: May 01, 20247/13/2023
Date: May 01, 20246/30/2023
Date: May 01, 20246/6/2023
Date: May 01, 20248/23/2023
Date: May 01, 2024PAYMENT 429.00 RECEIPT 2022040369
Date: Sep 13, 2022STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES IN CHARLOTTE COUNTY
Date: Sep 13, 2022SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED - ROBERT S ST MIKLOSSY - SEPTEMBER 13, 2022
Date: Sep 13, 2022VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: Sep 13, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS
Date: Sep 13, 2022COMPLAINT TO QUIET TAX TITLE
Date: Sep 13, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Sep 13, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2044 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $429.00 RECEIPT #2022040369 | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES IN CHARLOTTE COUNTY | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED - ROBERT S ST MIKLOSSY - SEPTEMBER 13, 2022 | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS REQUEST - SUMMONS ISSUED - ROBERTA M ST MIKLOSSY - SEPTEMBER 13, 2022 | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT TO QUIET TAX TITLE | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/13/2022 CASE NUMBER 22001261CA |