Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Big Jim V, Llc, filed a(n) Other - Matters Not Falling Within The Other Civil Subcategories case against Cakarnis Llc, Webb, Stephen G, represented by Horowitz, Gregg M, in the jurisdiction of Charlotte County, FL, . Charlotte County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with GENTILE, GEOFFREY H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2022 |
CategoryOther - Matters Not Falling Within The Other Civil Subcategories |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCharlotte County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023008403
Date: December 27, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST CAKARNIS LLC
Date: December 23, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED AGAINST STEPHEN G. WEBB
Date: December 23, 2022STANDING ORDER IN CIVIL CASES
Date: December 23, 2022COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES
Date: December 23, 2022CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 23, 2022ORDER SETTING MANDATORY JUDICIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND NOTICE OF HEARING 3/27/23 10AM
Date: February 10, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND DAMAGES
Date: January 31, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE JAN 6, 2023- CAKARNIS LLC
Date: February 09, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING - 02/14/2023 @ 09:30 AM
Date: February 09, 2023MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: February 09, 2023COURT MINUTES
Date: February 14, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION - CAKARNIS, LLC,STEVE WEBB
Date: January 27, 2023NOTICE OF RELINQUISHMENT OF THE PREMISES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: February 09, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: January 10, 2023RETURN OF SERVICE JAN 6, 2023 - STEPHEN G. WEBB
Date: February 09, 20233/3/2023
Date: June 01, 20245/15/2023
Date: June 01, 20242/24/2023
Date: June 01, 20241/10/2023
Date: June 02, 202412/27/2022
Date: June 01, 20247/6/2023
Date: June 02, 20242/9/2023
Date: June 02, 202412/23/2022
Date: June 03, 20242/10/2023
Date: June 02, 20245/18/2023
Date: June 02, 20246/14/2023
Date: June 02, 202412/23/2022
Date: June 05, 20242/9/2023
Date: June 11, 20242/9/2023
Date: June 12, 20486/9/2023
Date: June 02, 20244/3/2023
Date: June 02, 202412/23/2022
Date: June 02, 20247/5/2023
Date: June 01, 20241/27/2023
Date: June 02, 20242/9/2023
Date: June 06, 20243/27/2023
Date: June 01, 20241/31/2023
Date: June 12, 20492/14/2023
Date: June 01, 20248/7/2023
Date: June 01, 20248/25/2023
Date: June 01, 20249/18/2023
Date: June 01, 20248/9/2023
Date: June 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2049 | Docket Event | ||
June 12, 2048 | Docket Event | ||
June 12, 2041 | Docket Event | ||
June 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.