Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
VAN T BICHTRAN, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS NATURAL PARENT AND LEGAL GUARDIAN OF I.N. A MINOR vs JOAN C VARNES
An Auto Negligence Case case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge AHO, MARIANNE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 17, 2023
Last Refreshed
October 03, 2023
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit Civil
Category
Auto Negligence Case
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I I.N., MINOR - NEGLIGENCE AGAINST DEFENDANT JOAN CHARLENE VARNES
COUNT II I.N. MINOR - NEGLIGENCE AGAINST DEFENDANT ALLAN LANG VARNES
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION (PLTFS)
Date: Aug 22, 2023NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -DEFENDANTS
Date: Jul 13, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANTS FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF
Date: Jun 20, 2023CASE FEES PAID: 20.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4406194
Date: May 17, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOAN CHARLENE VARNES
Date: May 17, 2023AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: May 08, 2023CASE FEES PAID: 401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4358837
Date: Mar 21, 2023ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES
Date: Mar 21, 2023COVER SHEET
Date: Mar 17, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: Mar 17, 2023Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONSOLIDATION (PLTF'S) | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -DEFENDANT'S | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INTERROGATORIES (DEFENDANT'S) TO PLAINTIFF | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT'S FIRST) TO PLAINTIFF | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT ALLAN LANG VARENS') TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JAMES HANRATTY FOR JOAN VARNES AND ALLAN VARNES FOR (DEFENDANTS) | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFENDANT JOAN CHARLENE VARNES') TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 06/01/2023 12:35PM PERSONAL, ALLAN L VARNES | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 06/01/2023 12:35PM SUBSTITUTE, ALLAN L VARNES FOR JOAN C VARNES | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO ALLAN LANG BARNES | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $20.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4406194 | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOAN CHARLENE VARNES | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $401.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4358837 | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR NON-COMPLEX CASES | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE |