Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ehrlich, Charlie, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case against Miami New Times Llc, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
CategoryLibel / Slander |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Charlie Ehrlich against Miami New Times, LLC for defamation by implication. The complaint alleges that the defendant published an article that contained false and offensive statements about Mr. Ehrlich. The...
Complaint
Date: March 21, 2023Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 15, 2023Motion to Transfer
Date: July 14, 2023Order of Transfer (jud Sect Chg) Section:
Date: July 24, 2023Motion:
Date: July 14, 2023Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: August 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting CM Deadline Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Transfer (jud Sect Chg) Section: CA 15 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Transfer TO SECTION CA (CA) Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion: TO CONSOLIDATE Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: MIAMI NEW TIMES LLC |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:3130032 AMT PAID:$10.00 NAME:HANTMAN, ROBERT JAY 1120 AVENUE OF THE AMERICAS FL 4 NEW YORK NY 10036-6700 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3139-SUMMONS ISSUE FEE 1 $10.00 $10.00 TENDER TYPE:EFILINGS TENDER AMT:$10.00 RECEIPT DATE:04/14/2023 REGISTER#:313 CASHIER:EFILINGUSER Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
ESummons 20 Day Issued RE: INDEX # 5. Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: MIAMI NEW TIMES LLC |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
20 Day Summons Issued Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
(M) 20 Day (C) Summons (Sub) Received Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.