Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Palmer, Markieph, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case against Robertson, Shamica, in the jurisdiction of Miami-Dade County, FL, . Miami-Dade County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2023 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationMiami-Dade County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
This complaint is a legal document filed in either the County Court or Circuit Court of the Eleventh Judicial Circuit in Miami-Dade County, Florida. The plaintiff, identified as Shamice Robertson, is suing the defendant for damages in the amount of $...
Complaint
Date: June 16, 2023Notice of Appeal
Date: August 17, 2023Order Setting CM Deadline
Date: August 25, 2023Order:
Date: August 16, 2023Memorandum of Disposition
Date: August 22, 2023Motion:
Date: July 28, 2023Motion:
Date: July 25, 2023Notice of Production
Date: July 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar MOTION FOR CONTEMPT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting CM Deadline Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Directions to The Clerk RECORD ON APPEAL Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Disposition HEARING DATE: 8/16/23 Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt: RECEIPT#:2590022 AMT PAID:$9.00 COMMENT: ALLOCATION CODE QUANTITY UNIT AMOUNT 3144-SUBPOENA - SIGN 3 $2.00 $6.00 3120-COPY 3 $1.00 $3.00 TENDER TYPE:INDIGENT TENDER AMT:$9.00 RECEIPT DATE:08/22/2023 REGISTER#:259 CASHIER:FERGUS Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Due Date: Complete Date: Parties: Palmer Markieph |
|
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order: DEEMING PLAINTIFF A VEXATIOUS LITIGANT Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 16, 2023 | Hearing |
Motion Calendar DEFENDANTS VEXATIOUS LITIGANT MOTION AGAINST PLAINTIFF Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing- AUGUST 16, 2023 AT 9:00 AM Due Date: Complete Date: |
|
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion: DEFENDANTS VEXATIOUS LITIGANT MOTION AGAINST PLAINTIFF Due Date: Complete Date: |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.