Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Apex Auto Glass Llc A A O Vennis Smith, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Infinity Indemnity Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 1987 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedAugust 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
NOTICE OF OBJECTION
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: September 16, 20214/14/2023
Date: May 31, 19874/18/2023
Date: May 02, 20248/5/2023
Date: May 01, 20245/17/2023
Date: May 01, 20244/14/2023
Date: May 31, 20494/29/2023
Date: May 01, 20244/13/2023
Date: May 11, 20243/16/2023
Date: May 03, 20245/2/2023
Date: May 09, 202412/22/2022
Date: May 01, 202411/8/2022
Date: May 01, 20243/27/2023
Date: May 01, 20243/16/2023
Date: May 01, 20249/22/2022
Date: May 13, 20249/19/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/12/2023
Date: May 01, 202410/27/2022
Date: May 01, 20249/26/2022
Date: May 01, 20244/17/2022
Date: May 01, 20249/16/2021
Date: May 01, 20246/2/2021
Date: May 13, 20246/2/2021
Date: May 04, 20246/2/2021
Date: May 09, 20246/21/2021
Date: May 01, 20246/2/2021
Date: May 23, 20246/2/2021
Date: May 08, 20246/4/2021
Date: May 01, 20246/2/2021
Date: May 06, 20246/2/2021
Date: May 03, 20246/2/2021
Date: May 01, 20246/2/2021
Date: May 05, 20242/16/2021
Date: May 01, 20243/23/2021
Date: May 02, 20243/23/2021
Date: May 01, 20246/2/2021
Date: May 11, 20246/2/2021
Date: May 10, 20242/11/2021
Date: May 01, 20242/2/2021
Date: May 01, 20242/1/2021
Date: May 03, 20246/1/2021
Date: May 31, 20483/4/2021
Date: May 01, 20241/30/2021
Date: May 06, 20241/30/2021
Date: May 02, 20241/30/2021
Date: May 01, 20241/30/2021
Date: May 03, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2049 | Docket Event | ||
May 31, 2048 | Docket Event | ||
May 23, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.