Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Vazquez, Jorge L, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case against Rivera, Maria E, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: April 11, 20223/28/2022
Date: January 01, 20243/28/2022
Date: January 02, 20245/17/2022
Date: January 03, 20245/2/2022
Date: January 01, 20243/28/2022
Date: January 08, 20244/11/2022
Date: January 01, 20245/17/2022
Date: January 11, 20243/28/2022
Date: January 03, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 28, 2022NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (IMG)
Date: March 28, 2022COMPLAINT FOR PARTITION SALE OF PROPERTY
Date: March 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.