Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Linda Herron, Scott Herron, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Zoltan Hovanyecz, against United Property And Casualty Insurance Company, represented by Michael K Kierman, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Ronald V. Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2018 |
CategoryInsurance Claim |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: February 21, 2019NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: June 06, 2019NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: June 10, 2019MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: September 26, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: November 25, 2019RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: March 11, 2019ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 21, 2019NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: November 25, 2019ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 11, 2019COMPLAINT
Date: December 14, 2018RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: August 21, 2019REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 24, 2019RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: March 11, 2019ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: January 18, 2019REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: November 25, 2019MEDIATION REPORT
Date: August 26, 2019NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: June 11, 2019ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 21, 2019MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: September 26, 2019RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: December 06, 2019MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 09, 2019NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL OF SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFFS FILED BY DFT
Date: December 23, 2019MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: January 23, 2019RESPONSE TO: PLTS EX-PARTE MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION DATES AND REQUEST FOR HEARING F/B DFT
Date: January 24, 2019NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: January 24, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: February 19, 2019NOTICE PRIVILEGE LOG F/B DEFT
Date: March 11, 2019NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: May 09, 2019EXHIBIT
Date: June 12, 2019MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: June 12, 2019MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: February 04, 2019PAID $411.00 ON RECEIPT 2964580
Date: December 18, 2018EXHIBIT
Date: June 12, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 08, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 29, 2019RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: November 12, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 14, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: December 14, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 16, 2019MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: September 10, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 04, 2019NOTICE AMENDED PRIVILEGE LOG FILED BY DFT
Date: December 06, 2019RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: December 05, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: January 06, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: January 09, 2020AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO
Date: December 23, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: December 23, 2019NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: June 24, 2020NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: January 06, 2020SUBPOENA ISSUED
Date: January 06, 2020NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: August 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE F/B PLTS |
|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED AFTER OTHER DAO - DISPOSED AFTER OTHER |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION 02/10/2020 | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM STACY CHAPMAN 02/10/2020 11:00:00 AM | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM MICHELLE ARMSTRONG 01/08/2020 11:00:00 AM | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA ISSUED SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS PURSUANT TO FLA. R. CIV. P. 1.410(E) MICHELLE ARMSTRONG |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL OF SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFFS FILED BY DFT OF SERVING PROPOSAL OF SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFFS FILED BY DFT |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE TAKING DEPO AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM (AMENDED AS TO LOCATION OF COURT REPORTER'S OFFICE ONLY) CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE FOR UNITED PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY 01/14/2020 11:00 AM |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM (TIME AND DATE COORDINATED WITH JULIA FROM OPPOSING COUNSEL'S OFFICE ON 12/13/19) CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE 01/14/2020 11:00:00 AM | |
December 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.