Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STEVEN
On January 01, 2024 a handicap parking case was filed against Steven Carlin, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL. Judge JACK GOLDBERGER presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 01, 2024
Last Refreshed
October 06, 2023
Filing Location
Palm Beach County, FL
Judge
Hon. JACK GOLDBERGER
Category
HANDICAP PARKING
Parties
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
09/17/2020
Date: Jan 16, 203407/30/2020
Date: Jan 16, 203307/02/2020
Date: Jan 31, 202407/02/2020
Date: Jan 30, 202407/02/2020
Date: Jan 28, 202406/03/2020
Date: Jan 26, 202406/02/2020
Date: Jan 25, 202405/21/2020
Date: Jan 22, 202405/21/2020
Date: Jan 21, 202403/25/2020
Date: Jan 16, 202403/25/2020
Date: Jan 14, 202403/12/2020
Date: Jan 12, 202403/12/2020
Date: Jan 11, 202403/12/2020
Date: Jan 10, 202403/11/2020
Date: Jan 04, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2039 | Docket Event | MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING | |
January 16, 2036 | Docket Event | OFFICER NOT PRESENT | |
January 16, 2035 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED / NOT SERVED | |
January 16, 2034 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSUED TO HARE, ROBERT. EMAIL SENT: NO | |
January 16, 2033 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED / NOT SERVED | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSUED | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 28, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING OFC REQ FOR CONT | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSUED | |
January 21, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSUED | |
January 14, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | MINUTES OF COURT PROCEEDING | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA ISSUED | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY | |
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | CITATION/CASE CREATED |