Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Maria Downs, filed a(n) 3 case represented by Lake H Lytal, against Racquel Orlis Octavia Edwards, represented by Robert O'Malley, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
Category3 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by Maria Downs against Racquel Orlis Octavia Edwards. The complaint alleges that on or about July 10, 2022, Edwards, who was a transportation network company driver, negligently operated her vehicle and caused it to come into ...
PAID $401.00 ON RECEIPT 4830702
Date: March 24, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 20, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 20, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: August 02, 2023RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: August 08, 2023SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED)
Date: May 24, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: June 08, 2023SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: May 01, 2023CERTIFICATE
Date: July 27, 2023ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 17, 2023MOTION DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE
Date: August 10, 2023RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: August 17, 2023MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: August 17, 2023ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: June 05, 2023NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: June 08, 2023PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 4887186
Date: May 05, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
Date: June 23, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CIVIL
Date: June 08, 2023NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION
Date: June 23, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: June 23, 2023NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: July 12, 2023NOTICE OF FILING INTERROGS
Date: June 23, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: June 23, 2023REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: July 13, 2023MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: July 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AND RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME F/B DFT |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER B HARPER DTD 7/27/23 THAT PLTFS MOTION IS GRANTED. PLTF MARIA DOWNS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 8/8/23 TO RESPOND TO DFTS DISCOVERY WHICH INCLUDES REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND INTERROGS. B HARPER DTD 7/27/23 THAT PLTFS MOTION IS GRANTED. PLTF MARIA DOWNS SHALL HAVE UNTIL 8/8/23 TO RESPOND TO DFTS DISCOVERY WHICH INCLUDES REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS AND INTERROGS. |
|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY FILED BY PLT |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES F/B PLT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.