Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
New Penn Financial Llc Dba Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, filed a(n) Homeres4Close$50,001-$250,000 case represented by Dolan, Ian, Koch, Heather, against Harris, Michael D, Harris, Michael Trustee Of Marlow 94 Family Trust, Sarasota Coastal Credit Union, States Of America Internal Revenue Service, Unknown Beneficiary Of The Marlow 94 Family Trust, (total of 6) See All represented by Gonzalez, Enrico, Rudy, John Forney Iii, Veschio, Victor, Wadler, Joan, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts Circuit with WALKER, STEPHEN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2011 |
CategoryHomeres4Close$50,001-$250,000 |
Last RefreshedMay 17, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint is a mortgage foreclosure complaint filed by GMAC Mortgage, LLC against several defendants. GMAC Mortgage, LLC is the holder of the note and mortgage in question. The defendants include Michael D. Harris, trustee of the Marlow 94 Famil...
ATTORNEY'S CERT.OF COMPLIANCE
Date: November 14, 2011SUMMONS SERVED UNKNOWN TENANTS NKA JENNIFER MARLOW
Date: March 28, 2011CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - DOCUMENT(S) RETURN
Date: December 02, 2011RESPONSE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Date: October 18, 2012CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC-RETURNED DOCUMENTS
Date: September 07, 2011ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY PLAINTIFF (DITECH FINANCIAL LLC)
Date: January 18, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 11, 2012AMENDED PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AFFIDAVIT OF TIME EFFORT COST AND FEES
Date: August 21, 2018NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVITS (NOT ATTACHED)
Date: October 24, 2018COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: June 10, 2014NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 01, 2015PAYMENT $0.00 RECEIPT #2019009302
Date: January 28, 2019ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: June 10, 2014MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: February 02, 2016EXHIBIT - N (8 OF 13)
Date: October 25, 2019EXHIBIT A
Date: October 25, 2019ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE
Date: February 05, 2016COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: January 18, 2017MAIL RETURNED - MICHAEL D. HARRIS
Date: May 15, 2017MAIL RETURNED - SARASOTA COASTAL CREDIT UNION ACHIEVEA CREDIT UNION
Date: March 20, 2017CERTIFICATE OR SERVICE
Date: March 21, 2017MOTION - AMENDED - FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS
Date: August 21, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 14, 2018ORDER ON MOTION TO AMEND PARTY PLAINTIFF NAME
Date: February 20, 2019REPORT - MEDIATOR
Date: July 23, 2015AFFIDAVIT - UNKNOWN MILITARY STATUS
Date: October 24, 2018MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE-JENNIFER KAYE MARLOW
Date: January 28, 2019MAIL RETURNED - MICHAEL D HARRIS
Date: August 27, 2019ORDER SETTING COURT DATE - CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: July 22, 2019COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: October 28, 2019NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: November 13, 2019LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED
Date: February 22, 2011NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 04, 2011NOTICE OF HEARING--AMENDED
Date: July 18, 2012MAIL RETURNED MICHAEL D. HARRIS
Date: May 14, 2014DEFENDANT JENNIFER MARLOWS MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: June 10, 2014MAIL RETURNED - MICHAEL HARRIS
Date: August 28, 2013CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM CLERK
Date: March 15, 2021NOTICE - OF OBJECTION - JENNIFER MARLOW
Date: May 20, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: May 13, 2022CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC
Date: May 13, 2022OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT- JENNIFER MARLOW
Date: July 19, 2019MOTION - TO RESET SALE
Date: December 30, 2022MOTION - PRO SE - JENNIFER MARLOW
Date: September 23, 2023MOTION - AMENDED - FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - DEFENDANT
Date: September 20, 2023ORDER SETTING COURT DATE
Date: June 20, 2019FORECLOSURE - NOTICE SALE PROPOSED
Date: July 11, 2023NOTICE OF FILING - ORDER DENYING CONFIRMATION AND DISMISSING BANKRUPTCY CASE
Date: January 11, 2023MOTION - REVISED SECOND MOTION TO DISQUALIFY JUDGE
Date: December 21, 2023RESPONSE - TO NOTICE OF OBJECTION
Date: June 03, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: May 12, 2023COMPLAINT FORECLS >$50,000-249,999.99 RECEIPT: 664384 DATE: 04/12/2011
Date: February 22, 2011APPEAL - ORDER - 2D23-1692
Date: August 09, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: February 22, 2011MOTION - PRO SE - JENNIFER MARLOW
Date: September 26, 2023SUMMONS SERVED - SUBSTITUTE SERVED BOB KELEHER FOR MICHAEL HARRIS, TRUSTEE
Date: March 28, 2011MOTION - TO APPOINT GUARDIAN, ADMINISTRATOR, AND ATTORNEY AD LITEM
Date: March 07, 2011ANSWER & AFFIRM DEF - USA-IRS
Date: March 18, 2011MOTION - PRO SE - TO DISQUALIFY JUDGE WALKER FROM CASE
Date: December 01, 2023NOTICE OF FILING - ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE
Date: April 20, 2011MOTION TO STRIKE MOTION FOR DEFAULT AS SHAM PLEADING AND REQUEST FOR REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEE
Date: September 12, 2011MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: December 14, 2011REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: December 19, 2011NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 13, 2012CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: July 02, 2014PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: April 01, 2015NOTICE OF ACTION - PROPOSED
Date: March 16, 2011MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF
Date: September 29, 2016ORDER ADOPTING RECOMMENDED ORDER - ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: March 21, 2016COURT APPEARANCE FORM - CIVIL COURT APPEARANCE FORM - CIVIL SENT ON: 12/01/2011 17:11:25
Date: December 01, 2011MAIL RETURNED - ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION C/O KEVIN PAUL, ESQ.
Date: April 04, 2016NOTICE - OF BORROWER NONPARTICIPATION WITH RMFM PROGRAM
Date: April 11, 2011NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS
Date: January 05, 2017ORDER FOR RESPONSE
Date: March 09, 2017ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT
Date: March 21, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF JENNIFER K MARLOW AS THE DEFENDANT
Date: January 27, 2017CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM JUDICIAL ASSISTANT TO KASS SHULER
Date: May 06, 2013MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY PLAINTIFF
Date: January 16, 2018MOTION - PRO SE - RELIEF FROM FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: April 25, 2023NOTICE - VALUE
Date: February 22, 2011APPEAL - ORDER - MOTION - STAY PENDING APPEAL - DENIED
Date: December 06, 2019NOTICE OF FILING - ORIGINAL NOTE, MORTGAGE AND ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE
Date: September 14, 2011NOTICE - PLTF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR DEFAULT FOR SARASOTA COASTAL CREDIT UNION
Date: December 05, 2011NOTICE - COPY OF MOTION TO REOPEN CHAPTER 7 JENNIFER MARLOW
Date: October 08, 2018CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2010-11-1
Date: August 21, 2018NOTICE OF FILING - ORIGINAL NOTE - ORIGINAL OR COPY OF MORTGAGE AND ASSIGMENT (EFILED)
Date: September 13, 2011NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: June 01, 2012ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL - 2D19-4277
Date: April 30, 2020ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D19-4277
Date: March 19, 2020ORDER - DENYING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS
Date: July 22, 2019MOTION - TO CANCAL AND RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: April 17, 2023NOTICE OF SETTING MEDIATION
Date: March 30, 2015SUBPOENA - PROPOSED
Date: April 13, 2023CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - JENNIFER MARLOW
Date: April 18, 2023EXHIBIT G-2
Date: October 25, 2019ORDER SETTING COURT DATE - ZOOM
Date: April 18, 2023NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: April 14, 2015TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS SEPTEMBER 17, 2019 - APPEAL
Date: November 06, 2019INDIGENCY APPLICATION APPROVED - JENNIFER MARLOW
Date: November 06, 2019NOTICE OF DISPUTE- JENNIFER MARLOW
Date: June 02, 2014ORDER ON MOTION - REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: January 08, 2015APPEAL MANDATE & OPINION ISSUED ON APPEAL - AFFIRMED - 2D19-4277
Date: January 12, 2021AGREED ORDER - ON STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: June 22, 2015NOTICE - OF ABSENCE FROM JURISDICATION AND /OR UNAVAILABILITY
Date: May 07, 2023COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: June 25, 2015NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - HEARING
Date: March 05, 2013ORDER ON MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: December 04, 2012CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM PHELAN HALLINAN DIAMOND & JONES PLLC
Date: March 24, 2017MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF PARTIES AND AMEND CASE STYLE
Date: December 27, 2013CHECKLIST - MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: October 28, 2019LIST - EXHIBIT
Date: October 25, 2019THIRD AMENDED AFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 21, 2018MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT
Date: February 24, 2017ANSWER - AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE OF ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION
Date: March 30, 2011AFFIDAVIT - DILIGENT SEARCH
Date: March 16, 2011RESPONSE - MOTION FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING
Date: January 20, 2020APPEAL COVERSHEET & INDEX PREPARED AND FORWARDED TO APPELLATE PARTIES / 2D19-4277
Date: December 11, 2019EVIDENCE RECORD - 5031 - PLAINTIFF
Date: May 09, 2024SUGGESTION/NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: February 21, 2020CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC
Date: December 13, 2011NOTICE- MANDATORY JUDICIAL NOTICE- JENNIFER MARLOW
Date: October 22, 2018AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY STATUS
Date: October 22, 2018NOTICE - OF OBJECTION
Date: January 11, 2023NOTICE - SERVING ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING
Date: September 23, 2019ORDER SETTING CASE FOR ALL PENDING MOTIONS HEARING
Date: November 18, 2014NOTICE OF FILING - ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE (EFILED)
Date: April 04, 2011ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL - 2D19-4277
Date: May 11, 2020COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: January 08, 2015EXHIBIT N
Date: October 25, 2019ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL - 2D19-4277
Date: June 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT- OF NON MILITARY SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2018DECLARATION
Date: December 16, 2020CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM JUDICIAL ASSISTANT
Date: March 26, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: October 26, 2018CHECKLIST
Date: January 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT- ADDITIONAL COSTS, INTEREST AND PAYMENTS
Date: February 12, 2020RECOMMENDED ORDER OF MAGISTRATE - ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: March 01, 2016AFFIDAVIT- OF PLAINTIFF LACK OF KNOWLEDGE AS TO DEFENDANT MILITARY STATUS
Date: October 26, 2018ORDER - GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY
Date: June 21, 2022MOTION - DISMISS - LACK OF JURISDICTION
Date: October 25, 2019ORDER - MOTION TO WITHDRAW RECENT FILINGS - DENIED
Date: June 02, 2021EXHIBIT N (8 OF 13)
Date: October 25, 2019FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE SALE PROPOSED
Date: January 22, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 07, 2023CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - MAILED TO JENNIFER MARLOW
Date: April 18, 2023ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE
Date: June 04, 2012COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: April 26, 2023EXHIBIT - N
Date: October 25, 2019NOTICE - ABSENCE FROM JURISDICTION AND/OR UNAVAILABILITY
Date: May 01, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 15, 2013RECEIPT - REVIEW AND ACTION TAKEN REGARDING CORRESPONDENCE
Date: July 10, 2023MOTION - DISQUALIFY JUDGE WALKER
Date: July 15, 2023PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE SUCCESSOR COUNSEL
Date: March 21, 2017EXHIBIT K
Date: October 25, 2019CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - DIAZ ANSELMO & ASSOCIATES PA
Date: July 10, 2023MAIL RETURNED - ACHIEVA CREDIT UNION
Date: March 15, 2016ORDER FROM DISTRICT COURT OF APPEALS - 2D19-4277
Date: December 23, 2020CERTIFICATE - MAILING
Date: July 10, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL - FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019153486)
Date: November 06, 2019AFFIDAVIT - LACK OF KNOWLEDGE AS TO DEFENDANTS MILITARY STATUS
Date: October 22, 2018MOTION - FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 20, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: May 02, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE
Date: August 21, 2018NOTICE OF APPEAL - FILED AND RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2023125064)
Date: August 09, 2023PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 23, 2013PAYMENT $100.00 RECEIPT #2023076470
Date: August 09, 2023STIPULATION-SUBSTITUTION COUNSEL
Date: April 28, 2014PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MS MARLOW'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT
Date: March 19, 2017PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE
Date: November 22, 2019MOTION - TO STAY SALE DATE PENDING OUTCOME OF APPEAL
Date: September 12, 2023MOTION - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: September 12, 2023MOTION - RESET SALE
Date: May 11, 2022CERTIFICATE - MAILING
Date: May 13, 2022OBJECTION - TO EACH COURT RULING MADE IN ZOOM SESSION 7/5/23 - JENNIFER MARLOW
Date: July 10, 2023ORDER - JUDICIAL SALES - RESET SALE
Date: July 10, 2023ORDER - ON MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM UNIFORM FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
Date: July 10, 2023ORDER - ON MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 10, 2023APPEAL - ORDER - 2D23-1692
Date: November 30, 2023REQUEST - FOR TRIAL BY JURY
Date: December 01, 2023NOTICE-HEARING
Date: December 09, 2016ORDER - STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: February 27, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: November 23, 2020ADDRESS CHANGE - FIRM NAME AND E SERVICE ADDRESS
Date: November 23, 2020ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL - 2D19-4277
Date: July 08, 2020RECEIPT OF CORRESPONDENCE FROM JUDGE
Date: December 28, 2020NOTICE - REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES
Date: June 13, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: January 20, 2023NOTICE - SERVING
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - OF HEARING
Date: March 07, 2023PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE
Date: May 27, 2022CERTIFICATE - MAILING
Date: June 21, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING - CROSS
Date: February 18, 2019MOTION TO AMEND PARTY PLAINTIFF NAME DUE TO NAME CHANGE
Date: February 13, 2019ORDER - ON AMENDED OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REST SALE
Date: July 10, 2023MOTION - TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: September 27, 2023ORDER ON PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTIES AND AMEND CASE STYLE
Date: May 27, 2014ACKNOWLEDGEMENT BY APPELLATE COURT OF NEW APPEAL CASE - 2D23-2089
Date: September 28, 2023LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - AMENDED
Date: June 08, 2020APPEAL - ORDER 2D23-1692
Date: January 31, 2024COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: February 14, 2024TRIAL/ MOTION RECORD
Date: February 14, 2024EVIDENCE RECORD - 49804 - PLAINTIFF
Date: February 14, 2024ORDER - DENYING MOTION TO DISQAULIFY JUDGE
Date: August 11, 2023TRANSCRIPT - JULY 5, 2023
Date: August 10, 2023PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION
Date: March 07, 2011MAIL RETURNED - MICHAEL D HARRIS
Date: May 09, 2017PAYMENT $267,050.57 RECEIPT #2023094032
Date: October 02, 2023ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: March 24, 2017NOTICE - JUDICIAL OF ADJUDICATED FACTS
Date: October 12, 2023APPEAL - ORDER - 2D23-1692
Date: October 13, 2023COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: November 22, 2023COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: May 08, 2024JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: February 19, 2018RECEIPT - EVIDENCE TRANSFER
Date: May 08, 2024TRIAL/ MOTION RECORD
Date: May 08, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 14, 2024EXHIBIT
Date: May 09, 2024EXHIBIT G2
Date: October 25, 2019NOTICE - FILING US BANKRUPTCY ORDER OF TERMINATION OF AUTOMATIC STAY
Date: July 22, 2019FORECLOSURE - CHECKLIST (JUDGMENT)
Date: September 13, 2019TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS OCTOBER 28, 2019 - APPEAL
Date: November 06, 2019PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2020018035
Date: February 20, 2020MOTION - FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 30, 2023ORDER - QUASHING SUBPOENAS
Date: July 10, 2023COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: July 05, 2023OBJECTION - TO ORDER OF REFERRAL TO CIVIL MAGISTRATE
Date: September 19, 2023ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE
Date: September 14, 2023SUBPOENA RETURNED - RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICE - CORPORATE SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS TO CO-COUNSEL ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF
Date: February 15, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: December 26, 2018COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: October 23, 2018PAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2022044062
Date: May 17, 2022PAYMENT $6.00 RECEIPT #2023056991
Date: June 12, 2023MOTION - DISBURSE PROCEEDS, AMEND FINAL JUDGMENT AND RESET SALE
Date: October 03, 2023MOTION - PRO SE - TO DISMISS NUNC PRO TUNC
Date: October 23, 2023CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM JENNIFER MARLOW
Date: June 08, 2020ORDER - OMNIBUS - PRO SE FILINGS
Date: October 02, 2023CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC - FROM JENNIFER KAY MARLOW
Date: December 16, 2020MOTION - TO STRIKE MOTION TO DISBURSE PROCEEDS, AMEND FINAL JUDGMENT AND RESET SALE
Date: October 06, 2023NOTICE- & DEMAND BY ALLEGED DEFENDANT- JENNIFER MARLOW DEFENDANT
Date: June 06, 2022NOTICE - DEFAULT
Date: September 08, 2023PETITION- FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION
Date: November 20, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 04, 2023NOTICE - OF OBJECTION - AMENDED
Date: January 17, 2023CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT - PROPOSED
Date: January 22, 2019ORDER - RESCHEDULING SALE
Date: May 12, 2022MAIL RETURNED - MICHAEL D. HARRIS
Date: February 26, 2015CORRESPONDENCE - PRO SE
Date: October 24, 2023ORDER - DISMISS NUNC PRO TUNC
Date: November 09, 2023PAYMENT $70.00 REFUND $70.00 RECEIPT #2023092540
Date: September 27, 2023RECEIPT REVIEW AND ACTION CORRESPONDENCE
Date: October 30, 2023MOTION FOR SANCTIONS AGAINST PLANTIFF AND PLANTIFFS COUNSEL
Date: July 27, 2023ACKNOWLEDGEMENT BY APPELLATE COURT OF NEW APPEAL CASE / 2D19-4277
Date: November 07, 2019PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 27, 2023SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY
Date: June 24, 2022ORDER
Date: June 20, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD
Date: May 11, 2015MAIL RETURNED - MICHAEL D HARRIS AKA MICHAEL HARRIS
Date: March 10, 2020JOINT MOTION AND STIPULATION FOR THE ENTRY OF AN AGREED ORDER
Date: June 08, 2015NOTICE OF FILING - RECEIPT, REVIEW AND ACTION TAKEN REGARDING CORRESPONDENCE
Date: January 08, 2024NOTICE - OF CLAIM
Date: August 08, 2023FORECLOSURE FORM A
Date: February 22, 2011NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: March 16, 2011NOTICE OF ACTION - PROPOSED
Date: March 07, 2011CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ORDER
Date: June 28, 2022CORRESPONDENCE PUBLIC
Date: March 10, 2011CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 2010-11.1
Date: April 15, 2011AFFIDAVIT - POST JUDGMENT INTEREST AND ADVANCES
Date: October 02, 2023AFFIDAVIT - NON-MILITARY
Date: May 23, 2011AFFIDAVIT - IN SUPPORT OF DISQUALIFICATION
Date: December 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT - IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: August 25, 2011AFFIDAVIT - REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: August 25, 2011AFFIDAVIT - OF ATTORNEY AS TO COSTS AND TIME EXPENDED
Date: August 25, 2011NOTICE - JUDICIAL
Date: November 21, 2011PROOF OF SERVICE - MOTION - SERVED - JUDGE STEPHEN WALKER
Date: December 05, 2023NOTICE - SERVICE BY MAIL OF ORDER ON MOTION TO STRIKE MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: November 30, 2011MOTION - TO QUASH PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - DEFENDANTS
Date: December 09, 2011NOTICE OF SERVING OF REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: February 21, 2012SUBPOENA
Date: September 13, 2012COURT APPEARANCE FORM - CIVIL COURT APPEARANCE FORM - CIVIL SENT ON: 11/21/2012 13:29:13
Date: November 21, 2012RESPONSE REQUEST PRODUCTION
Date: October 04, 2012OBJECTION TO AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 17, 2012NOTICE OF FILING - PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 27, 2012ORDER - JUDICIAL SALES - DENYING DEFENDANT MOTION TO STAY SALE DATE PENDING APPEAL
Date: October 02, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: May 12, 2014NOTICE-FILING- SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: April 25, 2014ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: May 22, 2014COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: May 27, 2014MOTION FOR TERMINATION OF APPOINTMENT AS ATTORNEY, ADMINISTRATOR, AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: February 03, 2015NOTICE OF SETTING MEDIATION
Date: February 06, 2015MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL-PLAINTIFFS
Date: April 28, 2014ORDER ON MOTION FOR TERMINATION OF APPOINTMENT AS ATTORNEY ADMINISTRATOR AND GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Date: February 11, 2015NOTICE-APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516
Date: February 12, 2015COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: September 17, 2019NOTICE OF CANCELLING MEDIAITON
Date: February 12, 2015ORDER ON MOTION - -DISCOVERY
Date: January 08, 2015RESPONSE - TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 24, 2019CERTIFICATE - OF SERVICE
Date: October 25, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 12, 2016LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020013095)
Date: January 29, 2020JUDICIAL NOTICE
Date: February 25, 2016LIS PENDENS FILED AND RECORDED
Date: June 08, 2020MOTION - SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL OF RECORD
Date: June 14, 2022OBJECTION - TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FILED JUNE 14 2022
Date: June 16, 2022MOTION TO DECLARE JURISDICTION ON THE RECORD - JENNIFER K MARLOW
Date: March 09, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 02, 2023AMENDED AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: August 21, 2018SUBPOENA ISSUED - RUSHMORE LOAN MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC - HANDED TO DEFENDANT
Date: June 12, 2023SUBPOENA ISSUED - ROY DIAZ, ESQ.-HANDED TO DEFENDANT
Date: June 12, 2023OBJECTION -TO ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISQUALIFY JUDGE
Date: August 13, 2023ORDER - PROPOSED
Date: January 22, 2019MOTION- FOR STAY PENDING APPEAL- JENNIFER MARLOW SUIJURIS DEFENDANT
Date: December 04, 2019NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR PLAINTIFF
Date: February 05, 2014COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: February 20, 2019MOTION - AMENDED - CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SALE
Date: September 27, 2023FORECLOSURE - CERTIFICATE TITLE PROPOSED
Date: January 22, 2019NOTICE - OF SERVING ORDER OF CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: July 09, 2019APPEAL - ORDER - 2D23-2089
Date: September 29, 2023OBJECTION - TO OMNIBUS ORDER OF OCTOBER 2 2023
Date: October 12, 2023NOTICE- OF SERVING COURT ORDER SETTING HEARING
Date: July 30, 2019NOTICE OF FILING - IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 25, 2019COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: July 22, 2019ORDER SETTING COURT DATE
Date: September 17, 2019APPEAL - ORDER - DENIED - 2D23-1692
Date: November 16, 2023JUDGMENT - FORECLOSURE - RECORDED - RECORDED (OR. / 2019148495)
Date: October 28, 2019ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL - 2D19-4277
Date: January 22, 2020MAIL RETURNED - MICHAEL HARRIS TRUSTEE OF MARLOW 94 FAMILY
Date: May 14, 2024ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME - APPEAL - 2D19-4277
Date: March 03, 2020AFFIDAVIT - OF POSSESSORY INTEREST - AMENDED
Date: June 08, 2020COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: May 19, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 13, 2021ORDER - DIRECTING WRITTEN RESPONSE
Date: May 26, 2022RECEIPT - REVIEW AND ACTION TAKEN REGARDING CORRESPONDENCE
Date: June 29, 2023APPEAL - ORDER - 2D23-1692
Date: August 10, 2023NOTICE - ADJUDICATED FACTS
Date: November 20, 2023EXHIBIT
Date: February 14, 2024ASSIGNMENT OF BID
Date: October 02, 2023COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: March 13, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: February 26, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: January 15, 2024NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: February 19, 2019NOTICE - OF BANKRUPTCY - JENNIFER MARLOW
Date: February 21, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED
Date: November 27, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING
Date: January 23, 2017NOTICE OF FILING - IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: October 25, 2019MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: September 21, 2023PROOF OF PUBLICATION OF SALE
Date: July 21, 2023REQUEST - PAYOFF
Date: October 02, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: January 26, 2018TRANSCRIPT - APRIL 26, 2023
Date: August 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED - MICHAEL HARRIS TRUSTEE OF MARLOW 94 FAMILY | |
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | EVIDENCE RECORD - 5031 - PLAINTIFF | |
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT | |
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | RECEIPT - EVIDENCE TRANSFER | |
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | TRIAL/ MOTION RECORD | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SEAL/UNSEAL DOCUMENT | |
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE - OF MAILING CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND ORDER FOLLOWING COURTS IN CAMERA INSPECTION | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: May 8 2024 1:30PM JUDGE: WALKER, STEPHEN LOCATION: JACS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.