Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Hayley Sirois, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Margaret Bencivenni, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts Circuit.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Case Outcome TypePending |
to respond to discovery by dft
Date: September 14, 2023to req for production
Date: November 09, 2023of ans to interrogs by pltf
Date: November 09, 2023w/case 2023 10629 Cidl by Margaret Bencivenni
Date: August 21, 2023Margaret Bencivenni w/affirmative defenses and demand for jury trial
Date: August 21, 2023of Hayley Sirois
Date: October 19, 2023to 1st req for admissions
Date: September 14, 2023answers to discovery by dft
Date: September 22, 2023by Hayley sirosi
Date: August 21, 2023(amd) of Hayley Sirois
Date: October 19, 2023to Hayley Sirois by Margaret Benchivenni
Date: August 21, 2023by pltf
Date: May 15, 2023as to Margaret Bencivenni
Date: March 20, 2023To MARGARET BENCIVENNI Frwd to Pltf's Atty via mail for SOP
Date: April 03, 2023exec Margaret Bencivenni
Date: August 07, 2023to Margaret Bencivenni by Hayley Sirois
Date: May 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | to req for production | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | of ans to interrogs by pltf | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | of Hayley Sirois | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | (amd) of Hayley Sirois | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | answers to discovery by dft | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | to respond to discovery by dft | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | to 1st req for admissions | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | w/case 2023 10629 Cidl by Margaret Bencivenni | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Margaret Bencivenni w/affirmative defenses and demand for jury trial | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | by Hayley sirosi |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.