Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Beatrice Degalassus VS Dekalb County Property Appraisal
A Tax Assessor case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA. Judge Hydrick, Stacey K. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
April 09, 2024
Filing Location
Dekalb County, GA
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Morris, Shondeana;Category
Tax Assessor
Practice Area
Tax
Matter Type
General Tax
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Consolidation
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Scanned from a Xerox Multifunction Printer
Date: Apr 01, 202418CV4783 2024march31 Rule 22 recording of hearing
Date: Apr 01, 202418CV4783 Notice
Date: Mar 15, 202418CV4783
Date: Nov 09, 202318CV4783 2023nov7 of notarized Verification
Date: Nov 07, 202318CV4783 2023nov9 Rule 22 recording of motions hearing
Date: Nov 03, 202318CV4783 notice
Date: Oct 19, 202318cv4783 2023July24 - Leave of Absence BDG
Date: Jul 24, 2023Omari J. Crawford LOA Superior 7.24.23
Date: Jul 24, 202318CV4783 Degalasus v Dekalb County Misc Order on Valuation
Date: May 31, 202318CV4783 Misc Order on mediation
Date: May 22, 20232023may15 Rule 22 recording of default hearing
Date: May 12, 20232023May3 18cv4783 - Leave of Absence BDG
Date: May 03, 202318CV4783
Date: May 02, 202318CV4783 2023feb28 TRANSCRIPT of 2020feb18 phone conference
Date: Feb 28, 202318CV4783 2023feb28 CoS for Transcript of 2020feb18 phone conference
Date: Feb 28, 202318CV4783 2023feb28 Plaintiff Motion for Disqualification or Removal
Date: Feb 28, 202318CV4783 2023feb28 AFFIDAVIT Transcript of 2020feb18 phone conference
Date: Feb 28, 202318cv4783
Date: Feb 28, 2023LOA 2.16.23
Date: Feb 18, 202318CV4783 Degalassus v. DeKalb Property Appraisal Status nov 18 VHN SCM
Date: Nov 07, 2022COS Response to Rogs
Date: Sep 06, 2022Degalassus v. DCBA Motion Response September 6 2022 Final
Date: Sep 06, 20222022-08-05 PLAINTIFF MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: Aug 05, 2022GLDLOA 5.16.22
Date: May 16, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Disposition Form | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Final Order | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion to Enforce | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Civil Default/Peremptory
Judge: Hydrick, Stacey K. |
|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Scanned from a Xerox Multifunction Printer | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | 18cv4783 2024april1st Plaintiff MOTION for Court to Direct or Order Defendant to provide tax bills | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 2024march31 Rule 22 recording of hearing | |
March 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 Notice | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Civil Default/Peremptory
Judge: Hydrick, Stacey K. |
|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediation Agreement | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motions
Judge: Hydrick, Stacey K. |
|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Verification | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 2023nov7 of notarized Affidavit #2 re Motion for Sanctions and Violations of Discovery Obligation | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 2023nov7 of notarized Verification | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 2023nov7 Plaintiff Filing of True and Correct Copies of Defendant Second Motion In Limine | |
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 2023nov7 of notarized Affidavit #1 with Filing of copies of Defendant 2nd Motion in Limine | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
November 03, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 2023nov9 Rule 22 recording of motions hearing | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 notice | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Leave of Absence | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | 18cv4783 2023July24 - Leave of Absence BDG | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Omari J. Crawford LOA Superior 7.24.23 | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Sanctions | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | 18cv4783 2023-07-17 Plaintiff Motion for Court Orders and Sanctions against the Defendant | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Change Code Miscellaneous Order Judge: Hydrick, Stacey K. |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 Degalasus v Dekalb County Misc Order on Valuation | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Change Code | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Mediation | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 Misc Order on mediation_ | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Default/Peremptory
Judge: Hydrick, Stacey K. |
|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notification | |
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023may15 Rule 22 recording of default hearing | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Leave of Absence | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | 2023May3 18cv4783 - Leave of Absence BDG | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury
Judge: Morris, Shondeana C |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury
Judge: Morris, Shondeana C |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motions
Judge: Morris, Shondeana C |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury
Judge: Morris, Shondeana C |
|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Recuse | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Reassignment | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Recusal | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Transcript of Hearing | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 2023feb28 AFFIDAVIT Plaintiff Motion for Disqualification or Removal | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 2023feb28 TRANSCRIPT of 2020feb18 phone conference | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 2023feb28 CoS for AFFIDAVIT Plaintiff Motion for Disqualification or Removal | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 2023feb28 CoS for Transcript of 2020feb18 phone conference | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 2023feb28 Plaintiff Motion for Disqualification or Removal | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 2023feb28 AFFIDAVIT Transcript of 2020feb18 phone conference | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Degalassus v. Dekalb Board of Assessors (18CV4783) - Voluntary Recusal Order (signed) | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | 18cv4783 | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Zoom Hearing | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Order on Various Motions | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Degalassus v. Dekalb Board of Assessors (18CV4783) - Order on Plaintiff's Emergency Motion | |
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 Degalassus v. DeKalb Property Appraisal Amended Motions Hearing March 29 VHN scm | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Emergency Motion | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 - 2023feb21 EMERGENCY Motion for Rulings on Pending Motions or in the Alternative Motion Hearing | |
February 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Leave of Absence | |
February 18, 2023 | Docket Event | LOA 2.16.23 | |
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Status Hearings
Judge: Morris, Shondeana C |
|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Hearing | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Zoom Hearing | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | 18CV4783 Degalassus v. DeKalb Property Appraisal Status nov 18 VHN SCM | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Change Code Response |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | 18cv4783 2022-09-12 PLAINTIFF REBUTTAL OF DEFENDANT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF MOTION TO COMPEL | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Response to Motion | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | COS Response to Rogs | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Degalassus v. DCBA Motion Response September 6 2022 Final | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel | |
August 05, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-08-05 PLAINTIFF MOTION TO COMPEL | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Degalassus v. Dekalb County Tax Assessors (18CV4783) - Amended Pre-Trial Scheduling Order | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Leave of Absence | |
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event | OJC LOA 5.24.22 | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Leave of Absence | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | GLD_LOA 5.16.22 | |
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Leave of Absence | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Leave of Absence | |
April 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Leave of Absence | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Leave of Absence | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Leave of Absence | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Change Code - Request for Order(s), Transcript, and Motions to be filed in Case Record Motion to Allow |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine | |
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Leave of Absence | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Denying Motion | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury
Judge: Morris, Shondeana C |
|
February 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Change Code Notice of Filing |
|
February 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in support of Emergency Motion to Rescind Order of Appointment of Judge Robins Affidavit |
|
February 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Response to Motion | |
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Emergency Motion for Chief Judge Jackson to Rescind the Order of Appointment of judge Robins & Order Emergency Motion |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Objection to Request & Order of Appointment of Judge Robins; Violation of Rules 25.7, 25.5, 25.4 Objection |
|
February 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Change Code Miscellaneous Motion |
|
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Leave of Absence | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury
Judge: Morris, Shondeana C |
|
December 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Leave of Absence | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine | |
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury
Judge: Morris, Shondeana C |
|
November 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Response | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Interrogatories | |
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Rule 5.2 Certificate | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Supplemental Answer | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Verification | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Leave of Absence | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury
Judge: Morris, Shondeana C |
|
September 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Request to Charge | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Amended Filing | |
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
18cv4783 2019-04-30 - Leave of Absence Leave of Absence |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Degalassus v. DeKalb Order Denying Motion |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
18CV4783_Entry of Appearance - JEJ Entry of Appearance |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
[336254] Response to Plaintiff's Motion for an Evidentiary hearing Response to Motion |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury
Judge: Flake, Gail C. |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Degalassus v. DeKalb Notice of Hearing |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
scan Miscellaneous Letter |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
18cv4783 Referral Order Pretrial Order |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
18cv4783 2018-12-28 Plaintiff's Motion for Evidentiary Hearing and Brief in Support FINAL Motion for Hearing |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-File 300dpi01730001 Affidavit |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-File 300dpi01720001 Motion to Recuse |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-File 300dpi25370001 Motion to Recuse |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-File 300dpi25380001 Affidavit |
|
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
18cv4783 2018-12-10 Leave of Absence Notice to Court |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
18cv4783 Order on Mtn for Final Determination Pretrial Order |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
18cv4783 PTO Consolidated Pretrial Order |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
18cv4783 Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude and Limit Evidence Objection |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Jury
Judge: Flake, Gail C. |
|
December 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
18cv4783 - 2018-12-02 Jury charges Plaintiff's Request to Charge |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
18cv4783_Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Motion in Limine |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
18cv4783_Reply to Motion for Determination of value and termination of appeal Response to Motion |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
18cv4783 2018-11-19 COS Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Request for a Bench Trial Certificate of Service |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
18cv4783 2018-11-19 Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Request for a Bench Trial Objection |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
18cv4783 2018-11-09 COS Motion for Termination of Appeal and Final Determination of Value Certificate of Service |
|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
18cv4783 2018-11-09 Motion Termination of Appeal Final Determination of Value w attachments COS Motion to Declare |
|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Granting Withdrawal of Counsel | |
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Notification Rule 4.3 Certificate |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to withdraw Motion to Withdraw |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Denying Motion | |
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate and Set Aside Motion to Vacate/Set Aside |
|
September 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate for Service of Discovery Material | |
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Order Pretrial Order |
|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Jury
Judge: Flake, Gail C. |
|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Granting Continuance | |
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate for Service of Discovery Material | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
8-22-18 cert of svc Certificate of Service |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
8-20-18 cert of svc Certificate for Service of Discovery Material |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Jury
Judge: Flake, Gail C. |
|
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
8-10-18 cert of svc Certificate of Service |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Granting Continuance | |
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's objection to statements in motion for continuance - BG Objection |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Discovery Interrogatories |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
5.2 CoS - Defendant's Discovery Certificate for Service of Discovery Material |
|
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate for Service of Discovery Material | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion for Continuance | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Granting Continuance | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Denying Default Judgment | |
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-File 300dpi02190001 Certificate of Service |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-File 300dpi02180001 Default Judgment |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-File 300dpi02170001 Motion for Default Judgment |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
CI Case Initiation Form |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Tax Appeal Complaint or Petition for Tax Appeal |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons |