Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CHRISTOPHER FREEMANVS.JENNIFER FREEMAN
A Divorce - Uncontested case was filed by Freeman, Christopher Edward, against Freeman, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA. Judge JUDGE, FAMILY 1 presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
March 08, 2021
Last Refreshed
March 07, 2022
Filing Location
Fulton County, GA
Judge
Hon. JUDGE, FAMILY 1
Category
DIVORCE - UNCONTESTED
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
30 DAY UNCONTESTED (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer: JUDGE, FAMILY 1)
Judge: JUDGE, FAMILY 1 |
|
April 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT AND DECREE
Judge: FINAL JUDGMENT AND DECREE |
|
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING
Judge: NOTICE OF HEARING |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE
Judge: NOTICE |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE
Judge: NOTICE |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
AGREEMENT
Judge: AGREEMENT |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONSENT TO TRY IN (30) THIRTY DAYS
Judge: CONSENT TO TRY IN (30 THIRTY DAYS |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE
Judge: ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
CASE INITIATION FORM
Judge: CASE INITIATION FORM |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Judge: PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION |