Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
FISHER VS BCORE MF PERIMETER LOFTS LLC ET AL
On June 08, 2022 a tort - general* case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Gwinnett County, GA. Judge Dove, Erica K. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 08, 2022
Last Refreshed
December 22, 2023
Filing Location
Gwinnett County, GA
Judge
Hon. Dove, Erica K.
Category
Tort - General*
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Case Outcome Type
Judgment
Status
Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I NEGLIGENCE OF DEFENDANT BCORE
COUNT II NEGLIGENCE OF DEFENDANT GREP
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by William Fisher against BCORE MF PERIMETER LOFTS, LLC, dba as THE LOFTS, and ALLIANCE COMMUNITIES, LLC. The complaint states that Defendant BCORE owns and operates the residential property known as The Lofts at 100 Perim…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
CDISP (1)
Date: Dec 18, 2023Pltf William FisherDWP
Date: Dec 18, 2023cmo amend fisher 2203174
Date: Sep 11, 2023Joint Consent Motion to Amend CMO09.05.2023
Date: Sep 05, 2023Withdrawal of Mistaken Filing
Date: Sep 05, 2023William Fisher - Consolidated Pretrial Order15
Date: Aug 30, 2023Request for Oral Argument
Date: Aug 29, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: Aug 29, 2023Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: Aug 29, 2023Fisher Motions in Limine
Date: Aug 29, 2023Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Theories of Non-Recovery
Date: Aug 29, 2023Fisher - Notice of Leave of Absence
Date: Aug 10, 2023Fisher Rule 5.2
Date: Jun 16, 2023Pltf FisherNOD Mejia
Date: May 31, 2023Pltf Fisher2nd Disc Req5.2 Cert
Date: May 18, 2023Rule 5.2 Certificate of Service (Amended NP to State Farm)
Date: Apr 28, 2023Fisher - Notice of Leave of Absence
Date: Apr 11, 2023Pltf FisherNPRPD5.2 Cert
Date: Apr 05, 202323.03.28Fisher William30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition (GREP)
Date: Mar 28, 20232203174 cmo fisher 2203174
Date: Feb 24, 2023Fisher - Notice of Leave of Absence
Date: Feb 15, 2023Rule 5.2 Certificate of Service (NP to Landmark Landscaping)
Date: Feb 10, 2023Rule 5.2 Certificate of Service (NP to Insurance MPs)
Date: Feb 07, 2023Pltf Fisher SUPP Disc Resp to Def BCORE5.2 Cert
Date: Feb 02, 2023Fisher - 5.2 Certificate of Service of Discovery
Date: Oct 18, 2022Fisher - Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Date: Sep 27, 2022Fisher - Notice of Appearance
Date: Sep 26, 2022Fisher- COSD Rule 5.2 Certificate of Service (NPs)
Date: Sep 20, 2022Pltf Fisher Disc Resp to Def BCORE5.2 Cert
Date: Sep 16, 2022Fisher - Rule 5.2
Date: Sep 08, 2022Fisher - GREPs Answer to Amended Complaint 08.23.22
Date: Aug 23, 2022Fisher- COSD Rule 5.2 Certificate of Service - August 19 2022
Date: Aug 19, 2022Fisher - Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint
Date: Aug 18, 2022Pltf Fisher Amended Complaint
Date: Aug 09, 2022Pltf Fisher1st Disc Req5.2 Cert
Date: Aug 09, 2022Pltf FisherEOA
Date: Aug 04, 2022Fisher - Notice of Leave of Absence
Date: Jul 26, 2022Fisher - DBB 2022 LOA 07.14.2022
Date: Jul 14, 2022Answer and Affirmative Defenses
Date: Jul 13, 2022Fisher - GREPs Answer 07.13.2022
Date: Jul 13, 2022Fisher William-AllianceExecited Affidavit of Service 6152022
Date: Jun 21, 2022Fisher William -BcoreExecuted Affidavit of Service 6142022
Date: Jun 21, 2022Summons-Bcore
Date: Jun 09, 2022SUMMONS-ALLIANCE
Date: Jun 09, 2022Gwinnett Civil Domestic Filing Form
Date: Jun 08, 2022Fisher William - Complaint
Date: Jun 08, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Gen Civil/Dom Rel Disposition Form | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal with Prejudice | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | CDISP (1) | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Pltf William Fisher_DWP | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Dove, Erica K. |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediation Report | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Mediation | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Brief in Support of Motion for Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response to Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Rule NiSi NOVEMBER 30, 2023 |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement of Material Facts | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Time for Discovery and CASE MGT & MEDIATION DEADLINE |
|
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | cmo amend fisher 2203174 | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Pleading Filed in Error |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Consent Motion to Amend the Case Management Order |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Joint Consent Motion to Amend CMO_09.05.2023 | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Mistaken Filing | |
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Consolidate Portions Consolidated Pre-Trial Order |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event | William Fisher - Consolidated Pretrial Order[15] | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Oral Argument | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement of Material Facts | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion For Summary Judgment | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Oral Argument | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Fisher Motions in Limine | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Theories of Non-Recovery | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Leave of Absence JMF |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Fisher - Notice of Leave of Absence | |
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service of Discovery (GREP's Resp to 2nd RPDs) |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Fisher Rule 5.2 | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice to Take Deposition of Emerson Mejia |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Pltf Fisher_NOD Mejia | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Pltf Fisher_2nd Disc Req_5.2 Cert | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Rule 5.2 Certificate of Service (Amended NP to State Farm) | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Attorney Notice of Leave of Absence Jenna M Fowler |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Fisher - Notice of Leave of Absence | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Pltf Fisher_NPRPD_5.2 Cert | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice to Take Deposition of GREP Southeast LLC |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | 23.03.28_Fisher William_30(b)(6) Notice of Deposition (GREP) | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice to Take Deposition | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Deadline Order | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | 2203174 cmo fisher 2203174 | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Deadline Order | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Deadline Order | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Consent Motion TO REOPEN AND EXTEND DISCOVERY |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | William Fisher - Consent Motion to Reopen and Extend Discovery - February 21 2023 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | William Fisher - Proposed Order to Reopen and Extend Discovery - February 21 2023 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Consent Motion | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Consent Motion TO REOPEN AND EXTEND DISCOVERY |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Attorney Notice of Leave of Absence Jenna M Fowler |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Fisher - Notice of Leave of Absence | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney Notice of Leave of Absence | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Attorney Notice of Leave of Absence Jenna M Fowler |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Rule 5.2 Certificate of Service (NP to Landmark Landscaping) | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Rule 5.2 Certificate of Service (NP to Insurance MPs) | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Pltf Fisher SUPP Disc Resp to Def BCORE_5.2 Cert | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Fisher- COSD_ Rule 5.2 Certificate of Service (NP to Allegiance Imaging & Radiology_ImageLink) - Jan | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | 22-C-03174-S5 Division 5 Dove, Erica K. New Judge | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
January 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Attorney Notice of Leave of Absence for Jenna M. Fowler |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney Notice of Leave of Absence | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Attorney Notice of Leave of Absence for Jenna M. Fowler |
|
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Fisher - 5.2 Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
October 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Appearance and Substitution of Counsel | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Fisher - Notice of Substitution of Counsel | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Appearance and Substitution of Counsel | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Appearance and Substitution of Counsel | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance/Appearance of Notice of Appearance |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Fisher - Notice of Appearance | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance/Appearance of | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance/Appearance of Notice of Appearance |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service (Request for Production of Documents to Non Party) | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Fisher- COSD_ Rule 5.2 Certificate of Service (NPs) | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service (Request for Production of Documents to Non Party) | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service of Discovery Plaintiff's 5.2 Certificate of Service of Discovery Responses |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Pltf Fisher Disc Resp to Def BCORE_5.2 Cert | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service of Discovery Plaintiff's 5.2 Certificate of Service of Discovery Responses |
|
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Fisher - Rule 5.2 | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
September 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer GREP SOUTHEAST, LLCS ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Fisher - GREP's Answer to Amended Complaint 08.23.22 | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer GREP SOUTHEAST, LLCS ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Fisher- COSD_ Rule 5.2 Certificate of Service - August 19 2022 | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
August 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer to Amended Complaint Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Fisher - Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Amended Complaint | |
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer to Amended Complaint Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service of Discovery Plaintiff's 5.2 Certificate of Service of Discovery Requests |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint with Jury Demand | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Pltf Fisher Amended Complaint | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Pltf Fisher_1st Disc Req_5.2 Cert | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint with Jury Demand | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service of Discovery | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service of Discovery Plaintiff's 5.2 Certificate of Service of Discovery Requests |
|
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint with Jury Demand | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance/Appearance of of Additional Counsel for Plaintiff |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Pltf Fisher_EOA | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance/Appearance of | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance/Appearance of of Additional Counsel for Plaintiff |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney Notice of Leave of Absence for Jenna M. Fowler |
|
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Fisher - Notice of Leave of Absence | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney Notice of Leave of Absence | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney Notice of Leave of Absence for Jenna M. Fowler |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Fisher - DBB 2022 LOA 07.14.2022 | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney Notice of Leave of Absence for Don B. Brown |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Attorney Notice of Leave of Absence | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Attorney Notice of Leave of Absence for Don B. Brown |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defenses | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Fisher - GREP's Answer 07.13.2022 | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer BCORE's Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer of GREP Southeast, LLC |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer | |
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer BCORE's Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer of GREP Southeast, LLC |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Fisher William-AllianceExecited Affidavit of Service 6152022 | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Fisher William -BcoreExecuted Affidavit of Service 6142022 | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Process Server (Alliance) |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Process Server (Bcore) |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons ALLIANCE COMMUNITIES LLC Issued Serving Method: Corporation | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Process Server | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons BCORE MF PERIMETER LOFTS LLC Issued Serving Method: Corporation | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons | |
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Process Server (Alliance) |
|
June 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Process Server (Bcore) |
|
June 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons ALLIANCE COMMUNITIES LLC served | |
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons BCORE MF PERIMETER LOFTS LLC served | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons-Bcore | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS-ALLIANCE | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons BCORE |
|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Alliance |
|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons BCORE |
|
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Summons Alliance |
|
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Gwinnett Civil Domestic Filing Form | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint/Petition | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | General Civil/Domestic Relations Case Filing Info | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint/Petition | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | 22-C-03174-S5 Division 5 South, Pamela D | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | General Civil/Domestic Relations Case Filing Info | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | General Civil/Domestic Relations Case Filing Info | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Complaint/Petition | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Fisher William - Complaint | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | General Civil/ Domestic Relations Case Filing Info |