Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MILES, STEVE VS NORTON, KAREN
On August 03, 2011 a modification - child custody/visitation case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Paulding County, GA. Judge Tonny S. Beavers presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 03, 2011
Last Refreshed
December 08, 2021
Filing Location
Paulding County, GA
Judge
Category
Modification - Child Custody/Visitation
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Custody,Visitation
Case Outcome Type
NT JUDPLE
Status
Other
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event | REFUND TO KAREN NORTON GUARDIAN AD LITEM | |
September 07, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER RELEASING MONIES | |
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER TO MODIFY CUSTODY AND CHILD SUPPORT | |
June 15, 2012 | Docket Event | LOA OF R STACY HYLTON | |
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event | PAID CASH $500.00 FOR CK# 2906 NFS | |
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event | GUARDIAN AD LITEMS FEES PAID CK 2908 | |
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event | CK # 2906 KAREN L. NORTON, RETURNED NSF | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | GUARDIAN AD LITEM FEES PAID CK 2906 | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event | GUARDIAN AD LITEM FEES PAID INTO COURT CK 4327 | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
February 13, 2012 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM | |
January 03, 2012 | Docket Event | LOA OF R STACY HYLTON | |
December 29, 2011 | Docket Event | CHANGE CASE/LABEL TO JUDGE Tonny Beavers AND CORRECT ACCOUNTING D/B | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | CERT OF SERVICE | |
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event | CONSENT ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE | |
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER | |
September 26, 2011 | Docket Event | RULE 5.2 CERTIFICATE | |
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event | LOA OF R STACY HYLTON | |
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event | VERIFICATION | |
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO PROD AND REQ FOR PROD OF DOCU'S | |
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES TO THE PLTF | |
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event | DEF'S ANSWER TO PLTF'S PETITION FOR MODIFICATION AND COUNTERCLAIM | |
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF KAREN NORTON | |
August 24, 2011 | Docket Event | CERT OF SERVICE | |
August 09, 2011 | Docket Event | PERSONAL SERVICE KAREN NORTON ON 8/8/2011 | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event | STANDING ORDER (SEE FILE) / PD FILING FEE | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE STATEMENT | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event | VERIFICATION | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event | U.S.C.R. 5.2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF DISCOVERY | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR MODIFICATION OF CHILD SUPPORT CHANGE OF CUSTODY | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE FILING FORM | |
August 03, 2011 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |