Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
filed a(n) Cv - Circuit Court Civil case in the jurisdiction of Hawaii County. This case was filed in Hawaii County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
CategoryCv - Circuit Court Civil |
Last RefreshedJuly 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationHawaii County, HI |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Minutes3CCV-23-114 JOE CONTI VS NINA M. HASLER ET AL 1. Scheduling Conference 2. Plaintiff Joe Contis Motion for Pretrial Summary Judgment, Partition, and for Appointment of Commissioner in Partition Digital Recording: CC4.23-125: 2023-07-21/3:54-4:02 Before The Honorable: WENDY M. DEWEESE, Clerk: Ellen Greenbaum, Law Clerk: Kori Weinberger Plaintiffs Counsel: D. Lawton (via Zoom), Defendants Counsel: Mr. Wong (via Zoom) Ms. Hasler (via telephone) ********************************************* COURT: Hearing was calendared for a motion for summary judgment, but the parties have reached a settlement. MR. LAWTON: States that the agreement is for Ms. Hassler to deliver to Mr. Conti the sum of $197,500 within 60 days. In exchange, Mr. Conti will deliver to Ms. Hasler a warranty deed transferring to her all of his interest in the subject property. Places remaining settlement terms on the record. COURT to MS. HASLER: Colloquy with Ms. Hasler regarding her understanding of the settlement agreement. COURT to MR. CONTI: Colloquy with Mr. Conti regarding his understanding of the settlement agreement. COURT: Upon questioning both parties, the Court finds that Ms. Hasler and Mr. Conti have knowingly, voluntarily, and intelligently agreed to the terms of the settlement agreement as stated on the record by Mr. Lawton. Mr. Lawton will prepare the settlement paperwork. Will take on action on the motion filed and await the dismissal paperwork. NOTHING FURTHER. | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Memo in Reply/Response to_____EFile Document upload of type Memo in Reply/Response to | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Scheduling Conf StatementEFile Document upload of type Scheduling Conf Statement | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Memorandum in Opposition EFile Document upload of type Memorandum in Opposition | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of ServiceEFile Document upload of type Certificate of Service | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Court Date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.