Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Wong v. Kido
On January 19, 2023 a cv - circuit court civil case was filed in the jurisdiction of Honolulu County.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 19, 2023
Last Refreshed
October 17, 2023
Filing Location
Honolulu County, HI
Category
CV - Circuit Court Civil
Status
Dismissal
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | MinutesDefendants Lillian Kido, Joyce Moriyama, and June Takushi's Motion to Consolidate Discovery and/or for Protective Order (R.Iwao)(in person) 9/20/23: Dkt 269 Order Granting Defendant's Lillian Kido, Joyce Moriyama, and June Takushi Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion to Consolidate Discovery and/or for Protective Order Motion is rescheduled from 12/6/23, at 9:00a.m. to 9/26/23, at 11:00a.m. for in-person hearing. ***** 9/29/23: Dkt 279, STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS LILLIAN KIDO, JOYCE MORIYAMA, AND JUNE TAKUSHIS MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE DISCOVERY AND/OR FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. Motion that was advanced to 9/26/23, at 11:00a.m. is stipulated to be heard on 12/6/23, at 9:00a.m for in-person hearing. ******* | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | AnswerEFile Document upload of type Answer | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed OrderEFile Document upload of type Proposed Order | |
October 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MinutesOctober 10, 2023 / 1CCV-23-0000084 / WONG v KIDO FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SCHEDULING EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Courtroom 5B PRESENT VIA ZOOM: - Eric Robinson for Plaintiff - John Schmidtke for Plaintiff (on Family Court case) - Kallista Hiraoka for Defendant Aaron Harada - Philip Miyoshi for Defendant Nolan Kido Off-the-Record / 1:36 1:45pm The Court met with counsel in 1CCV-23-0000084 for a Further Status Conference. Mr. Iwao was not present but informed the Court he was under the weather. Counsel updated the Court that they are close to finalizing the Stipulation. Both Stipulations in the Divorce and in the Civil matters need to be submitted and filed by 10/18/23 because of the upcoming Family Court hearing date and the documents are due to Judge Medeiros in Family Court on Thursday, October 12, 2023. The parties are hoping to have the stipulation finalized and signed today, with submission in the Civil case, and then have Mr. Schmidtke work with Mr. Glenn to get it finalized, signed and submitted in the Family Court case. Based on the looming deadline in Family Court, this Court did not schedule a further status in this matter. Concluded. | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation to ___________ | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Minutes******Defendants Lillian Kido, Joyce Moriyama, and June Takushi's Motion to Consolidate Discovery and/or for Protective Order (R.Iwao)(adv fr 12/6)(in person)***** 9/25/2023: phone call to Counsel, confirmed that a stip is being circulated and that Defendants Lillian Kido, Joyce Moriyama, and June Takushi's Motion to Consolidate Discovery and/or for Protective Order may be taken off the Court's calendar. Motion that is scheduled for 9/26/2023, at 11:00a.m. is taken off the Court's calendar. ******* | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed OrderEFile Document upload of type Proposed Order | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Date | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | MinutesSEPTEMBER 22, 2023 / 1CCV-23-0000084 / WONG VS KIDO FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE (VIA ZOOM) RE: SCHEDULING EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE COURTROOM: 5B / OFF-THE-RECORD: 10:00 A.M. - 10:20 A.M. PRESENT VIA ZOOM: Eric Robinson for Pltf Lisa Wong Phillip Miyoshi for Deft Nolan Kido Kallisa Hiraoka for Deft Aaron Harada Regan Iwao for Defts Lilian & Richard Kido, Joyce Moriyama and June Takushi John Schmidtke (Counsel in Family Court matter) Court met with Counsel via Zoom for an update in 1CCV-23-0000084. Parties have agreed to temporarily stay all pending matters in the family court case but have not yet finalize the proposed Stipulation to Appoint a Discovery Master/Mediator. Mr. Iwao has a pending motion for protective order before Judge Tonaki set for hearing next Tuesday, 9/26/2023. However, based on the representations made by Counsel to take off depositions scheduled in the family court case, Mr. Iwao is inclined to contact Judge Tonaki's to reschedule the hearing on his Motion for Protective Order. Opposing Counsel had no objections to Mr. Iwao's intentions. Counsel will continue to work towards formulating a Stipulation to Appoint a Discovery Master/Mediator (same person) in the Civil case first, and a similar Stipulation in the Family Court case. Court set a further status conference for Tuesday, October 10, 2023 at 1:30 p.m. to follow up on the Stipulation. Concluded. | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement of _______EFile Document upload of type Statement of | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Date | |
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | MinutesSeptember 15, 2023 / 1CCV-23-0000084 / WONG v. KIDO STATUS CONFERENCE Courtroom 5B PRESENT VIA ZOOM: - Eric Robinson for Plaintiffs Lisa Wong - Leighton Hara for Defendant Aaron Harada - Philip Miyoshi for Defendant Nolan Kido - Regan Iwao for Defendant Lilian & Richard Kido, Joyce Moriyama & June Takushi - Megan Kau for Defendant Accelsior Dental Mgmt - John Schmidtke (counsel on Family Court matter) - Cheryl Arakaki (counsel on Family Court matter) Off-Record Discussions / 10:20 11:11am The Court met with counsels for a Status Conference in 1CCV-23-0000084. The Court received a request to facilitate an Early Settlement Conference and wanted to get an update from counsel on the status and how the Court can be of assistance. Mr. Hara updated the Court that there is an on-going parallel divorce proceeding in Family Court involving the parties. Mr. Miyoshi informed the Court that Defendant Nolan Kido is looking for a global settlement (including the Family Court matter) but there may be some jurisdictional issues. According to Mr. Robinson, Plaintiff Lisa Wong is amenable to settlement but is looking to set up a roadmap for discovery dates and deadlines, and the flow of documents. Mr. Iwao shared that the Nolan Kido family Defendants are amenable to settlement, but is concerned about the upcoming depositions in the Family Court case on September 25, 2023. If Mr. Iwaos clients are made available for depositions, he only wants to make them available once. Ms. Kau has a pending Motion to Set Aside Default on behalf of her clients; if the default is not set aside then her clients will not participate in the settlement and if the default is set aside, then her clients will participate. The Court proposed the possibility of a mediator who could globally mediate the case and also serve as a Discovery Master as well, for example: Retired Judge Victoria Marks or Retired Judge William Nagel who have both civil litigation backgrounds along with family court divorce backgrounds. This may be the most cost-effective way of proceeding, even though the parties will need to pay for that persons services. That person would be informed of the issues in both cases, the concerns raised in both cases and that way can make an informed decisions knowing itll affect both cases. The Discovery Master can allocate the fees and costs to the actual parties that are raising the issue. The Court offered to assist with coming up with the arrangements as to how the fees and costs of the Discovery Master/Mediator would be paid (e.g. if you use the services for the Discovery Master, then youre on the hook for paying the fee and it would be divided by the parties who are before the Discovery Master on that particular issue). Language regarding the fees can be included in a Stipulation so that its applicable for both the divorce case and the civil case. The duties, responsibilities and powers can also be laid out in the Order Appointing Discovery Master and filed in both the family court and civil cases. Mr. Schmidtke raised some concerns about the hearing before Judge Medeiros in Family Court on October 18, 2023 regarding the Iolani tuition and foreclosure on the Halemaumau property. The Court tasked Mr. Miyoshi and Mr. Robinson with taking the lead in preparing the Stipulation and Order Appointing Discovery Master/Mediator to be filed in both the Family Court and Civil cases, and in which Mr. Iwao, Mr. Hara, and Ms. Kau can approve if it looks good to them. If there are issues finalizing the Order, then the Court can meet with just Mr. Miyoshi and Mr. Robinson for a Status Conference; Mr. Miyoshi and Mr. Robinson were agreeable with the Courts suggestion. The Court will have a Discovery Master Order emailed to Mr. Miyoshi and Mr. Robinson to use as a template and starting point. The Court instructed Mr. Miyoshi and Mr. Robinson to prepare a draft stipulation by Tuesday, September 19, 2023 and circulate that to all parties for review. Because the goal is to achieve a global settlement, then that would affect the hearing on October 18, 2023 before Judge Medeiros in Family Court. As such, Mr. Schmidtke will recommend to his client to put the hearing on October 18, 2023 on hold in order to get the contemplated Stipulation and Order in place. Mr. Miyoshi will get in touch with Mr. Glenn so that he (and his client) are on the same page as well. Mr. Schmidtke is willing to reschedule the depositions from Monday, September 25 to a later date in order to proceed with the Stipulation and Order in both cases. Mr. Schmidtke will work with Mr. Iwao on rescheduling the deposition of Joyce Moriyama because her deposition is the most complicated and could take the most time. Mr. Glenn was not willing to join the current Status Conference because he does not represent anyone before this Court now. The Court set a Further Status Conference on Friday, September 22, 2023 at 10:00am. Concluded. | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement of _______EFile Document upload of type Statement of | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte MotionEFile Document upload of type Ex Parte Motion | |
September 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of ServiceEFile Document upload of type Certificate of Service | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for ___________EFile Document upload of type Motion for | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | DeclarationEFile Document upload of type Declaration | |
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Memo in Reply/Response to_____EFile Document upload of type Memo in Reply/Response to | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Memorandum in Opposition EFile Document upload of type Memorandum in Opposition | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement of _______EFile Document upload of type Statement of | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Date | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Set AsideEFile Document upload of type Motion to Set Aside | |
August 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice-Appearance /CounselEFile Document upload of type Notice-Appearance /Counsel | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | OtherVerification of Nolan Kido re First Amended Counterclaim | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | CounterclaimEFile Document upload of type Counterclaim | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer; Addt l ClaimsEFile Document upload of type Answer; Addt'l Claims | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINTEFile Document upload of type ANSWER TO COMPLAINT | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Court Date | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Date | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice-Settlement Conference | |
August 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
August 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Denied | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order-NonJury TrialJWT/15/RT/JMT | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Adding Parties | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed OrderEFile Document upload of type Proposed Order | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Minutes#1 - DEFENDANT NOLAN Y. KIDO'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS LISA W.H. WONG, individually, and as Trustee of the Lisa W. H. Wong Trust, and derivatively, on behalf of Nominal Defendants HAWAII DENTAL CLINIC KAHALA HARADA, LLC, WAILUKU DENTISTS, LLC, and WAIPAHU DENTISTS, LLC -and- HAWAII DENTAL CLINIC LLC, KAPIOLANI DENTISTS, LLC, KAPOLEI DENTISTS, LLC, LANAI CITY DENTISTS, LLC, MILILANI DENTISTS, LLC, AND NEW DAWN PROPERTIES, LLC S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED APRIL 4, 2023 (P. Miyoshi)(In Person) #2 - Defendants Lillian Kido, Individually, as Trustee of the Clear Hale 62 Irrevocable Trust, and as Trustee of the Moriyama Family Property Trust; Joyce Moriyama, Individually and as Trustee of the Moriyama Family Holdings Trust; June Takushi, Individually and as Trustee of the JFT Equipment Trust; Richard Kido, Individually and as Trustee of the RY Kido Grandchildren Trust's: (1) Substantive Joinder to Defendant Nolan Kido's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed April 4, 2023; and (2) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed April 4, 2023, or in the Alternative to Stay Lawsuit (R.Iwao)(in person) #3 - Scheduling Conference (D.Chin)(in person)(rsc fr 4/18/23,6/13,6/28)(File Ord by 7/30/23) ******* 7/20/2023 Courtroom 17 / FTR audio recording 929-1009 Present: -Douglas Chin for Plaintiffs -Eric Robinson for Plaintiffs -Leighton Hara for Defendant Aaron M.T. Harada -Philip Miyoshi for Defendant Nolan Kido -Regan Iwao for Defendants Defendants Lillian Kido etc. Case called with appearances made by Counsel. #1 - DEFENDANT NOLAN Y. KIDO'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS LISA W.H. WONG, individually, and as Trustee of the Lisa W. H. Wong Trust, and derivatively, on behalf of Nominal Defendants HAWAII DENTAL CLINIC KAHALA HARADA, LLC, WAILUKU DENTISTS, LLC, and WAIPAHU DENTISTS, LLC -and- HAWAII DENTAL CLINIC LLC, KAPIOLANI DENTISTS, LLC, KAPOLEI DENTISTS, LLC, LANAI CITY DENTISTS, LLC, MILILANI DENTISTS, LLC, AND NEW DAWN PROPERTIES, LLC S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED APRIL 4, 2023 #2 - Defendants Lillian Kido, Individually, as Trustee of the Clear Hale 62 Irrevocable Trust, and as Trustee of the Moriyama Family Property Trust; Joyce Moriyama, Individually and as Trustee of the Moriyama Family Holdings Trust; June Takushi, Individually and as Trustee of the JFT Equipment Trust; Richard Kido, Individually and as Trustee of the RY Kido Grandchildren Trust's: (1) Substantive Joinder to Defendant Nolan Kido's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed April 4, 2023; and (2) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed April 4, 2023, or in the Alternative to Stay Lawsuit (R.Iwao)(in person) Arguments heard from Attorneys, Miysohi, Iwao, and Chin. With reasons given, Court denies Defendant Nolan Y. Kido's Motion and Defendant Lillian Kid's Substantive Joinder. Attorney Chin to prepare the order. Scheduling Conference to follow. ******* *****Scheduling Conference******** Scheduling Conference Order: Non-Expedited Non-Jury Trial: 8/5/24, 15 days. Pretrial Conference: 6/20/24, at 9:30a.m. Non-dispositive motions due: 5/7/24. Dispositive motions due: 6/17/24. Motions in Limine due 7/15/24, oppositions due 7/22/24. Motions in Limine hearing: 8/2/24, at 8:30a.m. Settlement Conference: assigned to another judge. Scheduling Conference order served via JEFS. **** | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement of _______EFile Document upload of type Statement of | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ReplyEFile Document upload of type Reply | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of ServiceEFile Document upload of type Certificate of Service | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Scheduling Conf StatementEFile Document upload of type Scheduling Conf Statement | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Disclosure ofEFile Document upload of type Disclosure of | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Joint Report of the PartiesEFile Document upload of type Joint Report of the Parties | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Memorandum in Opposition EFile Document upload of type Memorandum in Opposition | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement of _______EFile Document upload of type Statement of | |
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Minutes***Scheduling Conference (D.Chin)(Zoom)(rsc fr 4/18/23)(File Ord by 6/30/23) (rsc fr 6/13/23)**** 6/26/2023: Scheduling conference scheduled for 6/28/2023, at 10:00a.m. via Zoom is rescheduled to 7/20/2023, at 9:30a.m. for in person. **** | |
June 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Amended Notice of Court Date | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Order-Ex Parte | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte MotionEFile Document upload of type Ex Parte Motion | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice-Appearance /CounselEFile Document upload of type Notice-Appearance /Counsel | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Minutes***Scheduling Conference (D.Chin)(Zoom)(rsc fr 4/18/23)(File Ord by 6/30/23) *** 5/30/23 CLERK: J. CHUN JUDGE: JOHN M. TONAKI Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference on 6/13/23, at 8:30 a.m., is RESCHEDULED to: 6/28/23, at 10:00 a.m., via Zoom video conference. Parties notified via JEFS. https://courts-hawaii-gov.zoom.us/j/8085394062 *** | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to DismissEFile Document upload of type Motion to Dismiss | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Date | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order5/30/23 Court's Minute Order Re: Scheduling Conference 6/13/23, at 8:30 a.m. Due to a conflict with the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference on 6/13/23, at 8:30 a.m., is RESCHEDULED to: 6/28/23, at 10:00 a.m., via Zoom video conference. Parties notified via JEFS. https://courts-hawaii-gov.zoom.us/j/8085394062 /s/ JOHN M. TONAKI JUDGE OF THE ABOVE-ENTITLED COURT *** | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry of Default | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | LetterEFile Document upload of type Letter | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice-Appearance /CounselEFile Document upload of type Notice-Appearance /Counsel | |
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Order-Ex Parte | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed OrderEFile Document upload of type Proposed Order | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Not W/drawal of Mtn Filed OnEFile Document upload of type Not W/drawal of Mtn Filed On | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Request-Entry Default by ClerkEFile Document upload of type Request-Entry Default by Clerk 5/17/23: Dkt 128 Notice of Withdrawal filed 5/16/2023. /ev | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Request-Entry Default by ClerkEFile Document upload of type Request-Entry Default by Clerk | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Request-Entry Default by ClerkEFile Document upload of type Request-Entry Default by Clerk 5/17/23: Dkt 129 Notice of Withdrawal filed on 5/16/23. /ev | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Request-Entry DefaultEFile Document upload of type Request-Entry Default | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Info Confidential Ntc - HCCR9EFile Document upload of type Info Confidential Ntc - HCCR9 | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | ExhibitEFile Document upload of type Exhibit | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to DismissEFile Document upload of type Motion to Dismiss | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Info Confidential Doc - HCCR9EFile Document upload of type Info Confidential Doc - HCCR9 | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Order-Ex Parte | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Request-Entry Default by ClerkEFile Document upload of type Request-Entry Default by Clerk | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte MotionEFile Document upload of type Ex Parte Motion | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of ServiceEFile Document upload of type Acknowledgment of Service | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of ServiceEFile Document upload of type Acknowledgment of Service | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Service-Return/AcknowledgementEFile Document upload of type Service-Return/Acknowledgement | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Minutes***Scheduling Conference (D.Chin)(Zoom)*** 4/4/23: By agreement of the parties, the scheduling conference scheduled on 4/18/23, at 9:30 a.m., is RESCHEDULED to: 6/13/23, at 8:30 a.m., via Zoom video conference. Parties have confirmed via email. *** | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of ServiceEFile Document upload of type Acknowledgment of Service | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Order-Ex Parte | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event | OtherVerification to the First Amended Complaint | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Ex Parte MotionEFile Document upload of type Ex Parte Motion | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Adding Parties | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint AmendedEFile Document upload of type Complaint Amended | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal - PartialEFile Document upload of type Notice of Dismissal - Partial | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Additional Claims Info SheetEFile Document upload of type Additional Claims Info Sheet | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Date | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | LetterEFile Document upload of type Letter | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Service-Return/AcknowledgementEFile Document upload of type Service-Return/Acknowledgement | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice-Appearance /CounselEFile Document upload of type Notice-Appearance /Counsel | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Set Sched Conference | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Scheduling ConfEFile Document upload of type Request for Scheduling Conf | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of ServiceEFile Document upload of type Acknowledgment of Service | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | New Case AssignmentCASE ASSIGNED TO TH 4TH DIVISION, HONORABLE JOHN M TONAKI, JUDGE PRESIDING | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Electronic Filing | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | PaymentPayment by Credit Card-Civil in the amount of $315.00 by Chin, Douglas S. | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment Due to Court | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint and SummonsEFile Document upload of type Complaint and Summons | |
January 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Civil Information SheetEFile Document upload of type Civil Information Sheet |